Georgia Southern District Court
Judge:Lisa G Wood
Referred: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Case #: 4:24-cv-00121
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Jun 12, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 11, 2024 3:33 AM EST
Defendant
City of Midway, Georgia
Represented By
Patrick L. Lail
Elarbee, Thompson, Sapp & Wilson LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Kelli Morningstar
Represented By
Roland Mumford
Roland Mumford
contact info


Docket last updated: 89 minutes ago
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
24 24 minutes Status Conference Thu 04/24 1:16 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro: Telephonic Status Conference held on 4/23/2025. (Tape #BWC-CHAMBERS.) (KM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
23 23 misc Status Report Thu 04/17 1:24 PM
STATUS REPORT by City of Midway, Georgia. (Lail, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
22 22 2 pgs order Order 1 - Terminate Hearings Tue 04/08 3:27 PM
ORDER canceling the telephonic status conference currently set for April 9, 2025. The Amended Scheduling Order remains the Order of this Court, and the deadline for all fact discovery, including written discovery and fact witness depositions, remains April 29, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 04/08/2025. (jlh)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Tue 04/08 4:16 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: Telephonic Status Conference set for 4/9/2025 04:00 PM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro is cancelled. (KM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
notice Notice of Hearing Thu 04/03 11:20 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Status Conference set for 4/9/2025 04:00 PM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro. Dial-in instructions will be provided by Courtroom Deputy prior to scheduled call. (KM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
21 21 order Scheduling Order Thu 02/27 3:50 PM
Amended SCHEDULING ORDER granting oral request during telephonic status conference held on February 25, 2025: Discovery due by 4/29/2025; Motions due by 5/29/2025; Pretrial Order due by 7/28/2025; Expert Witness Report (Plaintiff) due by 2/27/2025; Expert Witness Report (Defendant) due by 3/29/2025; and Status Report due by 4/18/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 02/27/2025. (jlh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
20 20 minutes Status Conference Wed 02/26 2:23 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro: Telephonic Status Conference held on 2/25/2025. (Tape #BWC-CHAMBERS.) (KM)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
notice Notice of Hearing Fri 02/21 12:12 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Status Conference set for 2/25/2025 03:00 PM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro. Dial-in instructions will be provided by Courtroom Deputy prior to scheduled call. (KM)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
19 19 notice Notice (Other) Mon 01/06 4:41 PM
NOTICE of Restriction of Discovery Related Materials re: 18 Deposition. (csr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
17 17 6 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Tue 12/17 9:51 AM
ORDER granting16 Joint Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 12/17/2024. (amd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
utility Motions Referred Wed 12/11 10:07 AM
MOTIONS REFERRED:16 Joint MOTION for Protective Order Joint Motion for Entry of Protective Order (thb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
16 16 motion Protective Order Tue 12/10 5:26 PM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order Joint Motion for Entry of Protective Order by City of Midway, Georgia. Responses due by 12/24/2024.(Lail, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Consent Protective Proposed Order
Monday, August 26, 2024
15 15 misc Litigants' Bill of Rights Mon 08/26 6:04 PM
Litigants' Bill of Rights by Kelli Morningstar. (Mumford, Roland)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Litigants' Bill of Rights Mon 08/26 5:45 PM
Litigants' Bill of Rights by City of Midway, Georgia. (Lail, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
notice Notice of Hearing Wed 08/21 1:30 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Status Conference set for 4/23/2025 03:00 PM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro. Dial-in instructions will be provided by Courtroom Deputy prior to scheduled call. (KM)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
13 13 2 pgs order Order Mon 08/19 11:43 AM
ORDER granting the request for a Court Order under Federal Rule of Evidence 502(d) re11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. This Order is subject to the following modifications: (1) Nothing in this Order shall be construed as relieving any party from the obligation imposed by Local Rule 79.7 to file a motion seeking the sealing of confidential documents; and (2) Nothing in this Order shall be construed as limiting the Courts discretion to determine whether evidence should be protected from public disclosure in contravention of the strong presumption in favor of access to court records. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 8/19/24. (wwp)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Scheduling Order Mon 08/19 11:31 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 9/12/2024. Discovery due by 1/27/2025. Motions due by 5/29/2025. Pretrial Order due by 7/28/2025. Expert Witness Report (Plaintiff) due by 2/27/2025. Expert Witness Report (defendant) due by 3/29/2025. Status Report due by 4/18/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 8/19/24. (wwp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
11 11 motion Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Wed 08/14 1:05 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Lail, Patrick)
Related: [-]
utility Motions Referred Wed 08/14 3:04 PM
MOTIONS REFERRED:11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (csr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Clerk's Extension of Time (LR 6.1) Tue 08/13 10:23 AM
ORDER granting9 Motion for Clerk's Extension of Time (LR 6.1). Litigant's Bill of Rights due by 8/26/2024. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 08/13/2024. (thb)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Document Mon 08/12 4:35 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Litigant's Bill of Rights by City of Midway, Georgia. Responses due by 8/26/2024. (Lail, Patrick)
Related: [-]
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 08/12 3:55 PM
Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by City of Midway, Georgia.(Lail, Patrick)
Related: [-]
utility Motions Referred Mon 08/12 4:57 PM
MOTIONS REFERRED:9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Litigant's Bill of Rights (thb)
Related: [-]
utility Motions No Longer Referred Mon 08/12 4:58 PM
Motions No Longer Referred:9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Litigant's Bill of Rights (thb)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 06/24 10:41 AM
TEXT ORDER granting6 Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall file its desired responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before August 12, 2024. The Court directs the Clerk of Court to amend this deadline upon the record and docket of this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on June 24, 2024. (edd)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
6 6 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 06/21 10:24 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 Complaint by City of Midway, Georgia. Responses due by 7/5/2024.(Lail, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
utility Motions Referred Fri 06/21 11:48 AM
MOTIONS REFERRED:6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 Complaint. (csr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
5 5 order Rule 26(f) Order Thu 06/13 9:14 AM
RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 6/13/2024. (gmh)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Thu 06/13 9:13 AM
Summons Issued as to City of Midway, Georgia. (gmh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
3 3 misc Litigants' Bill of Rights Thu 06/13 9:12 AM
Litigants' Bill of Rights by Kelli Morningstar. (gmh)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 06/13 9:12 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kelli Morningstar. (gmh)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 06/13 9:10 AM
COMPLAINT against City of Midway, Georgia, filed by Kelli Morningstar. Filing Fee paid, $405.00, Receipt #AGASDC-3842830. (gmh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - EEOC Charge,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Right to Sue Letter,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet