Coach USA, Inc.
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Case #: | 1:24-bk-11258 |
Case Filed: | Jun 11, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1,000-5,000 |
Est. Assets | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Est. Liabilities | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Coach USA, Inc.
160 S State Rt 17
Paramus, NJ 07652-2669 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
1. | Coach USA, parent company of Megabus, files for Chapter 11 bankruptcy protection (triblive.com) |
Submitted Tue 06/25/2024 | |
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Friday, July 05, 2024 | ||
216 | 216
crditcrd
none
Fri 07/05 9:25 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Motion to Sale of Property Free and Clear of Liens([LINK 24-11258 MFW] ) [motion,msell] ( 199.00). Receipt Number A11676860, amount $ 199.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
215 | 215
misc
Declaration
Fri 07/05 9:13 PM
Declaration of John Sallstrom in Support of Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order (A) Approving (I) the Debtors Designation of the Stalking Horse Bidder for Certain of the Debtors Assets as Set Forth in the Stalking Horse Agreement, (II) the Debtors Entry Into the Stalking Horse Agreement, and (III) the Bid Protections and (B) Granting Related Relief Filed by Coach USA, Inc.. (Mulvihill, Joseph) |
|
214 | 214
motion
Shorten - Motion
Fri 07/05 8:50 PM
Motion to Shorten Notice and Objection Periods for, and Schedule an Expedited Hearing on, the Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order (A) Approving (I) the Debtors Designation of the Stalking Horse Bidder for Certain of the Debtors Assets as Set Forth in the Stalking Horse Agreement, (II) the Debtors Entry Into the Stalking Horse Agreement, and (III) the Bid Protections and (B) Granting Related Relief Filed by Coach USA, Inc.. (Mulvihill, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
213 | 213
motion
Sale of Property Free and Clear of Liens- Motion (FEE)
Fri 07/05 8:46 PM
Motion For Sale of Property Free and Clear of Liens(FEE) - Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order (A) Approving (I) the Debtors Designation of the Stalking Horse Bidder for Certain of the Debtors Assets as Set Forth in the Stalking Horse Agreement, (II) the Debtors Entry Into the Stalking Horse Agreement, and (III) the Bid Protections and (B) Granting Related Relief Fee Amount $199 Filed by Coach USA, Inc.. (Mulvihill, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
212 | 212
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice
Fri 07/05 11:46 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Coach USA, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 7/9/2024 at 03:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Mulvihill, Joseph) |
|
Wednesday, July 03, 2024 | ||
211 | 211
misc
Certificate of No Objection
Wed 07/03 9:45 PM
Certificate of No Objection Regarding Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Authorizing the Debtors to File Under Seal the Asset Purchase Agreement by and Between Debtors, Bus Company Holdings US, LLC, and 1485832 B.C. Unlimited Liability Company, and (II) Granting Related Relief Filed by Coach USA, Inc.. (Powell, Timothy) |
|
210 | 210
misc
Certificate of No Objection
Wed 07/03 9:43 PM
Certificate of No Objection Regarding Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Authorizing the Debtors to Reject (A) an Unexpired Lease of Nonresidential Real Property and (B) an Executory Contract, in Each Case, Effective as of the Petition Date, (II) Abandon Any Remaining Personal Property, and (III) Granting Related Relief Filed by Coach USA, Inc.. (Powell, Timothy) |
|
209 | 209
misc
Certificate of No Objection
Wed 07/03 9:42 PM
Certificate of No Objection Regarding Application/Motion to Employ/Retain Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC as Administrative Advisor, Effective as of the Petition Date Filed by Coach USA, Inc.. (Powell, Timothy) |
|
208 | 208
misc
Certification of Counsel(Aty)
Wed 07/03 9:39 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Order Authorizing the Employment and Payment of Professionals Used in the Ordinary Course of Business Filed by Coach USA, Inc.. (Powell, Timothy) |
|
207 | 207
misc
Certification of Counsel(Aty)
Wed 07/03 9:38 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Order (I) Establishing Procedures for Interim Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for Professionals, and (II) Granting Related Relief Filed by Coach USA, Inc.. (Powell, Timothy) |
|
206 | 206
misc
Certification of Counsel(Aty)
Wed 07/03 9:36 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Revised Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP as Co-Counsel for the Debtors, Effective as of the Petition Date Filed by Coach USA, Inc.. (Powell, Timothy) |
|
205 | 205
misc
Certification of Counsel(Aty)
Wed 07/03 9:34 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Order Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 327 and 328(a), Fed. R. Bankr. P. 2014 and 5002, and Local Rules 2014-1 and 2016-2 Authorizing Retention and Employment of Houlihan Lokey Capital, Inc. as Investment Banker to the Debtors Effective as of the Petition Date Filed by Coach USA, Inc.. (Powell, Timothy) |
|
204 | 204
misc
Certification of Counsel(Aty)
Wed 07/03 9:31 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Order Authorizing the Debtors (I) to Employ and Retain CR3 Partners, LLC to Provide Spencer Ware as Chief Restructuring Officer and Additional Personnel, as Necessary, Effective as of the Petition Date, and (II) Granting Related Relief Filed by Coach USA, Inc.. (Powell, Timothy) |
|
203 | 203
misc
Certification of Counsel(Aty)
Wed 07/03 9:30 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Final Order (I) Authorizing Payment of Certain Prepetition Wages, Salaries, and Other Compensation; (II) Authorizing Certain Employee Benefits and Other Associated Obligations; (III) Authorizing Banks to Honor and Process Check and Electronic Transfer Requests Related Thereto; (IV) Scheduling a Final Hearing; and (V) Granting Related Relief Filed by Coach USA, Inc.. (Powell, Timothy) |
|
202 | 202
misc
Certification of Counsel(Aty)
Wed 07/03 9:28 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Final Order (I) Authorizing the Debtors to Pay Certain Prepetition Taxes and Fees and Related Obligations, (II) Authorizing Banks to Honor and Process Check and Electronic Transfer Requests Related Thereto, (III) Scheduling a Final Hearing, and (IV) Granting Related Relief Filed by Coach USA, Inc.. (Powell, Timothy) |
|
201 | 201
misc
Certification of Counsel(Aty)
Wed 07/03 9:26 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Final Order (I) Authorizing (A) Payment of Prepetition Obligations Incurred in the Ordinary Course of Business in Connection With Insurance and Surety Programs, Including Payment of Policy Premiums, Broker Fees, and Claims Administrator Fees, and (B) Continuation of Insurance Premium Financing Program; (II) Authorizing Banks to Honor and Process Check and Electronic Transfer Requests Related Thereto; (III) Scheduling a Final Hearing; and (IV) Granting Related Relief Filed by Coach USA, Inc.. (Powell, Timothy) |
|
200 | 200
misc
Certification of Counsel(Aty)
Wed 07/03 9:24 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Final Order (I) Authorizing Maintenance of the Cash Management System; (II) Authorizing Maintenance of the Existing Bank Accounts; (III) Authorizing Continued Use of Existing Business Forms; (IV) Authorizing Continued Performance of Intercompany Transactions in the Ordinary Course of Business and Grant of Administrative Expense Status for Postpetition Intercompany Claims; and (V) Granting Related Relief Filed by Coach USA, Inc.. (Powell, Timothy) |
|
199 | 199
misc
Certification of Counsel(Aty)
Wed 07/03 9:22 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Final Order (I) Prohibiting Utility Companies From Altering, Refusing, or Discontinuing Utility Services, (II) Deeming Utility Companies Adequately Assured of Future Payment, (III) Establishing Procedures for Determining Additional Adequate Assurance of Payment, (IV) Scheduling a Final Hearing, and (V) Granting Related Relief Filed by Coach USA, Inc.. (Powell, Timothy) |
|
198 | 198
misc
Certification of Counsel(Aty)
Wed 07/03 9:21 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Final Order Establishing Certain Notice and Hearing Procedures for (I) Certain Transfers of Equity in (A) Project Kenwood Holdings, Inc., (B) Project Kenwood Intermediate Holdings I, Inc., (C) Project Kenwood Intermediate Holdings II, LLC and (D) Project Kenwood Intermediate Holdings III, LLC, and (II) Certain Claims of Worthlessness With Respect to the Foregoing Equity Interests Filed by Coach USA, Inc.. (Powell, Timothy) |
|
197 | 197
misc
Certification of Counsel(Aty)
Wed 07/03 9:18 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Order (A) Establishing Bar Dates and Related Procedures for Filing Proofs of Claim (Including for Claims Arising Under Section 503(b)(9) of the Bankruptcy Code) and (B) Approving the Form and Manner of Notice Thereof Filed by Coach USA, Inc.. (Powell, Timothy) |
|
196 | 196
misc
Exhibit
Wed 07/03 9:14 PM
Exhibit(s) - Notice of Filing of Proposed Order (I) Approving Bidding Procedures In Connection With The Sale Of Substantially All Of The Debtors Assets, (II) Designating Stalking Horse Bidders And Stalking Horse Bidder Protections, (III) Scheduling Auction For And A Hearing To Approve The Sale Of Assets, (Iv) Approving Notice Of Respective Date, Time And Place For Auction And For A Hearing On Approval Of The Sale, (V) Approving Procedures For The Assumption And Assignment Of Certain Executory Contracts And Unexpired Leases, (VI) Approving Form And Manner Of Notice Thereof, And (VII) Granting Related Relief; And (B) Orders Authorizing And Approving (I) The Sale Of The Debtors Assets Free And Clear Of Liens, Claims, Rights, Encumbrances, And Other Interests, (II) The Assumption And Assignment Of Certain Executory Contracts, And Unexpired Leases, And (III) Granting Related Relief Filed by Coach USA, Inc.. (Mulvihill, Joseph) |
|
195 | 195
misc
Certification of Counsel(Aty)
Wed 07/03 9:11 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Order Authorizing the Employment and Retention of Alston & Bird LLP as General Bankruptcy and Restructuring Co-Counsel for the Debtors and Debtors in Possession Effective as of the Petition Date Filed by Coach USA, Inc.. (Powell, Timothy) |
|
194 | 194
misc
Declaration
Wed 07/03 7:50 PM
Supplemental Declaration of J. Eric Wise in Support of Debtors' Application for an Order Authorizing the Employment and Retention of Alston & Bird LLP as General Bankruptcy and Restructuring Co-Counsel for the Debtors and Debtors in Possession Effective as of the Petition Date Filed by Coach USA, Inc.. (Lamb, Rebecca) |
|
193 | 193
notice
Appearance - Notice
Wed 07/03 3:52 PM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by City of Eagle Pass, Eagle Pass ISD. (Stecker, Don) |
|
192 | 192
notice
Appearance - Notice
Wed 07/03 3:50 PM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by Surface Transportation Board. (Kress, Adam) |
|
191 | 191
crditcrd
none
Wed 07/03 3:27 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Request for Certification of Document (fee)([LINK 24-11258 MFW] ) [misc,reqcert] ( 12.00). Receipt Number A11674229, amount $ 12.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
190 | 190
notice
Withdrawal - Notice
Wed 07/03 1:57 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of //Notice of Withdrawal of Objection of Certain Utility Companies to the Debtors' Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Prohibiting Utility Companies from Altering, Refusing, or Discontinuing Utility Services, (II) Deeming Utility Companies Adequately Assured of Future Payment, (III) Establishing Procedures for Determining Additional Adequate Assurance of Payment, (IV) Scheduling a Final Hearing, and (V) Granting Related Relief Filed by Orange & Rockland Utilities, Inc., Pennsylvania Electric Company, Public Service Electric and Gas Company, Rockland Electric Company, West Penn Power Company. (Taylor, William) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
189 | 189
order
Appear pro hac vice
Wed 07/03 10:23 AM
Order Approving Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Bennett S. Silverberg Signed on 7/3/2024. (LMC) |
|
188 | 188
motion
Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion
Wed 07/03 10:18 AM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Bennett S. Silverberg of Brown Rudnick LLP . Receipt Number 4443837, Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Jackson, Patrick) |
|
187 | 187
notice
Notice of Service
Wed 07/03 10:10 AM
Notice of Service Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Jackson, Patrick) |
|
Tuesday, July 02, 2024 | ||
186 | 186
claims
Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing
Tue 07/02 7:43 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Nicholas Vass Regarding Debtors Motion for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Employment and Payment of Professionals Used in the Ordinary Course of Business, Professionals Used in the Ordinary Course of Business, Debtors Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Establishing Procedures for Interim Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses of Professionals and (II) Granting Related Relief, and Debtors Motion for Entry of an Order (A) Establishing Bar Dates and Related Procedures for Filing Proofs of Claim (Including for Claims Arising Under Section 503(b)(9) of the Bankruptcy Code and (B) Approving the Form and Manner of Notice Thereof . Filed by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC. (related document(s)141 ,143 ,144 ) (Steele, Benjamin) |
|
185 | 185
notice
Deposition - Notice
Tue 07/02 5:29 PM
Amended Notice of Deposition The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors' Amended Notice of Deposition of John Sallstrom Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Jackson, Patrick) |
|
184 | 184
notice
Deposition - Notice
Tue 07/02 5:24 PM
Amended Notice of Deposition The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Amended Notice of Deposition of Spencer Ware Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Jackson, Patrick) |
|
183 | 183
notice
Hearing - Notice
Tue 07/02 4:43 PM
Notice of Hearing - Re-Notice of Application/Motion to Employ/Retain Bennett Jones LLP as Canadian Restructuring Counsel Effective as of the Petition Date Filed by Coach USA, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 7/25/2024 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 7/15/2024. (Lamb, Rebecca) |
|
182 | 182
misc
Exhibit
Tue 07/02 4:29 PM
Exhibit(s) - Notice of Corrected Petition for Pacific Coast Sightseeing Tours & Charters, Inc., Case No. 24-11292 Filed by Coach USA, Inc.. (Powell, Timothy) |
|
181 | 181
misc
Request for Certification of Document (fee)
Tue 07/02 4:14 PM
Certification Request for . Certification is to be emailed to the following email address: Kristina.Bunker@goldbergkohn.com Fee Amount $12 Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Klein, Randall) |
|
180 | 180
notice
Appearance - Notice
Tue 07/02 3:34 PM
Amended Notice of Appearance. Filed by Harris County. (Grundemeier, Tara) |
|
179 | 179
order
Appear pro hac vice
Tue 07/02 12:30 PM
Order Approving Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Matthew A. Sawyer Signed on 7/2/2024. (LMC) |
|
178 | 178
order
Appear pro hac vice
Tue 07/02 12:29 PM
Order Approving Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Alexander F. Kasnetz Signed on 7/2/2024. (LMC) |
|
177 | 177
order
Appear pro hac vice
Tue 07/02 12:28 PM
Order Approving Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Andrew Rizkalla Signed on 7/2/2024. (LMC) |
|
176 | 176
order
Appear pro hac vice
Tue 07/02 12:28 PM
Order Approving Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Sharon I. Dwoskin Signed on 7/2/2024. (LMC) |
|
175 | 175
order
Appear pro hac vice
Tue 07/02 12:27 PM
Order Approving Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Richard J. Bernard Signed on 7/2/2024. (LMC) |
|
Monday, July 01, 2024 | ||
174 | 174
motion
Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion
Mon 07/01 8:49 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Matthew A. Sawyer of Brown Rudnick LLP . Receipt Number 4442674, Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Jackson, Patrick) |
|
173 | 173
motion
Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion
Mon 07/01 8:30 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Alexander F. Kasnetz of Brown Rudnick LLP . Receipt Number 4442674, Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Jackson, Patrick) |
|
172 | 172
motion
Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion
Mon 07/01 8:11 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Andrew Rizkalla of Brown Rudnick LLP . Receipt Number 4442674, Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Jackson, Patrick) |
|
171 | 171
motion
Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion
Mon 07/01 7:50 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Sharon I. Dwoskin of Brown Rudnick LLP . Receipt Number 4442674, Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Jackson, Patrick) |
|
170 | 170
motion
Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion
Mon 07/01 7:48 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Richard J. Bernard of Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP . Receipt Number 4442674, Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Jackson, Patrick) |
|
169 | 169
motion
Employ/Retain - Application/Motion
Mon 07/01 6:18 PM
Application/Motion to Employ/Retain Bennett Jones LLP as Canadian Restructuring Counsel Effective as of the Petition Date Filed by Coach USA, Inc.. Objections due by 7/15/2024. (Lamb, Rebecca) |
|
Att: 1 Notice | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C | ||
168 | 168
notice
Rescheduled Hearing - Notice
Mon 07/01 4:34 PM
Notice of Rescheduled Hearing Regarding the Motion for Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing the Applicable Debtors to Obtain Postpetition Secured Financing; (II) Authorizing the Debtors' Use of Cash Collateral; (III) Granting Adequate Protection to Prepetition ABL Administrative Agent and the Other Prepetition Secured Parties; (IV) Scheduling a Final Hearing; and (V) Granting Related Relief Hearing Originally Scheduled for 7/9/2024 has been rescheduled. Filed by Coach USA, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 7/16/2024 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Lamb, Rebecca) |
|
167 | 167
misc
Exhibit
Mon 07/01 4:24 PM
Exhibit(s) - Notice of Filing of (I) Revised Proposed Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP as Co-Counsel to the Debtors, Effective as of the Petition Date and (II) the Supplemental Beach Declaration Filed by Coach USA, Inc.. (Lamb, Rebecca) |
|
166 | 166
notice
Notice of Service
Mon 07/01 12:53 PM
Notice of Service Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Jackson, Patrick) |
|
165 | 165
order
Appear pro hac vice
Mon 07/01 11:02 AM
Order Approving Motion for Admission pro hac vice of E. Jacqueline Chavez Signed on 7/1/2024. (LMC) |
|
164 | 164
motion
Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion
Mon 07/01 9:48 AM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of E. Jacqueline Chavez . Receipt Number 4334790, Filed by NFI Group, Inc.. (Earle, Katharina) |
|
163 | 163
order
Appear pro hac vice
Mon 07/01 8:54 AM
Order Approving Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Alison D. Bauer Signed on 7/1/2024. (LMC) |
|
162 | 162
order
Appear pro hac vice
Mon 07/01 8:53 AM
Order Approving Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Jiun-Wen Bob Teoh Signed on 7/1/2024. (LMC) |
|
161 | 161
order
Appear pro hac vice
Mon 07/01 8:53 AM
Order Approving Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Kyle P. McEvilly Signed on 7/1/2024. (LMC) |
|
160 | 160
order
Appear pro hac vice
Mon 07/01 8:52 AM
Order Approving Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Robert K. Malone Signed on 7/1/2024. (LMC) |
|
Saturday, June 29, 2024 | ||
159 | 159
notice
Deposition - Notice
Sat 06/29 11:47 PM
Notice of Deposition The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors' Notice of Deposition of John Sallstrom Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Jackson, Patrick) |
|
158 | 158
notice
Deposition - Notice
Sat 06/29 11:45 PM
Notice of Deposition The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors' Notice of Deposition of Spencer Ware Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Jackson, Patrick) |
|
157 | 157
notice
Appearance - Notice
Sat 06/29 1:15 PM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Jackson, Patrick) |
|
misc
Add Attorney
Sat 06/29 1:25 PM
Attorney Richard J. Bernard and Patrick A. Jackson for Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, Robert J. Stark and Patrick A. Jackson for Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, Bennett S. Silverberg and Patrick A. Jackson for Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, Alexander F. Kasnetz and Patrick A. Jackson for Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, Andrew Rizkalla and Patrick A. Jackson for Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, Sharon I. Dwoskin and Patrick A. Jackson for Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, Matthew A. Sawyer and Patrick A. Jackson for Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors added to case Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Jackson, Patrick) |
||
Friday, June 28, 2024 | ||
156 | 156
motion
Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion
Fri 06/28 4:55 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Alison D. Bauer . Receipt Number 4441237, Filed by NFI Group, Inc.. (Earle, Katharina) |
|
155 | 155
motion
Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion
Fri 06/28 4:52 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Jiun-Wen Bob Teoh . Receipt Number 4441237, Filed by NFI Group, Inc.. (Earle, Katharina) |
|
154 | 154
motion
Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion
Fri 06/28 4:48 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Kyle P. McEvilly . Receipt Number 4036276, Filed by NFI Group, Inc.. (Earle, Katharina) |
|
153 | 153
motion
Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion
Fri 06/28 4:44 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Robert K. Malone . Receipt Number 4036276, Filed by NFI Group, Inc.. (Earle, Katharina) |
|
152 | 152
5
pgs
misc
Written Demand - Notice
Fri 06/28 4:34 PM
Notice of Written Demand - Notice of Reclamation Demand of NFI Group, Inc. and The Aftermarket Parts Company, LLC Filed by The Aftermarket Parts Company, LLC, NFI Group, Inc.. (Earle, Katharina) |
|
151 | 151
notice
Appearance - Notice
Fri 06/28 2:11 PM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by Cummins Inc.. (Haupt, Robert) |
|
150 | 150
notice
Appearance - Notice
Fri 06/28 12:18 PM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by Cummins Inc.. (Dexter, Stephen) |
|
149 | 149
notice
Appearance - Notice
Fri 06/28 11:18 AM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by NFI Group, Inc.. (Earle, Katharina) |
|
misc
Add Attorney
Fri 06/28 11:26 AM
Attorney Robert K. Malone and Katharina Earle for NFI Group, Inc., Alison D. Bauer and Katharina Earle for NFI Group, Inc., Jiun-Wen Bob Teoh and Katharina Earle for NFI Group, Inc., E. Jacqueline Chavez and Katharina Earle for NFI Group, Inc., Kyle P. McEvilly and Katharina Earle for NFI Group, Inc. added to case Filed by NFI Group, Inc.. (Earle, Katharina) |