Francis Romeo v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03382 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jun 06, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Jul 21, 2024 6:58 AM EDT |
Defendant
Corteva, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products L.P.
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC, LLC
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
National Foam, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
DuPont De Nemours Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products, Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc.
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc.
|
|
Defendant
3M Company
|
|
Plaintiff
Francis Romeo
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, June 21, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Fri 06/21 8:15 AM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-Filed)(associated as of 06/06/2024), Francis Romeo v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-03382-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Northern California (mbon) |
|
Monday, June 10, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Mon 06/10 10:20 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (mbon) |
|
Thursday, June 06, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
37
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Mon 06/10 10:19 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-11809468.), filed by Francis Romeo. Service due by 9/4/2024 (mbon) |