Kansas District Court
Judge:Toby Crouse
Referred: Gwynne E Birzer
Case #: 2:24-cv-02245
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Jun 13, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 11, 2024 3:41 AM CST
Defendant
Wellsky
Represented By
Daniel Patrick Johnson
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, Pc - Kc
contact info
Madeline Nebel
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, Pc - Kc
contact info
Plaintiff
Aspen Chacon
Represented By
Alexis Pearson
Missouri Kansas Queer Law
contact info

GPO Mar 31 2025
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 4 Defendant's Partial Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Toby Crouse on 3/31/2025. (mam)

Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
35 35 misc Certificate of Service Tue 04/29 4:44 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Supplemental Answers and Responses to Plaintiff's First Interrogatories and First Request for Documents by Wellsky. (Nebel, Madeline)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
34 34 discov Notice to Take Deposition Tue 04/22 3:49 PM
NOTICE by Defendant Wellsky of taking deposition of Aspen Chacon on May 20, 2025 (Johnson, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
33 33 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 04/17 10:36 AM
ORDER granting32 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Motion to Enforce Discovery. Plaintiff's deadline to file any motion to compel additional response to her First Interrogatories and First Requests for Document Production is extended up to and including May 16, 2025. Due to the proximity to the deadline for the close of discovery, Plaintiff is highly encouraged not to seek further extension of this deadline and is reminded to contact the undersigned's chambers to request a pre-motion conference prior to filing a motion to compel. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 4/17/2025. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (kf)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
32 32 motion Extension of Time Mon 04/14 12:56 PM
Unopposed MOTION for extension of time to file Motion to Enforce Discovery by Plaintiff Aspen Chacon Related [+] (Pearson, Alexis)
Related: [-] ferred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer
Monday, March 31, 2025
31 31 8 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Mon 03/31 5:04 PM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting4 Defendant's Partial Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Toby Crouse on 3/31/2025. (mam)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
30 30 misc Certificate of Service Mon 03/17 4:41 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Answers and Responses to Plaintiff's First Interrogatories and Request for Documents and Privilege Log by Wellsky. (Nebel, Madeline)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
29 29 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 01/10 3:24 PM
ORDER granting28 Defendant's Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Motion to Enforce Discovery. Defendant's deadline to file any motion to compel additional response to its First Interrogatories and First Requests for Document Production is extended up to and including February 14, 2025. Defendant is highly encouraged not to seek further extension of this deadline and is reminded to contact the undersigned's chambers to request a pre-motion conference prior to filing a motion to compel. IT IS OR ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 1/10/2025. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (kf)
Related: [-]
28 28 motion Extension of Time Fri 01/10 1:59 PM
Unopposed MOTION for extension of time to file Motion to Enforce Discovery (2nd) by Defendant Wellsky Related [+] (Nebel, Madeline)
Related: [-] ferred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer
Thursday, January 02, 2025
27 27 misc Certificate of Service Thu 01/02 11:37 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of First Round of Discovery Requests by Aspen Chacon. (Pearson, Alexis)
Related: [-]
26 26 misc Certificate of Service Thu 01/02 11:36 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Second Round of Discovery Requests by Aspen Chacon. (Pearson, Alexis)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
25 25 misc Certificate of Service Fri 12/20 3:45 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Supplement Responses to First Discovery Requests by Aspen Chacon. (Pearson, Alexis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
24 24 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 12/18 1:22 PM
ORDER. After corresponding with counsel, the Court finds the motion is unopposed and grants23 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File a Motion to Enforce Discovery. Defendant's deadline to file any motion to compel additional response to its First Interrogatories and First Requests for Document Production is extended up to and including 1/15/2025. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 12/18/2024. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (kf)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
23 23 motion Extension of Time Fri 12/13 3:35 PM
MOTION for extension of time to File a Motion to Enforce Discovery by Defendant Wellsky Related [+] (Nebel, Madeline)
Related: [-] ferred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer
Thursday, November 21, 2024
22 22 misc Certificate of Service Thu 11/21 8:51 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant's 2nd Requests for Documents to Plaintiff by Wellsky. (Nebel, Madeline)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
21 21 misc Certificate of Service Fri 11/15 11:24 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Certificate Of Service Defendant's First Round of Discovery by Aspen Chacon. (Pearson, Alexis)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
20 20 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines Fri 11/01 3:24 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Estimated trial time 5 days. Discovery deadline 6/6/2025. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 6/24/2025. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/30/2025 at 11:00 AM by Video Conference - Zoom before Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer. Dispositive motion deadline 8/22/2025. Jury Trial set for 5/5/2026 at 09:00 AM in KC Courtroom (Unknown) before District Judge Toby Crouse. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on November 1, 2024. (mls)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
19 19 minutes Scheduling Conference Thu 10/31 3:40 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 10/31/2024. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ala)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
18 18 10 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Fri 10/25 11:27 AM
JOINT AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER granting 17 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 10/25/2024. (jal)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Protective Order Fri 10/25 10:59 AM
Joint Oral Motion for Protective Order by Plaintiff Aspen Chacon and Defendant WellSky Related [+] (kf)
Related: [-] ferred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer
Thursday, October 24, 2024
16 16 notice Notice of Service Thu 10/24 2:00 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE by Aspen Chacon of Plaintiff's Initial Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures (Pearson, Alexis)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Certificate of Service Thu 10/24 12:50 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Initial Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures by Wellsky (Johnson, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
14 14 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 10/18 8:29 AM
REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendant Wellsky re:4 Motion to Dismiss (Nebel, Madeline)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 14, 2024
13 13 service Certificate of Service Mon 10/14 8:48 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant's First Interrogatories and First Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff by Wellsky (Johnson, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
12 12 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 10/08 10:42 AM
ORDER granting11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Retaliation Claim (Count III) ,5 Memorandum in Support of Motion. Reply deadline 10/18/2024. Signed by District Judge Toby Crouse on 10/8/24. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ta)
Related: [-]
utility Motions No Longer Referred Tue 10/08 9:03 AM
MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to 4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Retaliation Claim (Count III), 5 Memorandum in Support of Motion. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge. (kf)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 10/07 5:04 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Retaliation Claim (Count III) ,5 Memorandum in Support of Motion by Defendant Wellsky Related [+] (Nebel, Madeline)
Related: [-] ferred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer
Friday, September 27, 2024
10 10 respm Response to Motion Fri 09/27 3:50 PM
RESPONSE by Plaintiff Aspen Chacon re4 Motion to Dismiss (Pearson, Alexis)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
9 9 misc Entry of Appearance Mon 09/09 4:28 PM
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Madeline Nebel on behalf of Wellsky (Nebel, Madeline)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling Mon 09/09 12:12 PM
INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 10/31/2024 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer. Participants shall dial into the conference call at 888-363-4749, enter access code 9686294#, and follow the prompts to join the call. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures and Proposed Scheduling Order due 10/24/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 9/9/24. (ala)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
7 7 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 09/06 2:16 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wellsky identifying WestPort Acquistion Parent, LP as corporate parent . (Johnson, Daniel)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 09/06 2:13 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Wellsky.(Johnson, Daniel)
Related: [-]
5 5 12 pgs support Memorandum in Support of Motion Fri 09/06 2:12 PM
MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Retaliation Claim (Count III) by Defendant Wellsky(Johnson, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 -- Charge of Discrimination
4 4 motion Dismiss Fri 09/06 2:11 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Retaliation Claim (Count III) by Defendant Wellsky (Johnson, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2024
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 07/26 8:50 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Aspen Chacon. Wellsky waiver sent on 7/8/2024, answer due 9/6/2024. (Pearson, Alexis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 06/13 9:50 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Aspen Chacon. (Pearson, Alexis)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (attorney) Thu 06/13 9:48 AM
COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $405, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6380099.), filed by Aspen Chacon.(Pearson, Alexis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A
notice Notice of Judge Assignment Thu 06/13 10:13 AM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Toby Crouse and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY: A United States magistrate judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action if all parties voluntarily consent. Information & consent forms are available at http://www.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-forms/notice-consent-and-reference-civil-action-magistrate-judge (jk)
Related: [-]