Peak Operating Co.
Louisiana Western Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | John W Kolwe |
Case #: | 4:24-bk-50490 |
Case Filed: | Jun 07, 2024 |
Debtor
Peak Operating Co.
3639 Ambassador Caffery Pkwy Ste 201
Lafayette, LA 70503-5107 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Mark K. Sutton
P. O. Box 2239
Natchitoches, LA 71457 |
|
U.S. Trustee
Office of U. S. Trustee
300 Fannin St., Suite 3196
Shreveport, LA 71101 |
Docket last updated: 06/08/2024 12:05 AM CDT |
Friday, June 07, 2024 | ||
crditcrd
Autodocket US Treasury Receipt
Fri 06/07 4:56 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition Chapter 7([LINK 24-50490 ) [petdoc,volp7a] ( 338.00) . Receipt Number A24492055, in the Amount of $ 338.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
petdoc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Fee)
Fri 06/07 4:53 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $338, Filed by H. Kent Aguillard on behalf of Peak Operating Co.. Declaration of ECF Filing due by 06/10/2024. Social Security Card due by 06/10/2024. Picture Identification Card due by 06/10/2024. Attorney Disclosure Statement due by 06/21/2024. Employee Income Record for Debtor due by 06/21/2024. Schedule A/B due by 06/21/2024. Schedule D due by 06/21/2024. Schedule E/F due by 06/21/2024. Schedule G due by 06/21/2024. Schedule H due by 06/21/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs due by 06/21/2024. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due by 06/21/2024. Incomplete Filings due by 06/21/2024. (Aguillard, H.) |