Jessica Matos v. Clear Start Tax Inc
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | David O Carter |
Referred: | Karen E Scott |
Case #: | 8:24-cv-01227 |
Nature of Suit | 485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act |
Cause | 47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment |
Case Filed: | Jun 07, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 23, 2024 2:42 AM PDT |
Defendant
Clear Start Tax Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jessica Matos
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Wednesday, August 28, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Wed 08/28 2:23 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 9/30/2024 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (See attached Order for complete details.) (kdu) |
|
Wednesday, August 21, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 08/21 3:27 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Clear Start Tax Inc, identifying Jessica Matos; Clear Start Tax Inc.. (Croutch, Barbara) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Wed 08/21 2:33 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7-1.1 no notice of interested parties. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb) |
|
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 08/21 1:48 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Clear Start Tax Inc.(Croutch, Barbara) |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 07/23 11:40 AM
ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Stipulation to Extend Defendant Clear Start Tax Inc.'s Time to Respond to Complaint, (30 days or less),10 . Clear Start shall have up to and including August 21, 2024, to file its response to Plaintiffs Complaint. (twdb) |
|
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Fri 07/19 3:37 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Clear Start Tax Inc answer now due 8/21/2024, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Clear Start Tax Inc.(Attorney Barbara L Croutch added to party Clear Start Tax Inc(pty:dft))(Croutch, Barbara) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, June 11, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Tue 06/11 4:41 PM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE by Judge David O. Carter. (kdu) |
|
Monday, June 10, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 06/10 4:42 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Clear Start Tax Inc. (et) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Mon 06/10 4:37 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Mon 06/10 4:37 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Mon 06/10 4:36 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (et) |
|
Friday, June 07, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Fri 06/07 2:15 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Jessica Matos. (Amini, Mona) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 06/07 2:14 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Jessica Matos, identifying Clear Start Tax Inc. (Amini, Mona) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 06/07 2:12 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Jessica Matos. (Amini, Mona) |
|
1 | 1
16
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 06/07 2:11 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-37615201 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Jessica Matos. (Attorney Mona Amini added to party Jessica Matos(pty:pla))(Amini, Mona) |