District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Jia M Cobb
Case #: 1:24-cv-01675
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Jun 10, 2024
Case in other court:Pennsylvania Eastern, 2:23-cv-04567
Last checked: Sunday Dec 08, 2024 4:14 AM EST
Defendant
RENEE BURCHARD
Represented By
Scott Michael Lempert
Center For Employment Justice
contact info
Pamela M. Keith
Center For Employment Justice
contact info
Defendant
KIRSTI GARLOCK
Represented By
Scott Michael Lempert
Center For Employment Justice
contact info
Pamela M. Keith
Center For Employment Justice
contact info
Defendant
JOHN AND JANE DOE(S) 1-5
Represented By
Scott Michael Lempert
Center For Employment Justice
contact info
Defendant
ANNA LAYMON
Represented By
Scott Michael Lempert
Center For Employment Justice
contact info
Pamela M. Keith
Center For Employment Justice
contact info
Defendant
KERI POTTS
Represented By
Scott Michael Lempert
Center For Employment Justice
contact info
Pamela M. Keith
Center For Employment Justice
contact info
Plaintiff
DANIEL M DILELLA
1524 Locust Street
Philadelphia, PA 19102
Represented By
Elizabeth Lauren Van Pelt
Libbey Van Pelt Law, PLLC
contact info
David P. Heim
Bochetto & Lentz, P.C.
contact info
George Bochetto
Bochetto & Lentz, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
FRANK GIORDANO
Represented By
Elizabeth Lauren Van Pelt
Libbey Van Pelt Law, PLLC
contact info
David P. Heim
Bochetto & Lentz, P.C.
contact info
George Bochetto
Bochetto & Lentz, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Friday, January 10, 2025
34 34 misc Stipulation Fri 01/10 12:53 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO AMEND PLEADINGS AND/OR JOIN ADDITIONAL PARTIES by DANIEL M DILELLA, FRANK GIORDANO. (Heim, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
33 33 order Scheduling Order Mon 11/18 4:21 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: See document for scheduling order and information concerning discovery and case procedures. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on November 18, 2024. (lcjmc3)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
minutes Scheduling Conference Thu 11/14 2:52 PM
Minute Entry for Scheduling Conference proceeding held on 11/14/2024 before Judge Jia M. Cobb. Scheduling Order Forthcoming. (Court Reporter Stacy Johns.) (zed)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
notice Notice of Hearing Wed 11/06 1:32 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference is reset for 11/14/2024 at 2:00 PM via Zoom before Judge Jia M. Cobb. (zed)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
32 32 misc Errata Mon 10/28 5:49 PM
ERRATA Corrected Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss by RENEE BURCHARD, KIRSTI GARLOCK, ANNA LAYMON, KERI POTTS re27 Motion to Dismiss,.(Lempert, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
31 31 respm Reply to opposition to motion Mon 10/28 4:03 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re27 Motion to Dismiss, filed by RENEE BURCHARD, KIRSTI GARLOCK, ANNA LAYMON, KERI POTTS.(Lempert, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
30 30 misc Meet and Confer Statement Mon 10/28 3:07 PM
MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Heim, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
29 29 23 pgs respm Memorandum in opposition to motion Fri 10/11 4:00 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re27 Motion to Dismiss, filed by DANIEL M DILELLA, FRANK GIORDANO. (Heim, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
28 28 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 10/03 9:31 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by George Bochetto on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Bochetto, George) (Main Document 28 replaced on 10/3/2024) (zdp)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
27 27 motion Dismiss Mon 09/16 8:21 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by RENEE BURCHARD, KIRSTI GARLOCK, ANNA LAYMON, KERI POTTS.(Lempert, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5,
Att: 7 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, September 06, 2024
26 26 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/06 11:39 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by David P. Heim on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Heim, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
order .Order Fri 08/30 2:16 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting25 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: Attorney David P. Heim is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). [LINK:Click for instructions] . Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on August 30, 2024. (lcjmc3)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
25 25 misc Errata Wed 08/28 10:05 AM
ERRATA by DANIEL M DILELLA, FRANK GIORDANO re23 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,.(Van Pelt, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, August 16, 2024
24 24 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 08/16 11:32 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- George Bochetto, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-11096952. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by DANIEL M DILELLA, FRANK GIORDANO.(Van Pelt, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
23 23 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 08/16 11:25 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- David P. Heim, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-11096911. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by DANIEL M DILELLA, FRANK GIORDANO.(Van Pelt, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
22 22 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 08/16 11:22 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Lauren Van Pelt on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Van Pelt, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Fri 08/16 2:31 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jia M. Cobb: Status Conference held on 8/16/2024. Meet & Confer Statement due by 10/28/2024. Order Forthcoming. Scheduling Conference set for 11/18/2024 at 2:00 PM via Zoom before Judge Jia M. Cobb. (Court Reporter Stacy Johns.) (zed)
Related: [-]
order .Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 08/16 2:50 PM
MINUTE ORDER re briefing schedule: The Court ORDERS that Defendants' answer or motion to dismiss is due by September 16, 2024; Plaintiffs' response is due by October 14, 2024; and Defendants' reply is due by October 28, 2024. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on August 16, 2024. (lcjmc3)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 08/16 2:57 PM
MINUTE ORDER Granting24 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: Attorney George Bochetto is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). [LINK:Click for instructions] . Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on August 16, 2024. (lcjmc3)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 08/16 3:02 PM
MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice23 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: The Motion is DENIED because it does not meet the requirements of Local Rule 83.2(e)(2). The Motion does not include a certificate of good standing that has been issued within thirty (30) days of filing. The Motion is therefore DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on August 16, 2024. (lcjmc3)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
notice Notice of Hearing Thu 08/01 10:23 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 8/16/2024 at 1:30 PM via Videoconference before Judge Jia M. Cobb. (zed)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 05, 2024
order .Order Terminate Hearings Fri 07/05 9:51 AM
MINUTE ORDER: The July 10, 2024, status conference is VACATED pending Plaintiffs' counsel entering an appearance. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on July 5, 2024. (lcjmc3)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
order .Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Tue 07/02 9:12 AM
MINUTE ORDER: As this case was recently transferred to this Court, the Parties are ORDERED to appear for a status conference via Zoom on July 10, 2024, at 11:30 AM to discuss scheduling and other next steps. The Court's Deputy Clerk will provide the information needed to access the call. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on July 2, 2024. (lcjmc3)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
21 21 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 06/21 1:24 PM
Case directly reassigned to Judge Jia M. Cobb as there is an earlier related case. Judge Emmet G. Sullivan is no longer assigned to the case. (rj)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
20 20 notice Notice of Related Case Fri 06/14 10:49 AM
NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Defendants. Case related to Case No. 1:22-CV-00497. (Keith, Pamela)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
19 19 order Standing Order Tue 06/11 12:25 PM
STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 06/11/24. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1) (mac)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
18 18 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Mon 06/10 9:09 AM
Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:23-cv-04567. Original file ,transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
17 17 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TRANSFER IS GRANTED. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO TRANSFER THIS MATTER TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, AND TO MARK THIS MATTER CLOSED; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 6/7/24.6/7/24 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/10/2024.]
Related: [-]
CASE TRANSFERRED TO THE USDC FOR THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (JL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/10/2024.]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
16 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re10 MOTION to Transfer filed by RENEE BURCHARD, KIRSTI GARLOCK, ANNA LAYMON, KERI POTTS. (LEMPERT, SCOTT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/10/2024.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
15 15 13 pgs Memorandum of Law in Opposition re10 MOTION to Transfer filed by DANIEL M DiLELLA, FRANK GIORDANO.(HEIM, DAVID) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/10/2024.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit C
Friday, February 23, 2024
14 14 ORDER THAT THE PRO HAC VICE MOTION FILED BY PAMELA M. KEITH IS GRANTED; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 2/22/24.2/23/24 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/10/2024.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 22, 2024
13 13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice filed by RENEE BURCHARD, KIRSTI GARLOCK, ANNA LAYMON, KERI POTTS.Pro Hac Vice Form for Pamela Keith.(LEMPERT, SCOTT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/10/2024.]
Related: [-]
12 12 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS SHALL HAVE UNTIL 3/6/24 TO FILE A RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TRANSFER; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 2/22/24. 2/22/24 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/10/2024.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
11 11 STIPULATION JOINTLY FILED by DANIEL M DiLELLA, FRANK GIORDANO. (HEIM, DAVID) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/10/2024.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
10 10 MOTION to Transfer filed by RENEE BURCHARD, KIRSTI GARLOCK, JOHN and JANE DOE(S) 1-5, ANNA LAYMON, KERI POTTS.Memorandum.(LEMPERT, SCOTT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/10/2024.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2-11,
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
9 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS CONSENT TO DEFENDANTS ANSWERING OR OTHERWISE RESPONDING TO THE COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE 2/14/24; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 1/22/24. 1/23/24 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/10/2024.]
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2024
8 8 STIPULATION Concerning Time to Respond to Complaint by DANIEL M DiLELLA, FRANK GIORDANO. (HEIM, DAVID) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/10/2024.]
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2024
7 7 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID P. HEIM on behalf of DANIEL M DiLELLA, FRANK GIORDANO with Certificate of Service(HEIM, DAVID) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/10/2024.]
Related: [-]
6 6 (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; SEE PAPER #7 FOR CORRECT FILING). NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID P. HEIM on behalf of DANIEL M DiLELLA, FRANK GIORDANO with Certificate of Service(HEIM, DAVID) Modified on 1/16/2024 (fb). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/10/2024.]
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
5 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Yesenia Bracero re: served Summons & Complaint upon Renee Burchard by Personal on 12/28/2023 (HEIM, DAVID) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/10/2024.]
Related: [-]
4 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Bonnie Bannister re: served Summons & Complaint upon Anna Laymon by Personal on 01/02/2024 (HEIM, DAVID) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/10/2024.]
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT M. LEMPERT on behalf of RENEE BURCHARD, KIRSTI GARLOCK, JOHN and JANE DOE(S) 1-5, ANNA LAYMON, KERI POTTS (LEMPERT, SCOTT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/10/2024.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
2 2 Summons Issued as to RENEE BURCHARD, KIRSTI GARLOCK, ANNA LAYMON, KERI POTTS. Forwarded To: E-MAILED TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 11/21/23 (JL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/10/2024.]
Related: [-]
Monday, November 20, 2023
1 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-17083346.), filed by DANIEL M DiLELLA, GIORDANO FRANK.(BOCHETTO, GEORGE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/10/2024.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 6 Designation Form