Michigan Western District Court
Judge:Hala Y Jarbou
Referred: Sally J Berens
Case #: 1:24-cv-00605
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jun 07, 2024
Last checked: Friday Dec 06, 2024 4:58 AM EST
defendant
C.A.Picard
Represented By
Robert A. Harris
Vorys Sater Seymour And Pease, Llp (columbus)
contact info
Timothy Paul Monsma
Varnum Riddering Schmidt & Howlett Llp (grand Rapids)
contact info
Karey E. Werner
Vorys Sater Seymour And Pease, Llp (cleveland)
contact info
defendant
James Drummond
Represented By
Brace Edward Kern
Bek Law, PLC
contact info
Robert A. Harris
Vorys Sater Seymour And Pease, Llp (columbus)
contact info
defendant
Brandon Easterday
Represented By
Brace Edward Kern
Bek Law, PLC
contact info
Robert A. Harris
Vorys Sater Seymour And Pease, Llp (columbus)
contact info
mediator
Facilitative Mediator
Represented By
Lee T. Silver
Butzel Long Pc (gr)
contact info
plaintiff
CPM Aquisition Corp.
Represented By
Kelly Ann Petrocelli
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath Llp (chicago)
contact info
Susan Elgin
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath Llp (ia)
contact info
Jesse Linebaugh
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath Llp (ia)
contact info

GPO Aug 05 2024
OPINION; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (bgs)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
46 46 order Stipulation and Order Tue 03/18 5:00 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER consent judgment and dismissal; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (tls)
Related: [-]
45 45 motion Stipulation and Order (Proposed-one document) Tue 03/18 11:59 AM
PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER stipulated consent judgment and dismissal with prejudice by plaintiff CPM Aquisition Corp. (Linebaugh, Jesse) Modified text on 3/18/2025 (mg)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
44 44 1 pgs order Order Regarding Dismissal Papers Fri 02/28 11:23 PM
ORDER requiring dismissal papers to be submitted by 3/31/2025; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (aks)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
43 43 adr Facilitative Mediation Report Thu 02/27 4:58 PM
REPORT of facilitative mediation held 02/24/2025; mediation is complete; case is settled, closing documents to be filed by within 30 days (Silver, Lee)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
42 42 misc Withdrawal of Document Fri 02/21 8:52 AM
WITHDRAWAL of the Notice of Dismissal41 that was filed on 02/20/2025 filed by CPM Aquisition Corp. (Linebaugh, Jesse) Modified text on 2/21/2025 (mg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
41 41 notice Voluntary Dismissal of Case Thu 02/20 3:22 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL of case filed by plaintiff CPM Aquisition Corp. (Petrocelli, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
40 40 order Case Management Order Mon 01/27 12:12 PM
AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER granting39 joint motion: discovery to be completed by 2/28/2025; dispositive motions due by 3/31/2025; settlement conference set for 11/5/2025 at 1:00 PM by video before Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens; final pretrial conference set for 12/18/2025 at 10:00 AM at 128 Federal Building, Lansing, MI before Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou; jury trial set for 1/12/2026 at 9:00 AM at 128 Federal Building, Lansing, MI before Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (aks)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
39 39 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Thu 01/23 11:27 AM
JOINT MOTION for extension of time to complete discovery , JOINT MOTION for extension of time to file dispositive motions by defendant C.A.Picard; (Werner, Karey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, December 16, 2024
38 38 2 pgs order Order Mon 12/16 12:26 PM
ORDER Regarding Sealing of Documents; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jal)
Related: [-]
37 37 9 pgs order Order on Stipulation and Proposed Order Mon 12/16 12:23 PM
ORDER granting STIPULATION36 for Protective Order; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jal)
Related: [-]
36 36 motion Stipulation and Order (Proposed-one document) Mon 12/16 11:22 AM
PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER STIPULATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER by plaintiff CPM Aquisition Corp., defendants Brandon Easterday, James Drummond, C.A.Picard (Elgin, Susan)
Related: [-]
order Order Referring Motion to Magistrate Judge (Non-Document) Mon 12/16 11:59 AM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ORDER REFERRING PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER STIPULATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER by plaintiff CPM Aquisition Corp., defendants Brandon Easterday, James Drummond, C.A.Picard36 to Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (aks)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
35 35 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation and Proposed Order Mon 12/09 4:39 PM
ORDER denying without prejudice STIPULATION34 re Protective Order; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jln)
Related: [-]
34 34 motion Stipulation and Order (Proposed-one document) Mon 12/09 3:00 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER STIPULATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER by plaintiff CPM Aquisition Corp., defendants Brandon Easterday, James Drummond, C.A.Picard (Elgin, Susan)
Related: [-]
order Order Referring Motion to Magistrate Judge (Non-Document) Mon 12/09 3:13 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ORDER REFERRING PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER STIPULATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER by plaintiff CPM Aquisition Corp., defendants Brandon Easterday, James Drummond, C.A.Picard34 to Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (aks)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
33 33 service Proof of Service Fri 09/27 3:41 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant C.A.Picard for Defendant C.A. Picard's First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Production, and Requests for Admission to Plaintiff (Werner, Karey)
Related: [-]
32 32 service Proof of Service Fri 09/27 3:38 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant C.A.Picard for Responses and Objections to Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents (Werner, Karey)
Related: [-]
Sunday, September 15, 2024
31 31 service Proof of Service Sun 09/15 8:27 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE by defendants James Drummond, Brandon Easterday for Response to CPM's Interrogatories & Request for Production (Kern, Brace)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
adr Facilitative Mediation - Fee Received Mon 08/19 2:29 PM
VFM FEE RECEIVED in the amount of $25.00, check number 2511 as to defendants C.A.Picard, James Drummond, Brandon Easterday (jmw)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2024
adr Facilitative Mediation - Fee Received Fri 08/16 1:19 PM
VFM FEE RECEIVED in the amount of $25.00, check number 1083482 as to plaintiff CPM Aquisition Corp. (klb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2024
30 30 service Proof of Mailing Thu 08/15 9:02 PM
PROOF OF MAILING by defendants James Drummond, Brandon Easterday for Defendants' VFM Assessment (Kern, Brace)
Related: [-]
29 29 adr Facilitative Mediation - Notice of Appointment of Facilitative Mediator Thu 08/15 8:21 AM
NOTICE of appointment of Facilitative Mediator Lee T. Silver; plaintiff VFM fee to be submitted by 8/22/2024 defendant VFM fee to be submitted by 8/22/2024 (kmd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
28 28 notice Notice (Other) Wed 08/14 9:58 AM
NOTICE of Selection of Mediator by plaintiff CPM Aquisition Corp. (Elgin, Susan)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
27 27 service Proof of Service Mon 08/05 4:42 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE by defendants James Drummond, Brandon Easterday for Rule 26(a) disclosures (Kern, Brace)
Related: [-]
26 26 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Strike Order on Motion for TRO Mon 08/05 12:31 PM
ORDER denying3 motion for TRO; denying as moot24 motion to strike; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (bgs)
Related: [-]
25 25 24 pgs order Opinion Mon 08/05 12:18 PM
OPINION; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (bgs)
Related: [-]
24 24 motion Strike Mon 08/05 11:26 AM
MOTION to strike or, in the alternative, for leave to file a sur-response by defendants C.A.Picard, James Drummond, Brandon Easterday; (Harris, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
23 23 order Case Management Order Thu 08/01 3:49 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: discovery to be completed by 1/31/2025; dispositive motions due by 3/3/2025; settlement conference set for 9/30/2025 at 9:15 AM by video before Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens; final pretrial conference set for 10/28/2025 at 10:00 AM at 128 Federal Building, Lansing, MI before Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou; jury trial set for 12/1/2025 at 9:00 AM at 128 Federal Building, Lansing, MI before Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (bgs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
22 22 misc Joint Status Report (Rule 16) Tue 07/30 11:16 AM
JOINT STATUS REPORT (Elgin, Susan)
Related: [-]
notice Attorney Appearance Tue 07/30 3:39 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Karey E. Werner on behalf of defendant C.A.Picard (Werner, Karey)
Related: [-]
notice Attorney Appearance Tue 07/30 3:46 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Robert A. Harris on behalf of defendant C.A.Picard (Harris, Robert)
Related: [-]
notice Attorney Appearance Tue 07/30 3:56 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Jesse Linebaugh on behalf of plaintiff CPM Aquisition Corp. (Linebaugh, Jesse)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2024
21 21 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 07/26 4:34 PM
REPLY to response to motion3 (Expedited) (Oral Argument Requested) filed by CPM Aquisition Corp. (Elgin, Susan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 4,
Att: 2 Exhibit 5,
Att: 3 Exhibit 6
Monday, July 22, 2024
20 20 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 07/22 6:31 PM
Amended ANSWER to complaint,1 with affirmative defenses and jury demand by James Drummond, Brandon Easterday (Kern, Brace)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
19 19 respm Response in Opposition Wed 07/17 6:09 PM
RESPONSE in opposition to EMERGENCY MOTION for temporary restraining order and/or Preliminary Injunction (Oral Argument Requested) 3 filed by C.A.Picard (Monsma, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Saturday, July 13, 2024
18 18 respm Response in Opposition Sat 07/13 9:22 PM
RESPONSE in opposition to EMERGENCY MOTION for temporary restraining order and/or Preliminary Injunction (Oral Argument Requested) 3 filed by James Drummond, Brandon Easterday (Kern, Brace)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Drummond Affidavit,
Att: 2 Affidavit Easterday Affidavit
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
17 17 service Certificate of Service Wed 07/03 4:33 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendant C.A.Picard re Answer to Complaint13 , Corporate Disclosure Statement14 (Monsma, Timothy)
Related: [-]
16 16 5 pgs order Order Regarding Preparation of Joint Status Report Wed 07/03 10:43 AM
ORDER regarding preparation of joint status report: status report due by 7/30/2024; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (aks)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
15 15 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 07/02 6:46 PM
ANSWER to complaint,1 with affirmative defenses and jury demand by James Drummond, Brandon Easterday (Kern, Brace)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
14 14 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 07/01 5:11 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by C.A.Picard identifying Corporate Parent Friedrich PICARD GmbH & Co. KG for C.A.Picard (Monsma, Timothy)
Related: [-]
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 07/01 5:08 PM
ANSWER to complaint,1 and Affirmative Defenses by C.A.Picard (Monsma, Timothy)
Related: [-]
notice Attorney Appearance Mon 07/01 4:21 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Timothy Paul Monsma on behalf of defendant C.A.Picard (Monsma, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
12 12 service Certificate of Service Mon 06/24 4:21 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff CPM Aquisition Corp. re Order6 , Summons Issued5 on James Drummond on 6/15/24 (Elgin, Susan)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Certificate of Service Mon 06/24 4:19 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff CPM Aquisition Corp. re Order6 , Summons Issued5 on Brandon Easterday (Elgin, Susan)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 06/24 4:13 PM
SUMMONS returned executed; James Drummond served on 6/11/2024, answer due 7/2/2024 (Elgin, Susan)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 06/24 4:12 PM
SUMMONS returned executed; Brandon Easterday served on 6/11/2024, answer due 7/2/2024 (Elgin, Susan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
8 8 service Affidavit of Service Thu 06/20 10:29 AM
AFFIDAVIT of service by plaintiff CPM Aquisition Corp. re Order6 , Summons Issued5 (Elgin, Susan)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
7 7 service Affidavit of Service Fri 06/14 10:27 AM
AFFIDAVIT of service by plaintiff CPM Aquisition Corp. re complaint,1 , EMERGENCY MOTION for temporary restraining order and/or Preliminary Injunction (Oral Argument Requested) 3 , Corporate Disclosure Statement,2 (Elgin, Susan)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
6 6 4 pgs order Order Mon 06/10 12:10 PM
ORDER for Defendants to file response re3 motion for a preliminary injunction within 28 days after they are served with a copy of the motion and this Order; Plaintiff to file proof of service; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (bgs)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Mon 06/10 10:55 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants C.A.Picard, James Drummond, Brandon Easterday (jjm)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
4 4 misc Notice Regarding Assignment of Case Fri 06/07 3:48 PM
NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Hala Y. Jarbou (jjm)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Temporary Restraining Order Fri 06/07 3:37 PM
EMERGENCY MOTION for temporary restraining order and/or Preliminary Injunction (Oral Argument Requested) by plaintiff CPM Acquisition Corp. d/b/a CPM Century Extrusion; (Elgin, Susan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3
2 2 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 06/07 3:22 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CPM Acquisition Corp. d/b/a CPM Century Extrusion identifying Corporate Parent ASP CPM Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent ASP CPM Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent ASP CPM Holdings, LLC for CPM Acquisition Corp. d/b/a CPM Century Extrusion (Elgin, Susan)
Related: [-]
1 1 15 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 06/07 3:03 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against C.A.Picard, James Drummond, Brandon Easterday filed by CPM Acquisition Corp. (Elgin, Susan) Modified text on 6/7/2024 (jjm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment A,
Att: 2 Attachment B,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 Summons Easterday,
Att: 5 Summons Drummond,
Att: 6 Summons C.A. Picard
misc Filing Fee (Civil Case) - Credit Card Payment Fri 06/07 3:07 PM
FILING FEE PAID re1 by plaintiff CPM Acquisition Corp. d/b/a CPM Century Extrusion in the amount of $405, receipt number AMIWDC-7396665 (Elgin, Susan)
Related: [-]
notice Attorney Appearance Fri 06/07 4:40 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Kelly Ann Petrocelli on behalf of plaintiff CPM Aquisition Corp. (Petrocelli, Kelly)
Related: [-]