Mathew Troy v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03321 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jun 01, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 16, 2024 4:53 AM EDT |
Defendant
Honeywell Safety Products USA Inc
|
|
Defendant
W.L. Gore & Associates Inc
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Stedfast USA Inc
|
|
Defendant
Southern Mills Inc
|
|
Defendant
PBI Performance Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
MSA Safety Inc
|
|
Defendant
Lion Group Inc
|
|
Defendant
Johnson Controls Inc
|
|
Defendant
Globe Manufacturing Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
E.I. Du Pont De Nemours & Co
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
|
|
Defendant
3M Company
|
|
Plaintiff
Mathew Troy
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
72
pgs
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 09/03 2:21 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Mathew Troy. Service due by 12/2/2024 (Pritzker, Elizabeth) |
|
Friday, August 30, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Fri 08/30 1:18 PM
ORDER granting (5569) Motion to Amend/Correct in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG; granting (6) Motion to Amend/Correct in case 2:24-cv-03321-RMG. Plaintiffs are directed to promptly file the amended complaint. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 8/30/24.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:24-cv-03321-RMG(cper, ) |
|
Wednesday, August 28, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Status Report
Wed 08/28 1:05 AM
STATUS REPORT - General Denial and Statement of Affirmative Defenses by MSA Safety Inc. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 08/28 12:44 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by MSA Safety Inc. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Status Report
Tue 08/27 11:51 PM
STATUS REPORT - General Denial and Statement of Affirmative Defenses by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/27 11:30 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paige Pavone on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company, LLC, Globe Manufacturing Co LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Pavone, Paige) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 08/27 10:26 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent MSA Safety Inc. for Globe Manufacturing Company LLC.. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/27 6:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James L Stengel on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company, LLC, Globe Manufacturing Co LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/27 3:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paige Pavone on behalf of MSA Safety Inc, MSA Safety Incorporated, MSA Safety, Inc. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Pavone, Paige) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/27 1:07 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James L Stengel on behalf of MSA Safety Inc, MSA Safety Incorporated, MSA Safety, Inc. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Amend/Correct
Wed 08/14 4:21 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Mathew Troy. Response to Motion due by 8/28/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:24-cv-03321-RMG(Pritzker, Elizabeth) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Jonathan K. Levine, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. A - Redlined Am. Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex. B. Clean Am. Complaint | ||
5 | 5
misc
Suggestion of Death
Wed 08/14 4:16 PM
SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record as to Mathew Troy by Mathew Troy.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:24-cv-03321-RMG(Pritzker, Elizabeth) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A - Death Certificate, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. B - Appoint | ||
4 | 4
misc
Suggestion of Death
Wed 08/14 4:12 PM
SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record as to Mathew Troy by Mathew Troy. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:24-cv-03321-RMG(Pritzker, Elizabeth) |
|
Wednesday, June 26, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Wed 06/26 9:24 AM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed) (associated as of 6/1/2024), Mathew Troy v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-03321-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Massachusetts (sshe, ) |
|
Friday, June 07, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Fri 06/07 8:25 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (mbon) |
|
Saturday, June 01, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
71
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 06/07 8:19 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-11799217.), filed by Mathew Troy. Service due by 8/30/2024 (mbon) |