In Re: Granulated Sugar Antitrust Litigation
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | Jerry W Blackwell |
Referred: | David T Schultz |
Case #: | 0:24-md-03110 |
Nature of Suit | 410 Other Statutes - Antitrust |
Cause | 15:15 Antitrust Litigation |
Case Filed: | Jun 07, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 07/05/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, July 03, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
respm
Proposed Order to Judge re Motion
Wed 07/03 2:40 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re20 Joint MOTION to Appoint Counsel Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Joint Motion to Appoint Interim Co-Lead Counsel and Plaintiffs' Steering Committee, and Consolidate the Related Direct Purchaser Actions filed by C.A. Curtze Co., KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., Northern Frozen Foods, Inc. d/b/a Northern Haserot, Redner's Market, Inc., Wakefern Food Corp..(Gustafson, Daniel) |
|
24 | 24
misc
Meet and Confer Statement
Wed 07/03 2:37 PM
MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re20 Motion to Appoint Counsel, filed by C.A. Curtze Co., KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., Northern Frozen Foods, Inc. d/b/a Northern Haserot, Redner's Market, Inc., Wakefern Food Corp..(Gustafson, Daniel) |
|
23 | 23
respm
Declaration in Support of Motion
Wed 07/03 2:35 PM
Declaration of Daniel E. Gustafson in Support of20 Joint MOTION to Appoint Counsel Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Joint Motion to Appoint Interim Co-Lead Counsel and Plaintiffs' Steering Committee, and Consolidate the Related Direct Purchaser Actions filed by C.A. Curtze Co., KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., Northern Frozen Foods, Inc. d/b/a Northern Haserot, Redner's Market, Inc., Wakefern Food Corp..(Gustafson, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A-J | ||
22 | 22
30+
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Wed 07/03 2:19 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re20 Joint MOTION to Appoint Counsel Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Joint Motion to Appoint Interim Co-Lead Counsel and Plaintiffs' Steering Committee, and Consolidate the Related Direct Purchaser Actions filed by C.A. Curtze Co., KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., Northern Frozen Foods, Inc. d/b/a Northern Haserot, Redner's Market, Inc., Wakefern Food Corp..(Gustafson, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Hearing on Motion
Wed 07/03 2:09 PM
NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION20 Joint MOTION to Appoint Counsel Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Joint Motion to Appoint Interim Co-Lead Counsel and Plaintiffs' Steering Committee, and Consolidate the Related Direct Purchaser Actions : Date and time to be determined. (Gustafson, Daniel) |
|
20 | 20
motion
Appoint Counsel
Wed 07/03 2:06 PM
Joint MOTION to Appoint Counsel Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Joint Motion to Appoint Interim Co-Lead Counsel and Plaintiffs' Steering Committee, and Consolidate the Related Direct Purchaser Actions filed by C.A. Curtze Co., KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., Redner's Market, Inc., Wakefern Food Corp., Northern Frozen Foods, Inc. d/b/a Northern Haserot. (Gustafson, Daniel) |
|
Thursday, June 27, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice to Attorney - Receipt of MDL Case
Thu 06/27 12:39 PM
(Text-Only) NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Receipt of record from Southern District of New York, 1 24-1972 District of Minnesota, 24-2235 JWB/DTS. (kt) |
|
18 | 18
notice
Notice to Attorney - Receipt of MDL Case
Thu 06/27 12:38 PM
(Text-Only) NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Receipt of record from Southern District of New York, 1 24-1968 District of Minnesota, 24-2234 JWB/DTS. (kt) |
|
17 | 17
notice
Notice to Attorney - Receipt of MDL Case
Thu 06/27 12:37 PM
(Text-Only) NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Receipt of record from Southern District of New York, 1 24-1941 District of Minnesota, 24-2233 JWB/DTS. (kt) |
|
16 | 16
notice
Notice to Attorney - Receipt of MDL Case
Thu 06/27 12:34 PM
(Text-Only) NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Receipt of record from Southern District of New York, 1 24-3968 District of Minnesota, 24-2348 (kt) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Notice to Attorney - Receipt of MDL Case
Thu 06/27 12:32 PM
(Text-Only) NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Receipt of record from Southern District of New York, 1 24-2840 District of Minnesota, 24-2347 JWB/DTS. (kt) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Notice to Attorney - Receipt of MDL Case
Thu 06/27 12:32 PM
(Text-Only) NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Receipt of record from Southern District of New York, 1 24-2352 District of Minnesota, 24-2346 JWB/DTS. (kt) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Notice to Attorney - Receipt of MDL Case
Thu 06/27 12:31 PM
(Text-Only) NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Receipt of record from Southern District of New York, 1 24-2159 District of Minnesota, 24-2345 JWB/DTS. (kt) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice to Attorney - Receipt of MDL Case
Thu 06/27 12:30 PM
(Text-Only) NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Receipt of record from Northern District of Illinois, 1 24-3769 District of Minnesota, 24-2344 JWB/DTS. (kt) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice to Attorney - Receipt of MDL Case
Thu 06/27 12:29 PM
(Text-Only) NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Receipt of record from Northern District of Illinois, 1 24-3216 District of Minnesota, 24-2343 JWB/DTS. (kt) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice to Attorney - Receipt of MDL Case
Thu 06/27 12:28 PM
(Text-Only) NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Receipt of record from Southern District of Florida, 9 24-80451 District of Minnesota, 24-2342 JWB/DTS. (kt) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice to Attorney - Receipt of MDL Case
Thu 06/27 12:26 PM
(Text-Only) NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Receipt of record from Southern District of Florida, 9 24-80442 District of Minnesota, 24-2341 JWB/DTS. (kt) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice to Attorney - Receipt of MDL Case
Thu 06/27 12:25 PM
(Text-Only) NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Receipt of record from Southern District of Florida, 1 24-21386 District of Minnesota, 24-2340 JWB/DTS. (kt) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice to Attorney - Receipt of MDL Case
Thu 06/27 12:25 PM
(Text-Only) NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Receipt of record from Southern District of California, 3:24-818; District of Minnesota, 24-2339 JWB/DTS. (kt) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice to Attorney - Receipt of MDL Case
Thu 06/27 12:24 PM
(Text-Only) NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Receipt of record from District of Arizona, 4:24-233; District of Minnesota, 24-2338 JWB/DTS. (kt) |
|
Thursday, June 20, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice to Attorney - Receipt of MDL Case
Thu 06/20 3:04 PM
(Text-Only) NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Receipt of record from Middle District of North Carolina, 1:24-326; District of Minnesota, 24:2349 JWB/DTS. (kt) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice to Attorney - Receipt of MDL Case
Thu 06/20 2:49 PM
(Text-Only) NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Receipt of record from Northern District of Illinois, 24-cv-3216; District of Minnesota, 24-cv-2343 JWB/DTS. (kt) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice to Attorney - Receipt of MDL Case
Thu 06/20 2:38 PM
(Text-Only) NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Receipt of record from Northern District of Illinois, 1:24-cv-3769; District of Minnesota, 24-cv-2344 JWB/DTS. (kt) |
|
2 | 2
order
Certified Copy of MDL (JPML) Panel Order
Thu 06/20 10:03 AM
CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) (kt) |
|
Friday, June 07, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
order
MDL Pretrial Order
Tue 06/11 12:21 PM
TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1407 that the actions pending in districts other than the District of Minnesota are transferred to the District of Minnesota, creating MDL 3110. Case assigned to Judge Jerry W. Blackwell and referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. (kt) |