Hunter Ridge MHP LLC, River Valley Communities v. Penn et al
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Timothy C Batten, Sr |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02525 |
Nature of Suit | 230 Real Property - Rent Lease & Ejectment |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 10, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Jul 26, 2024 6:23 AM EDT |
Defendant
All Other Occupants
|
|
Defendant
Brandy Penn
154 Falcon Crest Trail, Unit 154
Jonesboro, GA 30238 |
|
Plaintiff
Hunter Ridge MCP LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
River Valley Communities
P.O. Box 451027
Atlanta, GA 31145 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
appeal
USCA Clerk's Entry of Dismissal
Wed 08/14 2:22 PM
USCA Clerk's Entry of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution: Pursuant to the 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b),6 Notice of Appeal is DISMISSED for want of prosecution because the appellant Brandy Penn failed to pay the filing and docketing fees to the district court, or alternatively, file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis in this court and file a Transcript Order Form and failed to comply with the rules on Certificates of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statements within the time fixed by the rules. Case Appealed to USCA- 11th Circuit. Case Number 24-12202 H. (pjm) |
|
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
respm
Response (Non-Motion)
Mon 08/05 10:58 AM
OBJECTION and RESPONSE Answer to5 Order on Report and Recommendation filed by Brandy Penn. (dmb) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
utility
Submission to District Judge
Mon 07/22 1:35 PM
Submission of5 Order to District Judge Timothy C. Batten Sr.. (dmb) |
||
Thursday, July 11, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
appeal
USCA Acknowledgment
Thu 07/11 2:04 PM
USCA Acknowledgment of6 Notice of Appeal filed by Brandy Penn. Case Appealed to USCA- 11th Circuit. Case Number 24-12202 H. (pjm) |
|
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
appeal
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
Mon 07/08 3:07 PM
Transmission of Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal, Order, Report and Recommendation and Docket Sheet to USCA- 11th Circuit re:6 Notice of Appeal. (pjm) |
|
7 | 7
appeal
USCA Appeal Transmission
Mon 07/08 2:43 PM
USCA Appeal Transmission Letter to USCA- 11th Circuit re:6 Notice of Appeal filed by Brandy Penn. (pjm) |
|
Friday, July 05, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Mon 07/08 2:15 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to5 Order on Report and Recommendation, Order on Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Brandy Penn. Case Appealed to USCA- 11th Circuit.(pjm) |
|
Att: 1 USCA Appeal Fee Letter | ||
Friday, June 28, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
3
pgs
order
Order on Report and Recommendation Order on Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 06/28 3:41 PM
ORDER adopting2 Report and Recommendations.; denying1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Penn is ordered to pay the filing fee within fourteen days of this Order, or this case will be remanded to the Magistrate Court of Clayton County. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 06/28/2024. (jkb) |
|
utility
Clerks Certificate of Mailing
Fri 06/28 3:48 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Brandy Penn re5 Order on Report and Recommendation, Order on Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (jkb) |
||
Thursday, June 27, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
respoth
Objections to Report and Recommendation
Fri 06/28 11:55 AM
OBJECTIONS to2 Report and Recommendation filed by Brandy Penn. (jkb) |
|
Tuesday, June 11, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
2
pgs
order
Order for Service of Report and Recommendation
Tue 06/11 11:38 AM
ORDER for Service of2 Report and Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 6/11/2024. (dmb) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Report and Recommendation
Tue 06/11 11:32 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that the1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Brandy Penn be denied and that the plaintiff be ordered to pay the filing fee within 14 days from the date the District Judge rules on this recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 6/11/2024. (dmb) |
|
utility
Clerks Certificate of Mailing
Tue 06/11 11:40 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Brandy Penn re3 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation,2 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Brandy Penn. (dmb) |
||
Monday, June 10, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 06/10 4:20 PM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Brandy Penn.(dmb) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Submission to Magistrate Judge
Mon 06/10 4:23 PM
Submission of1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker. (dmb) |