Florida Middle District Court
Judge:John L Badalamenti
Referred: Kyle C Dudek
Case #: 2:24-cv-00535
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Case Filed:Jun 07, 2024
Terminated:Oct 15, 2024
Case in other court:Lee County Courthouse, 24-CA-003387
Last checked: Friday Dec 06, 2024 5:02 AM EST
Defendant
StarStone Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By
Andrew Stephen Genden
Berk, Merchant & Sims, PLC
contact info
Melissa McMillan Sims
Berk, Merchant & Sims, PLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Robin Schafer
Represented By
W. Anthony Loe
Melin Law Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, October 28, 2024
26 26 order Order Mon 10/28 4:01 PM
TEXT ORDER. The parties have filed a Joint Stipulation for Dismissal With Prejudice (Doc. 25 ). The Stipulation is self-executing. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii); Anago Franchising, Inc. v. Shaz, LLC , 677 F.3d 1272, 1278 (11th Cir. 2012). Accordingly, the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to terminate any pending deadlines and motions and close the file. Signed by Judge John L. Badalamenti on 10/28/2024. (AMA) Modified on 10/28/2024 (BPC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
25 25 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 10/23 4:18 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint) by Robin Schafer. (Loe, W. Anthony)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
24 24 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Wed 10/16 10:17 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MCB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
23 23 order Order Dismissing Case Tue 10/15 1:42 PM
TEXT ORDER. The parties have filed a Notice of Resolution. (Doc. 22 ). Accordingly, this action is DISMISSED without prejudice subject to the right of any party within thirty days to file another paper per Local Rule 3.09(b) or to move to reopen the case, which motion the Court would liberally grant. If no such papers have been filed within this thirty-day period, the dismissal of this case shall be with prejudice. The Clerk of Court is now DIRECTED to deny all pending motions as moot, terminate any deadlines, and close the case, subject to reopening if the parties file an appropriate motion within the thirty-day deadline set forth above. Signed by Judge John L. Badalamenti on 10/15/2024. (BPC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
22 22 notice Notice of settlement Thu 10/03 4:49 PM
NOTICE of settlement (Joint) by Robin Schafer (Loe, W. Anthony)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
21 21 notice Notice of mediation conference/hearing Tue 08/06 11:20 AM
NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on November 21, 2024 at 2:30 p.m. before Eric Kleinman. (Kleinman, Eric)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
20 20 notice Notice (Other) Mon 07/29 4:24 PM
NOTICE by StarStone Specialty Insurance Company re19 Notice (Other) of Withdrawal of Notice (Genden, Andrew)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice (Other) Mon 07/29 4:10 PM
NOTICE by StarStone Specialty Insurance Company of Unavailability (Genden, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
18 18 notice Notice of mediation conference/hearing Thu 07/25 12:21 PM
NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on December 12, 2024 at 12:00 p.m. before Markel Arrizabalaga. (Kleinman, Eric)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
17 17 adr Notice of selection of mediator Wed 07/10 4:40 PM
NOTICE OF SELECTION of Eric S. Kleinman as mediator by StarStone Specialty Insurance Company. (Genden, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
16 16 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 06/14 3:02 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by StarStone Specialty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Starstone US Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Core Specialty Insurance Holdings, Inc. for StarStone Specialty Insurance Company. (Sims, Melissa)
Related: [-]
15 15 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 06/14 2:55 PM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 8 Complaint by StarStone Specialty Insurance Company.(Sims, Melissa)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of a Related Action Fri 06/14 11:21 AM
NOTICE of a related action filed Jointly per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Robin Schafer. Related case(s): No (Loe, W. Anthony)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
13 13 misc Certificate of compliance Thu 06/13 4:20 PM
CERTIFICATE of compliance Joint Certification of Familiarity and Compliance with Local Rules and Orders by Robin Schafer. (Loe, W. Anthony)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
12 12 notice Notice of Exception Wed 06/12 12:45 PM
NOTICE of Exception by Robin Schafer. (Loe, W. Anthony)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
11 11 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 06/11 2:01 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Robin Schafer. (Loe, W. Anthony)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Tue 06/11 1:47 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by W. Anthony Loe on behalf of Robin Schafer. Lead Counsel: W. Anthony Loe. (Loe, W. Anthony)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
9 9 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Mon 06/10 11:58 AM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Melissa McMillan Sims on behalf of StarStone Specialty Insurance Company. Lead Counsel: Melissa M. Sims. (Sims, Melissa)
Related: [-]
8 8 cmp Complaint Mon 06/10 11:43 AM
COMPLAINT against StarStone Specialty Insurance Company with Jury Demand filed by Robin Schafer. FILED in State Court on 05/06/2024.(JK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Composite Exhibits
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Mon 06/10 11:41 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JK)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Protective Order Mon 06/10 10:19 AM
HURRICANE IAN INTERIM PROTECTIVE ORDER which is referenced in and hereby attached to the 5 Case Management Scheduling Order (Hurricane Ian). Signed by Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek on 6/10/2024. (CGW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A.
5 5 order Case Management Scheduling Order Mon 06/10 10:18 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER (HURRICANE IAN): See Order for dates and details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek on 6/10/2024. (CGW)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Civil Action Order Mon 06/10 10:17 AM
CIVIL Action Order. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 6/10/2024. (CGW)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
3 3 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 06/07 3:47 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John L. Badalamenti and Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek. New case number: 2:24-cv-535-JLB-KCD. (RLK)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of appearance Fri 06/07 3:16 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa McMillan Sims on behalf of StarStone Specialty Insurance Company (Sims, Melissa)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 06/07 3:06 PM
COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF CIVIL ACTION from Lee County Courthouse, case number 24-CA-003387 filed in State Court on May 6, 2024. Filing fee $405, receipt number AFLMDC-22174979 filed by StarStone Specialty Insurance Company.(Genden, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 State Court COMPLAINT State Court Complaint,
Att: 2 State Court Docket Sheet State Court Docket Sheet,
Att: 3 State Court Other Documents State Court Other Documents,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet