Manuel Sanchez v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03358 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jun 07, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 23, 2024 6:13 AM EDT |
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
E.I. DuPont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
DuPont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
|
|
Defendant
3M Company
|
|
Plaintiff
Manuel Sanchez
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, June 26, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Wed 06/26 10:26 AM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed) (associated as of 6/5/2024), Manuel Sanchez v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-03358-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Southern Texas (Corpus Christi Division) (sshe, ) |
|
Friday, June 07, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Fri 06/07 12:20 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (mbon) |
|
1 | 1
36
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 06/07 12:16 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-11805526.), filed by Manuel Sanchez. Service due by 9/5/2024 (mbon) |