Brecka v. The Individuals, Entities, and Unincorporated Associations
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | William P Dimitrouleas |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-61000 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act) |
Case Filed: | Jun 10, 2024 |
Terminated: | Jul 26, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Jul 26, 2024 6:55 AM EDT |
Defendant
The Individuals, Entities, and Unincorporated Associations
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gary Brecka
an individual 201 E Las Olas Boulevard Suite 1500
Ft. Lauderdale, FL 33029 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
8
pgs
misc
Form AO 120/121
Fri 07/26 2:17 PM
FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (pc) |
|
15 | 15
order
Permanent Injunction Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party
Fri 07/26 1:52 PM
CONSENT ORDER FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION Closing Case. Motions terminated:14 Joint MOTION for Entry of a Consent Final Order for Permanent Injunction filed by Gary Brecka. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 7/26/2024. See attached document for full details. (pc) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 07/26 12:45 PM
Joint MOTION for Entry of a Consent Final Order for Permanent Injunction by Gary Brecka.(Lottenberg, Geoffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Consent Order for Permanent Injunction | ||
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
2
pgs
order
Order Setting/Resetting/Cancelling Hearing ~Util - Terminate Motions
Wed 07/17 10:11 AM
ORDER ON JOINT NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND STIPULATION The July 17, 2024 hearing on Plaintiff's request for a preliminary injunction is CANCELED. The parties shall file the appropriate dismissal documents on or before August 22, 2024. The temporary restraining order set forth in the Court's June 12, 2024 Order on Plaintiff's Application for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction [DE 6] shall remain in effect until the filing of the appropriate dismissal documents. Any pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. Motions terminated:5 Plaintiff's MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Gary Brecka. Motions terminated:5 Plaintiff's MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Gary Brecka. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 7/16/2024. See attached document for full details. (pc) |
|
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
2
pgs
notice
Notice of Settlement - aty
Mon 07/08 4:24 PM
NOTICE of Settlement and Stipulation as to Temporary Restraining Order by Gary Brecka (Lottenberg, Geoffrey) |
|
Monday, June 24, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
2
pgs
order
- Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 06/24 10:40 AM
ORDER GRANTING EXPEDITED JOINT STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME REGARDING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING DATE re10 Stipulation, filed by The Individuals, Entities, and Unincorporated Associations, as to10 Stipulation,. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 6/24/2024. See attached document for full details. (pc) |
|
Friday, June 21, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
5
pgs
misc
Stipulation
Fri 06/21 1:16 PM
STIPULATION re6 Order on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, EXPEDITED JOINT STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME REGARDING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING DATE by The Individuals, Entities, and Unincorporated Associations (Spielman, Darren) |
|
Tuesday, June 18, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 06/18 2:56 PM
ORDER granting8 Motion for Alternative Service of Process. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 6/18/2024. See attached document for full details. (pc) |
|
8 | 8
9
pgs
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 06/18 10:54 AM
MOTION for an Order Authorizing Alternate Service of Process by Gary Brecka.(Lottenberg, Geoffrey) |
|
Att: 1 9 pgs Exhibit A - Declaration of Geoffrey Lottenberg, | ||
Att: 2 1 pgs Exhibit B - Affidavit of Non-Service in Wisconsin, | ||
Att: 3 1 pgs Exhibit C - Affidavit of Non-Service in Texas, | ||
Att: 4 1 pgs Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, June 14, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
3
pgs
order
Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report
Fri 06/14 10:07 AM
Order Requiring Counsel to Meet, File Joint Scheduling Report and Discovery Report Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 6/13/2024. See attached document for full details. (pc) |
|
Wednesday, June 12, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
6
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order
Wed 06/12 2:24 PM
ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION granting5 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Prelinjhrg Hearing set for 7/3/2024 10:30 AM before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. Responses due by 6/21/2024. Replies due by 6/28/2024. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 6/12/2024. See attached document for full details. (drz) |
|
Tuesday, June 11, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Temporary Restraining Order Preliminary Injunction
Tue 06/11 4:06 PM
Plaintiff's MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ( Responses due by 6/25/2024.), Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Gary Brecka.(Lottenberg, Geoffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit "A" Declaration of Geoffrey Lottenberg in Support of Plaintiff's Application for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
4 | 4
1
pgs
misc
Form AO 120/121
Tue 06/11 11:00 AM
FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (nan) |
|
Att: 1 13 pgs Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B | ||
3 | 3
1
pgs
service
Summons Issued
Tue 06/11 10:55 AM
Summons Issued as to The Individuals, Entities, and Unincorporated Associations, D/B/A Naturelink. (nan) |
|
Monday, June 10, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Tue 06/11 10:52 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (nan) |
|
1 | 1
13
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Mon 06/10 7:46 PM
COMPLAINT (Verified) against The Individuals, Entities, and Unincorporated Associations d/b/a Naturelink. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17596641, filed by Gary Brecka.(Lottenberg, Geoffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs Summon(s), | ||
Att: 3 2 pgs Exhibit "A" Screenshot of First Ad, | ||
Att: 4 2 pgs Exhibit "B" Screenshot of Second Ad |