New Jersey District Court
Judge:Renee Marie Bumb
Referred: Sharon A King
Case #: 1:24-cv-06933
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Non-Motor Vehicle
Case Filed:Jun 11, 2024
Terminated:Aug 09, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Dec 08, 2024 4:54 AM EST
Defendant
8V MD., LLC
3052 Averly Road
Ijamsville, MD 21754
Represented By
BRENT REITTER
Hinshaw Culbertson LLP
contact info
Defendant
AIRBNB INC
888 Brannan Street
San Francisco, CA 94103
Represented By
JARED JAMES LIMBACH
Donnelly, Minter & Kelly, LLC
contact info
Defendant
NATHAN JOHNSON
3052 Averly Road
Ijamsville, MD 21754
Represented By
BRENT REITTER
Hinshaw Culbertson LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
GREGORY T. DURHAM
Represented By
RICHARD D. DITOMASO
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
CINDI JOHNSON
Terminated: 07/12/2024
3052 Averly Road
Ijamsville, MD 21754
Defendant
KELLER WILLIAMS CAPITAL PROPERTIES
Terminated: 07/12/2024
4031 University Dr. Suite 500
Fairfax, VA 22030


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, August 29, 2024
transfer Case Transferred Out - District Court Transfer Thu 08/29 10:05 AM
Case extracted via ECF to District of Maryland. (mmb )
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation (public) Thu 08/29 1:30 PM
Case transferred from New Jersey has been opened in District of Maryland as case 1:24-cv-02523, filed 08/29/2024. (jal, )
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
22 22 2 pgs order Order Transfer Case Out - District Court Transfer Fri 08/09 4:25 PM
Order Transferring Case to the United State District Court for the District of Maryland (Northern Division); Clerk of the Court shall CLOSE this file. Signed by Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 8/9/2024. (mag)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Fri 08/09 4:28 PM
***Civil Case Terminated. (mag)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
21 21 misc Letter Tue 08/06 5:47 PM
Letter from Jared J. Limbach re19 Order to Show Cause,. (LIMBACH, JARED)
Related: [-]
20 20 misc Letter Tue 08/06 2:43 PM
Letter from Richard DiTomaso, Esq. re19 Order to Show Cause,. (DITOMASO, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
19 19 6 pgs order Order to Show Cause Thu 08/01 2:15 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Parties shall SHOW CAUSE, no later than August 8, 2024, by written submission on the docket why this matter should not be transferred pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §§ 1404(a), 1406(a), and/or 1631 to an appropriate forum, such as the United States District Court for the District of Maryland. Signed by Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 8/1/2024. (mag)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
18 18 misc Letter Wed 07/31 3:07 PM
Letter from Richard DiTomaso, Esq. re17 Letter. (DITOMASO, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Letter Wed 07/31 12:06 PM
Letter from Jared J. Limbach. (LIMBACH, JARED)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
16 16 misc Letter Mon 07/29 12:46 PM
Letter re14 Letter. (LIMBACH, JARED)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
15 15 misc Letter Tue 07/23 3:08 PM
Letter from Richard DiTomaso, Esq. re14 Letter. (DITOMASO, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Letter Tue 07/23 12:15 PM
Letter from Brent Reitter [PRE-MOTION LETTER]. (REITTER, BRENT)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
13 13 misc Stipulation of Dismissal (aty) Thu 07/11 2:12 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Keller Williams Capital Properties and Cindi Johnson ONLY by 8V MD., LLC, CINDI JOHNSON, NATHAN JOHNSON, KELLER WILLIAMS CAPITAL PROPERTIES. (REITTER, BRENT)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Wed 07/10 8:33 AM
Clerk's Text Order - The document12 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by 8V MD., LLC, NATHAN JOHNSON has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 7/25/2024. (dmr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
12 12 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Tue 07/09 4:49 PM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendants 8V MD, LLC and Nathan Johnson.. (REITTER, BRENT)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 07/09 4:44 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by BRENT REITTER on behalf of 8V MD., LLC, NATHAN JOHNSON (REITTER, BRENT)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
10 10 1 pgs order Order Mon 07/08 3:41 PM
LETTER ORDER Granting Defendant's request to extend time to answer by 30-days to 8/8/2024. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 7/8/2024. (sms2)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 07/08 2:52 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by GREGORY T. DURHAM. 8V MD., LLC served on 6/18/2024, answer due 7/9/2024. (DITOMASO, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 07/08 1:06 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by GREGORY T. DURHAM. KELLER WILLIAMS CAPITAL PROPERTIES served on 6/20/2024, answer due 7/11/2024. (DITOMASO, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Returned Unexecuted Mon 07/08 1:03 PM
Summons Returned Unexecuted by GREGORY T. DURHAM as to AIRBNB INC. (DITOMASO, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 06/26 2:28 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JARED JAMES LIMBACH on behalf of AIRBNB INC (LIMBACH, JARED)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Letter Wed 06/26 2:25 PM
Letter from Jared J. Limbach. (LIMBACH, JARED)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
4 4 misc Diversity Disclosure Statement Fri 06/14 9:32 AM
Diversity Disclosure Statement by GREGORY T. DURHAM. (DITOMASO, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 06/14 8:36 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to 8V MD., LLC, AIRBNB INC, CINDI JOHNSON, NATHAN JOHNSON, KELLER WILLIAMS CAPITAL PROPERTIES. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (aji, )
Related: [-]
qc QC - Blank Diversity Disclosure Statement Fri 06/14 8:34 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2), unless the Court orders otherwise, in any action filed or removed to this Court, in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a), a party or intervenor must file a disclosure statement naming and identifying the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. A party, intervenor or proposed intervenor must file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court.[LINK:Click here] to complete the Diversity Disclosure Statement, once complete, file it using the event Diversity Disclosure Statement. (aji, )
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Judicial Preferences Fri 06/14 8:34 AM
Notice of Judicial Preferences.[LINK:Click here] for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (aji, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
2 2 service Summons - Request for Issue Wed 06/12 9:30 AM
Request for Summons to be Issued by GREGORY T DURHAM as to All Defendants. (DITOMASO, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
1 1 7 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 06/11 12:08 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15437208) with JURY DEMAND, filed by GREGORY T DURHAM.(DITOMASO, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 06/13 12:26 PM
Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb and Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King added. (dmw)
Related: [-]