McElroy v. Hyatt Regency Savannah
Georgia Southern District Court | |
Judge: | R Stan Baker |
Referred: | Christopher L Ray |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-00113 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Civil Rights Violation |
Case Filed: | Jun 07, 2024 |
Terminated: | Jul 16, 2024 |
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Hyatt Regency Savannah
Terminated: 07/16/2024
|
|
Plaintiff
Todd McElroy
Terminated: 07/16/2024
10801 Middleground Rd. Lot 29
Savannah, GA 31419 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 08/27 2:32 PM
ORDER re14 USCA Mandate. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Mandate of the United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit is made the order of this Court. Signed by Chief District Judge R. Stan Baker on 8/27/24. (loh) |
|
Monday, August 26, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
appeal
USCA Mandate
Mon 08/26 2:26 PM
MANDATE of USCA dismissing the10 Notice of Appeal filed by Todd McElroy for failure to prosecute. (wwp) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
order
Judgment
Tue 07/16 11:31 AM
JUDGMENT pursuant to9 Order. Signed by Chief District Judge R. Stan Baker on 7/3/2024. (gmh) |
|
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
appeal
USCA Case Number
Fri 07/12 9:24 AM
USCA Case Number 24-12223 J for10 Notice of Appeal filed by Todd McElroy. (wwp) |
|
Tuesday, July 09, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
appeal
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
Tue 07/09 3:03 PM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re:10 Notice of Appeal,9 Order Adopting Report and Recommendation. Other Appeals: No. Judge Appealed: Chief Judge Baker. Court Reporter: N/A. Fee Paid: No. Pending COA/IFP: No. (gmh) |
|
Att: 1 Record on Appeal | ||
appeal
FRAP Certificate of Readiness
Tue 07/09 3:07 PM
F.R.A.P. Certificate of Readiness re10 Notice of Appeal. The entire record on appeal is available electronically . (gmh) |
||
Friday, July 05, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Tue 07/09 2:56 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to9 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations by Todd McElroy. (gmh) |
|
Wednesday, July 03, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
3
pgs
order
Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
Wed 07/03 10:37 AM
ORDER ADOPTING re7 Report and Recommendations dismissing Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Chief District Judge R. Stan Baker on 7/3/24. (loh) |
|
Friday, June 14, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
respoth
Objection to Report and Recommendations
Fri 06/14 10:33 AM
OBJECTION to7 Report and Recommendations by Todd McElroy. (jrb) |
|
Wednesday, June 12, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Report and Recommendations
Wed 06/12 8:44 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that Plaintiff's1 Complaint should be dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. Since McElroy seeks only monetary damages, his ADA claim, which is the only claim asserted, should be DISMISSED. Objections to R&R due by 6/26/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 6/12/2024. (gmh) Modified on 6/12/2024 (csr) |
|
6 | 6
8
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 06/12 8:43 AM
ORDER granting3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 6/12/2024. (gmh) |
|
Friday, June 07, 2024 | ||
5 | 5 Notice to All Counsel of Record: Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form.[LINK:CLICK HERE TO READ] . (jlh) | |
4 | 4
order
Rule 26(f) Order
Fri 06/07 11:13 AM
NOTICE of Standing Order regarding cases pending before District Judge R. Stan Baker. ([LINK:Click Here to View Standing Order)] RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Chief District Judge R. Stan Baker on 06/07/2024. (jlh) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 06/07 11:10 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Todd McElroy. Responses due by 6/21/2024. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray. (jlh) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Submitted
Fri 06/07 11:09 AM
Summons Submitted. (jlh) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 06/07 11:08 AM
COMPLAINT against Hyatt Regency Savannah, filed by Todd McElroy. (jlh) |
|
notice
Notice to Counsel (CLR Forms)
Fri 06/07 11:14 AM
Notice to All Counsel of Record: Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form.[LINK:CLICK HERE TO READ] . (jlh) |