Copeland v. E Trade Securities LLC et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Jane J Boyle |
Referred: | David L Horan |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-01374 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship) |
Case Filed: | Jun 05, 2024 |
Terminated: | Jul 08, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Jul 20, 2024 5:54 AM CDT |
Defendant
E* Trade Securities LLC
|
|
Defendant
E*Trade Capital Management LLC
|
|
Defendant
Law Offices of Brian C Ostler Sr
|
|
Defendant
Morgan Stanley Capital Group Inc
|
|
Defendant
Morgan Stanley Services Group Inc
|
|
Defendant
Brian C Ostler, Sr
|
|
Plaintiff
Bruce Dwain Copeland
9016 Nelson Street
New Orleans, LA 70118 |
Docket last updated: 09/15/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, September 06, 2024 | ||
appeal
Appeal Record Certified/Transmitted
Fri 09/06 4:10 PM
Record on Appeal for USCA5 24-10658 : Record consisting of: 1 ECF electronic record on appeal (eROA) is certified. PLEASE NOTE THE FOLLOWING: Licensed attorneys must have filed an appearance in the USCA5 case and be registered for electronic filing in the USCA5 to access the paginated eROA in the USCA5 ECF system. (Take these steps immediately if you have not already done so. Once you have filed the notice of appearance and/or USCA5 ECF registration, it may take up to 3 business days for the circuit to notify the district clerk that we may grant you access to the eROA in the USCA5 ECF system.) To access the paginated record, log in to the USCA5 ECF system, and under the Utilities menu, select Electronic Record on Appeal. Pro se litigants may request a copy of the record by[LINK:contacting the appeals deputy] in advance to arrange delivery. (axm) |
||
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
appeal
USCA Case Number
Wed 07/31 9:21 AM
USCA Case Number 24-10658 in USCA5 for10 Notice of Appeal filed by Bruce Dwain Copeland. (axm) |
||
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
respm
Response/Objection
Mon 07/22 10:52 AM
RESPONSE filed by Bruce Dwain Copeland re:10 Notice of Appeal. (agc) |
|
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
utility
ADI Receipt Entry (Court Only Entry)
Fri 07/19 2:38 PM
Confirmation of receipt of payment from Bruce D Copeland in the amount of $605.00. Transaction posted on 7/18/2024. Receipt number 300012915 processed by ck. (ali) Lifted restriction on 7/19/2024 (ali) |
||
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Thu 07/18 3:29 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Fifth Circuit by Bruce Dwain Copeland. Filing fee $605, receipt number 300012915. T.O. form to appellant electronically at[LINK:Transcript Order Form] or US Mail as appropriate. Copy of NOA to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. IMPORTANT ACTION REQUIRED: Provide an electronic copy of any exhibit you offered during a hearing or trial that was admitted into evidence to the clerk of the district court within 14 days of the date of this notice. Copies must be transmitted as PDF attachments through ECF by all ECF Users or delivered to the clerk on a CD by all non-ECF Users. See detailed instructions[LINK:here] . (Exception: This requirement does not apply to a pro se prisoner litigant.) Please note that if original exhibits are in your possession, you must maintain them through final disposition of the case. (agc) |
|
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
order
Judgment
Mon 07/08 9:34 AM
JUDGMENT: It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that the complaint is DISMISSED for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 7/8/2024) (ykp) |
|
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order Accepting/Adopting Findings and Recommendations
Mon 07/08 9:28 AM
ORDER ACCEPTING7 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE re:3 Complaint. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 7/8/2024) (ykp) |
|
Thursday, June 20, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Findings and Recommendations
Thu 06/20 3:05 PM
FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The Court should dismiss this lawsuit for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 6/20/2024) (axm) |
|
Monday, June 10, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Mon 06/10 3:03 PM
STANDING ORDER OF REFERNCE to Magistrate Judge David L. Horan for pretrial management. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 6/10/2024) (ndt) |
|
Wednesday, June 05, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Thu 06/06 9:36 AM
Summons Issued as to E Trade Securities LLC, ETrade Capital Management LLC, Law Offices of Brian C Ostler Sr, Morgan Stanley Capital Group Inc, Morgan Stanley Services Group Inc, Brian C Ostler, Sr. (agc) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Thu 06/06 9:33 AM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bruce Dwain Copeland. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (agc) |
|
3 | 3
35
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 06/06 9:32 AM
COMPLAINT against E Trade Securities LLC, ETrade Capital Management LLC, Law Offices of Brian C Ostler Sr, Morgan Stanley Capital Group Inc, Morgan Stanley Services Group Inc, Brian C Ostler, Sr filed by Bruce Dwain Copeland. (Filing fee $405.00; Receipt number 300012200) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (agc) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party
Thu 06/06 9:28 AM
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (agc) |
|
1 | 1
qcref
Boyle
Thu 06/06 9:27 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Case received over counter or electronically. (For court use only - links to the[LINK:national] index and to the prior sanctions found within the[LINK:circuit] index.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (agc) |