Paul McClain v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03372 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jun 05, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Jul 20, 2024 6:51 AM EDT |
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
|
|
Defendant
E.I. DuPont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
DuPont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
|
|
Defendant
3M Company
|
|
Plaintiff
Paul McClain
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, July 30, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 07/30 1:38 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Curtis Charles Gadd, Charles P Spencer, Elizabeth Spencer, Paul McClain, Gary Twombly, Jacqueline Twombly, Brian Dekock, Patricia Dekock, Dean Leeson, Susan C Leeson, Darrell Jefferson, Lalila Jefferson, Joyce McIntire Pitts, Raymond Pitts, Thomas Lilley, Vicky Lilley, Alfreta Williams, Larry Williams, David Lovett, Euclides Pardo, Jeffrey Edwards, Shantel Edwards, Kevin Randell, Magan Bennett, Ricardo Bennett Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Vasquez, James) |
|
Wednesday, June 26, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Wed 06/26 10:59 AM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed) (associated as of 6/5/2024), Paul McClain v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-03372-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Nevada (sshe, ) |
|
Monday, June 10, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Mon 06/10 9:00 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (mbon) |
|
Wednesday, June 05, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
37
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Mon 06/10 8:59 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-11807906.), filed by Paul McClain. Service due by 9/3/2024(mbon) |