Texas Western District Court
Case #: 6:24-cr-00121
Case Filed:Jun 11, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Jun 13, 2024 2:35 AM CDT
Defendant
Brent Haynes (1)
Represented By
Kurt Gene May
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Duty Pub. Defender-Waco
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Christopher Michael Blanton
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info

GPO Dec 17 2024
FINDINGS OF FACT AND RECOMMENDATION on felony guilty plea before the United States Magistrate Judge as to Caleb Deion Viewins. Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (cav)
GPO Jan 03 2025
ORDER accepting re 171 Findings of Fact on Plea as to Caleb Deion Viewins. Guilty plea accepted for count 1s. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bw)
GPO Jan 14 2025
FINDINGS OF FACT AND RECOMMENDATION on felony guilty plea before the United States Magistrate Judge as to Brent Haynes. Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (lad)
GPO Jan 14 2025
FINDINGS OF FACT AND RECOMMENDATION on felony guilty plea before the United States Magistrate Judge as to Marcus Clayton Catchings. Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (lad)
GPO Jan 30 2025
ORDER accepting re 192 Findings of Fact on Plea as to Brent Haynes. Guilty plea accepted Count One S (1s). Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (cav)
GPO Jan 30 2025
ORDER accepting re 193 Findings of Fact on Plea as to Marcus Clayton Catchings. Guilty plea accepted to Counts Two S (2s) and Three S (3s). Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (cav)
GPO Mar 04 2025
FINDINGS OF FACT AND RECOMMENDATION on felony guilty plea before the United States Magistrate Judge as to Major Bryce Gonzales. Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (cav)
GPO Mar 11 2025
ORDER accepting re 208 Findings of Fact on Plea as to Major Bryce Gonzales. Guilty plea accepted to count 1s. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad)

Docket last updated: 06/13/2024 3:29 AM CDT
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
Arrest of Brent Haynes. (cav) Modified on 6/3/2024 to update arrest date(cav). [6:24-mj-00122-JCM]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske as to Brent Haynes (1). (cav) [6:24-mj-00122-JCM]
Related: [-]
2 2 Arrest Warrant Issued by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske as to Brent Haynes. (cav) [6:24-mj-00122-JCM]
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
10 10 ARREST Warrant Returned Executed on 5/28/2024 as to Brent Haynes. (cav) [6:24-mj-00122-JCM]
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
ORAL MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Brent Haynes. (cav) [6:24-mj-00122-JCM]
Related: [-]
3 3 Waiver of rights and consent to proceed by Video Conference by Brent Haynes. (cav) [6:24-mj-00122-JCM]
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jeffrey C. Manske:Initial Appearance as to Brent Haynes held on 5/31/2024. Detention Hearing set for 6/5/2024 11:00 AM before Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Preliminary Hearing set for 6/5/2024 11:00 AM before Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Defendant requests appointment of counsel. Defendant HAS completed the CJA23 financial affidavit and the Court will appoint counsel because: The defendant is indigent at this time. Attorney Duty Pub. Defender-Waco for Brent Haynes added. Government orally moves for detention. Temporary Detention is ordered until Detention Hearing. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.)(Court Reporter FTR.) (cav) [6:24-mj-00122-JCM]
Related: [-]
5 5 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Brent Haynes (SEALED pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002). (cav) [6:24-mj-00122-JCM]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (cav) [6:24-mj-00122-JCM]
Related: [-]
7 7 Order Regarding Due Process Protections Act as to Brent Haynes. Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (cav) [6:24-mj-00122-JCM]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION: Bond set to NO BOND as to Brent Haynes. Detention Hearing set for 6/5/2024 11:00 AM before Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Preliminary Hearing set for 6/5/2024 11:00 AM before Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (cav) [6:24-mj-00122-JCM]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER SETTING PRELIMINARY / DETENTION HEARING as to Brent Haynes. Detention/Preliminary Hearing set for 6/5/2024 11:00 AM before Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (cav) [6:24-mj-00122-JCM]
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
11 11 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Kurt Gene May appearing for Brent Haynes . Attorney Kurt Gene May added to party Brent Haynes(pty:dft) (May, Kurt) [6:24-mj-00122-JCM]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
12 12 Waiver of Preliminary Hearing by Brent Haynes (May, Kurt) [6:24-mj-00122-JCM]
Related: [-]
13 13 ORDER CANCELLING PRELIMINARY / DETENTION HEARING as to Brent Haynes. PRELIMINARY / DETENTION HEARING on 06/05/2024 at 11:00 AM is hereby CANCELLED. Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (cav) [6:24-mj-00122-JCM]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
14 14 INDICTMEN Related [+] filed. Unredacted document sealed pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002 as to Brent Haynes (1) count(s) 1. (bot2)
Related: [-] dacted Version
16 16 Personal Data Sheet (SEALED) as to Brent Haynes (bot2)
Related: [-]