Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 4:24-mj-00252
Case Filed:Jun 10, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 12, 2024 2:19 AM CDT
Defendant
Cesar Humberto Lopez-Larios (1)
Represented By
Javier O. Martinez
Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
USA


Docket last updated: 06/12/2024 3:03 AM CDT
Monday, June 10, 2024
Arrest (Rule 40) of Cesar Humberto Lopez-Larios, filed. (glk4)
Related: [-]
***Set/Reset Hearings as to Cesar Humberto Lopez-Larios: Initial Appearance - Rule 40 set for 6/10/2024 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Yvonne Y Ho (glk4)
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Yvonne Y Ho: INITIAL APPEARANCE IN RULE 5(c)(3) PROCEEDINGS as to Cesar Humberto Lopez-Larios held on 6/10/2024. Defendant requests appointed counsel. Financial Affidavit executed on the record. Order appointing CJA Attorney. Defendant appeared with counsel. Brady order administered. Defendant WAIVES identity hearing. Defendant WAIVES detention hearing in the Southern District of Texas, but reserves the right to hold the detention hearing in the EDNY. Defendant ordered removed to originating district. Appearances: AUSA: Anh-Khoa Tran; CJA: Javier Martinez. (ERO: Yes) (Interpreter: Yes) Deft remanded to Custody of US Marshal, filed. (rlw4)
Related: [-]
1 1 Indictment from Eastern District of New York, Central Islip as to Cesar Humberto Lopez-Larios, filed. (glk4)
Related: [-]
2 2 Arrest Warrant issued 12/16/2020; Returned Executed on 6/9/2024 as to Cesar Humberto Lopez-Larios. Defendant was arrested in Houston, TX. Document restricted from PACER under privacy policy., filed. (glk4)
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL FOR LIMITED PURPOSE for Defendant Cesar Humberto Lopez-Larios. Javier Martinez appointed. ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Yvonne Y Ho) Parties notified. (rlw4)
Related: [-]
4 4 BRADY ORDER on Rule 5(f) as to Cesar Humberto Lopez-Larios ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Yvonne Y Ho) Parties notified. (rlw4)
Related: [-]