Hurricane Creek LLC
Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Tiffany P Geyer |
Case #: | 6:24-bk-02935 |
Case Filed: | Jun 12, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $500,001 to $1 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Small Business | Yes |
Debtor
Hurricane Creek LLC
325 NW Valencia Rd
Melbourne, FL 32904-3328 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee - ORL
Office of the United States Trustee George C Young Federal Building 400 West Washington Street, Suite 1100
Orlando, FL 32801 |
Docket last updated: 37 seconds ago |
Thursday, September 05, 2024 | ||
49 | 49
notice
Notice (DO NOT USE for appearances or hearings)
Thu 09/05 3:06 PM
Notice of Unavailability for September 12, 2024 Hearing Filed by Trustee Aaron R. Cohen . (Cohen, Aaron) |
|
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
48 | 48
notice
Notice of Hearing (BK)
Tue 08/27 9:11 AM
Amended Notice of Hearing on Motion for Relief from Stay. (Fee Paid.) Re: 3rd Party General Liability Insurance. Contains negative notice. Filed by Stephen J Biggie on behalf of Creditor Blaine Naster . Hearing scheduled for 9/12/2024 at 10:30 AM at Orlando, FL - Courtroom 6A, 6th Floor, George C. Young Courthouse, 400 W. Washington Street . (Biggie, Stephen) |
|
Friday, August 23, 2024 | ||
47 | 47
notice
Notice of Hearing (BK)
Fri 08/23 9:48 AM
Notice of Hearing on Motion for Relief From Stay Filed by Stephen J Biggie on behalf of Creditor Blaine Naster . Hearing scheduled for 9/12/2024 at 10:30 AM at Orlando, FL - Courtroom 6A, 6th Floor, George C. Young Courthouse, 400 W. Washington Street . (Biggie, Stephen) |
|
Thursday, August 22, 2024 | ||
court
ADI - Reminder to Prepare and Serve Notice of Hearing
Thu 08/22 8:20 AM
The Court reminds Stephen J Biggie to prepare, file and serve the notice of hearing on interested parties. Re: Preliminary Hearing Scheduled for 09/12/2024 10:30 AM Orlando, FL - Courtroom 6A, 6th Floor, George C. Young Courthouse, 400 W. Washington Street. Re: Motion for Relief from Stay. (Fee Paid.) Re: 3rd Party General Liability Insurance. Contains negative notice. Doc46 . If notice of the hearing is not filed and served within 48 hours of this reminder, then the Court will remove it from the hearing calendar and, in its discretion, may deny the relief requested. (ADIclerk) |
||
Monday, August 19, 2024 | ||
court
Prepare Hearing Notice - Automation Use Only
Mon 08/19 9:48 AM
Preliminary Hearing Scheduled for 09/12/2024 10:30 AM Orlando, FL - Courtroom 6A, 6th Floor, George C. Young Courthouse, 400 W. Washington Street. Re: Motion for Relief from Stay. (Fee Paid.) Re: 3rd Party General Liability Insurance. Contains negative notice. Doc46 . This entry is not an official notice of hearing from the court. Noticing Instructions : The Court directs Stephen J Biggie to prepare, file, and serve a notice of hearing that includes the information on the Notice of Hearing Sample Form available at https://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/proguide/documents/Samples/Notice_of_Hearing_Bankruptcy_Sample_Form.pdf?id=1 Counsel must file and serve the notice of hearing on interested parties within 3 days. If the hearing is on an Emergency/Expedited matter, then counsel must file and serve the notice of hearing immediately upon receipt of this directive. If the notice of hearing is not timely served and filed, then the Court will remove it from the hearing calendar and, in its discretion, may deny the relief requested. . (Bill) |
||
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
46 | 46
motion
Motion for Relief from Stay (not for amended motions)
Wed 08/14 3:04 PM
Motion for Prospective Relief from Stay. (Verify Fee) Re: 3rd Party General Liability Insurance. Contains negative notice. Filed by Stephen J Biggie on behalf of Creditor Blaine Naster |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Insurance Agreement | ||
crditcrd
Receipt of Filing Fee
Wed 08/14 3:05 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Motion for Relief From Stay([LINK:6:24-bk-02935-TPG] ) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 199.00). Receipt Number A76437209, Amount Paid $ 199.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
45 | 45
misc
Certificate Of Service (BK)
Thu 08/01 10:32 AM
Certificate of Service Re: Interim Order Granting Emergency Motion for Authority to Use Cash Collateral and Setting Further Hearing on September 12, 2024 at 10:30 a.m. (Doc 43 related document(s)5 ). Filed by Michael Faro on behalf of Debtor Hurricane Creek LLC . (Faro, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Mailing Matrix | ||
44 | 44
misc
Certificate Of Service (BK)
Thu 08/01 10:30 AM
Certificate of Service Re: Interim Order Granting Authority to Pay Affiliate Officer Wages (Doc 42 related document(s)3 ). Filed by Michael Faro on behalf of Debtor Hurricane Creek LLC . (Faro, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Mailing Matrix | ||
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
43 | 43
3
pgs
order
Order (Generic)
Mon 07/29 11:25 AM
Interim Order Granting Emergency Motion for Authority to Use Cash Collateral and Setting Further Hearing on September 12, 2024 at 10:30 a.m. . Service Instructions: Michael Faro is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Adrienne) |
|
42 | 42
2
pgs
order
Order (Generic)
Mon 07/29 8:36 AM
Interim Order Granting Authority to Pay Affiliate Officer Wages . Hearing scheduled for 9/12/2024 at 10:30 AM at Orlando, FL - Courtroom 6A, 6th Floor, George C. Young Courthouse, 400 W. Washington Street . Service Instructions: Michael Faro is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Lisa P.) |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
41 | 41
court
CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held
Wed 07/24 11:22 AM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: APPEARANCES : Michael Faro: Debtor Attorney; Randy Bennett: Debtor Principal; Aaron Cohen: Trustee; Audrey Aleskovsky: U.S. Trustee; RULING: 1) Initial Status Conference: Conference held and continued to September 12, 2024, at 10:30 a.m. (AOCNFNG); Preliminary Hearing: 2) Debtor's Emergency Motion for Authority to Pay Affiliate Officer Salaries (Doc #3)- Granted on Interim Basis through further hearing scheduled for September 12, 2024, at 10:30 a.m.; Order by Faro; 3) Debtor's Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral (Doc #5) - Granted on Interim Basis through further hearing scheduled for September 12, 2024, at 10:30 a.m.; Order by Faro; (dh). Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Bill) |
|
40 | 40
misc
Notice of Change of Address - Party
Tue 07/23 10:41 AM
Notice of Change of Address As to Noticing Address Only Filed by Michael Faro on behalf of Debtor Hurricane Creek LLC. (Faro, Michael) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
39 | 39
misc
Small Business Monthly Operating Report
Mon 07/22 10:46 PM
Small Business Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period June 12-30, 2024 Filed by Michael Faro on behalf of Debtor Hurricane Creek LLC. (Faro, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
38 | 38
misc
Withdrawal
Tue 07/16 11:16 PM
Withdrawal Filed by Michael Faro on behalf of Debtor Hurricane Creek LLC . (Faro, Michael) |
|
37 | 37
misc
Notice of Change of Address - Party
Tue 07/16 3:30 PM
Notice of Change of Address As to Noticing Address Only Filed by Michael Faro on behalf of Debtor Hurricane Creek LLC. (Faro, Michael) |
|
36 | 36
motion
Motion for Sanctions
Tue 07/16 9:16 AM
Emergency Motion For Sanctions for Violation of the Automatic Stay under 11 U.S.C. Sec. 362(k). Filed by Michael Faro on behalf of Debtor Hurricane Creek LLC |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Necessity (Emergency Hearing) | ||
court
Prepare Hearing Notice - Automation Use Only
Tue 07/16 1:11 PM
Preliminary Hearing Scheduled for 07/17/2024 10:30 AM Orlando, FL - Courtroom 6A, 6th Floor, George C. Young Courthouse, 400 W. Washington Street. Re: Emergency Motion For Sanctions for Violation of the Automatic Stay under 11 U.S.C. Sec. 362(k). Doc36 . This entry is not an official notice of hearing from the court. Noticing Instructions : The Court directs Michael Faro to prepare, file, and serve a notice of hearing that includes the information on the Notice of Hearing Sample Form available at https://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/proguide/documents/Samples/Notice_of_Hearing_Bankruptcy_Sample_Form.pdf?id=1 Counsel must file and serve the notice of hearing on interested parties within 3 days. If the hearing is on an Emergency/Expedited matter, then counsel must file and serve the notice of hearing immediately upon receipt of this directive. If the notice of hearing is not timely served and filed, then the Court will remove it from the hearing calendar and, in its discretion, may deny the relief requested. . (Bill) |
||
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
35 | 35
misc
Supplement
Mon 07/15 12:20 PM
Supplement to Voluntary Petition Filed by Michael Faro on behalf of Debtor Hurricane Creek LLC . (Faro, Michael) |
|
trustee
(NO PAPER) - Chapter 11 - Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded
Mon 07/15 4:41 PM
The United States Trustee states that the initial meeting of creditors was held and concluded on 07/15/24 . Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee - ORL. (Bomkamp, Scott) |
||
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
34 | 34
misc
Declaration under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors
Mon 07/08 10:22 PM
Declaration under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors , Schedules A - H, Includes addition or deletion of creditors, or executory contract entity/leaseholders, or co-debtors to Schedules or Change in the Amount or Classification of Debts. Filing Fee Not Paid or Not Required., Statement of Financial Affairs , Statement/Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney Filed by Michael Faro on behalf of Debtor Hurricane Creek LLC. (Faro, Michael) |
|
Monday, July 01, 2024 | ||
33 | 33
misc
Notice of Change of Address - Party
Mon 07/01 11:58 AM
Notice of Change of Address As to Noticing Address Only Filed by Michael Faro on behalf of Debtor Hurricane Creek LLC. (Faro, Michael) |
|
32 | 32
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Mon 07/01 10:20 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Andrea B Anderson on behalf of Attorney Andrea B Anderson. (Anderson, Andrea) |
|
Friday, June 28, 2024 | ||
31 | 31
misc
Certificate Of Service (BK)
Fri 06/28 2:19 PM
Certificate of Service Re: Order Granting Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral and Setting a Further Hearing on July 23, 2024 at 3:00 p.m. (Doc 30 related document(s)5 ).. Filed by Michael Faro on behalf of Debtor Hurricane Creek LLC . (Faro, Michael) |
|
30 | 30
3
pgs
order
Order (Generic)
Fri 06/28 9:54 AM
Order Granting Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral and Setting a Further Hearing on July 23, 2024 at 3:00 p.m. . Service Instructions: Michael Faro is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Adrienne) |
|
Thursday, June 27, 2024 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Certificate Of Service (BK)
Thu 06/27 1:59 PM
Certificate of Service Re: Order Granting Motion To Extend Deadline to File Schedules and Statements Until July 8, 2024. (Doc 28 Related Doc #27 ). Filed by Michael Faro on behalf of Debtor Hurricane Creek LLC . (Faro, Michael) |
|
28 | 28
order
Extend Deadline to File Schedules, Statements, Plans
Thu 06/27 1:41 PM
Order Granting Motion To Extend Deadline to File Schedules and Statements Until July 8, 2024. Service Instructions: Michael Faro is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Lisa P.) |
|
Wednesday, June 26, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
motion
Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules, Statements, Ch. 12 or Ch. 13 Plan
Wed 06/26 10:22 PM
|
|
26 | 26
misc
Certificate Of Service (BK)
Wed 06/26 4:04 PM
Certificate of Service Re: Interim Order Granting Authority to Pay Affiliate Officer Wages (Doc 24 related document(s)21 ,3 ). Filed by Michael Faro on behalf of Debtor Hurricane Creek LLC . (Faro, Michael) |
|
25 | 25
misc
Notice of Change of Address - Party
Wed 06/26 3:32 PM
Notice of Change of Address As to Noticing Address Only Filed by Michael Faro on behalf of Debtor Hurricane Creek LLC. (Faro, Michael) |
|
Monday, June 24, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
2
pgs
order
Order (Generic)
Mon 06/24 4:11 PM
Interim Order Granting Authority to Pay Affiliate Officer Wages . Hearing scheduled for 7/23/2024 at 03:00 PM at Orlando, FL - Courtroom 6A, 6th Floor, George C. Young Courthouse, 400 W. Washington Street . Service Instructions: Michael Faro is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Nadia) |
|
Thursday, June 20, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order
Fri 06/21 12:21 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order . Notice Date 06/20/2024. (Admin.) |
|
22 | 22
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
Fri 06/21 12:21 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Meeting of Creditors. . Notice Date 06/20/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, June 18, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
court
CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held
Thu 06/20 1:23 PM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: APPEARANCES : Michael Faro: Debtor Attorney; Randy Bennett: Debtor Principal; Aaron Cohen: Trustee; Scott Bomkamp: U.S. Trustee; Mike Regal: Landlord's Spouse/ Power of Attorney; RULING: Preliminary Hearing: 1) Debtor's Emergency Motion for Authority to Pay Affiliate Officer Salaries (Doc #3) - Granted on Interim Basis through further hearing scheduled for July 23, 2024, at 3:00 p.m.; Order by Faro; 2) Debtor's Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral (Doc #5) - Granted on Interim Basis through further hearing scheduled for July 23, 2024, at 3:00 p.m.; Order by Faro; (dh). Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Bill) |
|
20 | 20
2
pgs
order
Order Prescribing Procedures - Ch. 11 SubV Case, Setting Deadline for Filing Plan, Set Status Conf
Tue 06/18 11:31 AM
Order Prescribing Procedures in Chapter 11 Subchapter V Case, Setting Deadline for Filing Plan, and Setting Status Conference . Hearing scheduled for 7/23/2024 at 03:00 PM at Orlando, FL - Courtroom 6A, 6th Floor, George C. Young Courthouse, 400 W. Washington Street . Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Juan) |
|
19 | 19
court
341 Mtg. Notice - Ch 11 Corp w/Claim Deadline
Tue 06/18 11:23 AM
Notice of Bankruptcy Case . Section 341(a) meeting to be held on 7/15/2024 at 11:00 AM. U.S. Trustee (Orl) will hold the meeting telephonically. Call in Number: 877-801-2055. Passcode: 8940738#. Proofs of Claims due by 8/21/2024. (Margaret) |
|
18 | 18
misc
Supplement
Tue 06/18 10:03 AM
Supplement to Emergency Motion for Authority to Use Cash Collateral Effective June 12, 2024 Filed by Michael Faro on behalf of Debtor Hurricane Creek LLC . (Faro, Michael) |
|
Monday, June 17, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Withdrawal of Pleadings
Mon 06/17 3:42 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Notice of Unavailability of Subchapter V trustee for June 18, 2024 Hearing Filed by Trustee Aaron R. Cohen . (Cohen, Aaron) |
|
16 | 16
notice
Notice (DO NOT USE for appearances or hearings)
Mon 06/17 3:03 PM
Notice of Unavailability of Subchapter V trustee for June 18, 2024 Hearing Filed by Trustee Aaron R. Cohen . (Cohen, Aaron) |
|
15 | 15
1
pgs
trustee
Notice of Appointment of Subchapter V Trustee
Mon 06/17 11:03 AM
Notice of Appointment of Chapter 11, Subchapter V Trustee . Aaron R. Cohen added to the case. Meeting of Creditors scheduled for July 15, 2024, at 11:00 a.m. in Room N/A. The meeting will be held by telephone. Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee - ORL. (Bomkamp, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 2 pgs Exhibit A: Statement of Aaron Cohen | ||
Saturday, June 15, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest
Sun 06/16 12:18 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest . Notice Date 06/15/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, June 13, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Hearing (BK)
Thu 06/13 6:41 PM
Notice of Preliminary Hearing on Emergency Motion for Authority to Pay Affiliate Officer Salaries and Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral Filed by Michael Faro on behalf of Debtor Hurricane Creek LLC . Hearing scheduled for 6/18/2024 at 03:00 PM at Orlando, FL - Courtroom 6A, 6th Floor, George C. Young Courthouse, 400 W. Washington Street . (Faro, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Mailing Matrix | ||
12 | 12
misc
Tax Documents
Thu 06/13 3:15 PM
Tax Documents for the Year 2023 Filed by Michael Faro on behalf of Debtor Hurricane Creek LLC. (Ana) |
|
11 | 11
court
Notice of Deficient Filing (BK)
Thu 06/13 2:54 PM
Amended Notice of Deficient Filing. Missing Summary of Assets, Schedules, Statement of Financial Affairs, Disclosure of Compensation and Corporate Resolution Authorizing Filing of Bankruptcy Petition (Amended to Remove Small Balance Sheet as a Deficiency) . (Ana) |
|
10 | 10
court
Notice of Deficient Filing (BK)
Thu 06/13 12:40 PM
Notice of Deficient Filing. Missing Summary of Assets, Schedules, Statement of Financial Affairs, Disclosure of Compensation, Small Business Balance Sheet, Corporate Resolution Authorizing Filing Of Bankruptcy Petition, . (Ana) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Notice of Change of Address - Party
Thu 06/13 11:34 AM
Notice of Change of Address As to Noticing Address Only Filed by Michael Faro on behalf of Debtor Hurricane Creek LLC. (Faro, Michael) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Notice of Change of Address - Party
Thu 06/13 11:33 AM
Notice of Change of Address As to Noticing Address Only Filed by Michael Faro on behalf of Debtor Hurricane Creek LLC. (Faro, Michael) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Notice of Change of Address - Party
Thu 06/13 11:17 AM
Notice of Change of Address As to Noticing Address Only Filed by Michael Faro on behalf of Debtor Hurricane Creek LLC. (Faro, Michael) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Notice of Change of Address - Party
Thu 06/13 9:33 AM
Notice of Change of Address As to Noticing Address Only Filed by Michael Faro on behalf of Debtor Hurricane Creek LLC. (Faro, Michael) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Motion to Use Cash Collateral
Thu 06/13 12:51 AM
Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral Filed by Michael Faro on behalf of Debtor Hurricane Creek LLC |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Necessity of Request for Emergency Hearing | ||
Att: 2 Mailing Matrix | ||
4 | 4
misc
Chapter 11 Case Management Summary
Thu 06/13 12:48 AM
Chapter 11 Case Management Summary Filed by Michael Faro on behalf of Debtor Hurricane Creek LLC. (Faro, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Mailing Matrix | ||
court
Prepare Hearing Notice - Automation Use Only
Thu 06/13 1:04 PM
Preliminary Hearing Scheduled for 06/18/2024 3:00 PM Orlando, FL - Courtroom 6A, 6th Floor, George C. Young Courthouse, 400 W. Washington Street. Re: Emergency Motion for Authority to Pay Affiliate Officer Salaries Doc3 . This entry is not an official notice of hearing from the court. Noticing Instructions : The Court directs Michael Faro to prepare, file, and serve a notice of hearing that includes the information on the Notice of Hearing Sample Form available at https://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/proguide/documents/Samples/Notice_of_Hearing_Bankruptcy_Sample_Form.pdf?id=1 Counsel must file and serve the notice of hearing on interested parties within 3 days. If the hearing is on an Emergency/Expedited matter, then counsel must file and serve the notice of hearing immediately upon receipt of this directive. If the notice of hearing is not timely served and filed, then the Court will remove it from the hearing calendar and, in its discretion, may deny the relief requested. If notice of the hearing is not timely served and filed, then the Court will remove it from the hearing calendar and, in its discretion, may deny the relief requested. . (Bill) |
||
court
Prepare Hearing Notice - Automation Use Only
Thu 06/13 1:04 PM
Preliminary Hearing Scheduled for 06/18/2024 3:00 PM Orlando, FL - Courtroom 6A, 6th Floor, George C. Young Courthouse, 400 W. Washington Street. Re: Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral Doc5 . This entry is not an official notice of hearing from the court. Noticing Instructions : The Court directs Michael Faro to prepare, file, and serve a notice of hearing that includes the information on the Notice of Hearing Sample Form available at https://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/proguide/documents/Samples/Notice_of_Hearing_Bankruptcy_Sample_Form.pdf?id=1 Counsel must file and serve the notice of hearing on interested parties within 3 days. If the hearing is on an Emergency/Expedited matter, then counsel must file and serve the notice of hearing immediately upon receipt of this directive. If the notice of hearing is not timely served and filed, then the Court will remove it from the hearing calendar and, in its discretion, may deny the relief requested. If notice of the hearing is not timely served and filed, then the Court will remove it from the hearing calendar and, in its discretion, may deny the relief requested. . (Bill) |
||
Wednesday, June 12, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Motion for Authority to Pay Affiliate Officer Salaries
Wed 06/12 10:50 PM
Emergency Motion for Authority to Pay Affiliate Officer Salaries Filed by Michael Faro on behalf of Debtor Hurricane Creek LLC |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Necessity of Request for Emergency Hearing | ||
Att: 2 Mailing Matrix | ||
2 | 2
misc
Statement of Corporate Ownership
Wed 06/12 1:54 AM
Statement of Corporate Ownership. Filed by Michael Faro on behalf of Debtor Hurricane Creek LLC. (Faro, Michael) |
|
1 | 1
40
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Wed 06/12 1:41 AM
Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11. SubchapterV. (Verify Fee). Schedules and Statements Incomplete, Statement of Financial Affairs Not Filed or Incomplete, Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney Not Filed or Not Required, Filed by Michael Faro on behalf of Hurricane Creek LLC. Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 09/10/2024. (Faro, Michael) |
|
crditcrd
Receipt of Filing Fee
Wed 06/12 1:43 AM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:6:24-bk-02935] ) [misc,volp11a2] (1738.00). Receipt Number A75723136, Amount Paid $1738.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
||
court
ADI - Notice to Debtor(s) Attorney Regarding Local Rule 2081-1 (Paperless Entry)
Wed 06/12 9:00 PM
Debtor(s) Attorney and Unrepresented Debtor(s) are directed to comply with all requirements set forth in Local Rule 2081-1. The Court's Local Rule can be found at[LINK:http://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/localrules/rules/2081-1.pdf] . (ADIclerk) |