New York Southern District Court
Judge:Margaret M Garnett
Case #: 1:24-cv-04542
Nature of Suit240 Real Property - Torts to Land
Cause28:1332t Diversity-Torts
Case Filed:Jun 13, 2024
Terminated:Nov 15, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 11, 2024 3:56 AM EST
Defendant
Citibank N.A.
Plaintiff
Victor M Feraru dba Law Office of Victor M. Feraru
Represented By
Victor M. Feraru
Law Office Of Victor Feraru
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, November 15, 2024
11 11 3 pgs order Order of Dismissal Fri 11/15 11:42 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL: For all of the reasons stated above, it is hereby ORDERED that this case is dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE the case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Margaret M. Garnett on 11/15/2024) (mml)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
10 10 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Wed 10/30 6:12 PM
ORDER granting9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. Application GRANTED. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall properly request issuance of a summons, by no later than November 8, 2024. Once a summons has been properly requested and issued, Plaintiff must promptly serve Defendant Citibank, N.A. and file proof of such service on the docket within three business days of service. In the event a summons has not been properly requested and issued by November 8, 2024, this case will be dismissed for failure to prosecute without further notice to any party. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate Dkt. No. 9. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Margaret M. Garnett on 10/30/2024) (ks)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Document Tue 10/29 7:18 PM
FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Summons and Serve addressed to Judge Margaret M. Garnett from Victor M. Feraru dated Octoboer 29, 2024. Document filed by Victor M Feraru dba Law Office of Victor M. Feraru..(Feraru, Victor)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2024
8 8 1 pgs order Order 1 - Terminate Hearings Fri 08/23 5:25 PM
ORDER Plaintiff initiated the above-captioned action on June 13, 2024. After multiple filing errors (see Dkt. Nos. 1, 4, 5) Plaintiff properly filed the complaint on June 14, 2024. See Dkt. No. 6. On June 13, 2024, Plaintiff improperly filed a Request for Issuance of a Summons as to Defendant Citibank, N.A. Dkt. No. 2. Unlike the filing of the complaint, Plaintiff did not correct the improperly filed Request for Issuance of a Summons. Therefore, no summons has been issued in this matter, despite the passage of over two months since its filing. It is hereby ORDERED that the Initial Pretrial Conference scheduled for August 27, 2024 is ADJOURNED sine die. Plaintiff is directed to properly request issuance of a summons by September 23, 2024. Once a summons has been properly requested and issued, Plaintiff must serve Defendant Citibank, N.A. and file proof of such service on the docket within three business days of service. In the event a summons has not been requested and issued by September 23, 2024, this case will be dismissed for failure to prosecute without further notice to any party. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Margaret M. Garnett on 8/23/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
7 7 2 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Thu 06/20 12:40 PM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT AND INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Counsel for all parties shall appear for an Initial Pretrial Conference with the Court on Tuesday, August 27, 2024 at 9:30 a.m. The conference will be held in person in Courtroom 906 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York 10007. Additionally,in accordance with Rule II(A)(5) of the Individual Rules, the parties are hereby ORDERED to file on ECF a joint letter, as well as a proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order attached as an exhibit to the joint letter, no later than August 20, 2024. The parties shall use this Court's form proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order, which is also availableat https://nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-margaret-m-garnett. Counsel who have entered a notice of appearance as of the issuance of this Order are directed (1) to notify counsel for all other parties in this action who have not yet appeared by serving upon each of them a copy of this Order and the Court's Individual Rules forthwith, and (2) to file proof of such notice with the Court. If unaware of the identity of counsel for any of the parties, counsel receiving this Order must forthwith send a copy of this Order and the Individual Rules to that party personally. SO ORDERED. (Initial Conference set for 8/27/2024 at 09:30 PM in Courtroom 906, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Margaret M. Garnett.) (Signed by Judge Margaret M. Garnett on 6/20/24) (yv)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Mon 06/17 10:19 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Mon 06/17 10:24 AM
Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 06/17 10:27 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment Mon 06/17 12:44 PM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Margaret M. Garnett. Judge Analisa Torres is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
6 6 cmp Complaint Fri 06/14 5:46 PM
COMPLAINT against Citibank N.A.. Document filed by Victor M Feraru dba Law Office of Victor M. Feraru..(Feraru, Victor)
Related: [-]
5 5 cmp Complaint Fri 06/14 2:34 PM
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - COMPLAINT against Citibank N.A.. Document filed by Victor M Feraru dba Law Office of Victor M. Feraru..(Feraru, Victor) Modified on 6/14/2024 (pc)
Related: [-]
4 4 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 06/14 11:45 AM
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FRCP RULE 15 NON-COMPLIANCE - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending1 Complaint against Citibank N.A..Document filed by Victor M Feraru dba Law Office of Victor M. Feraru. Related document:1 Complaint..(Feraru, Victor) Modified on 6/14/2024 (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Fri 06/14 1:15 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Victor M. Feraru. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Nature of Suit code 240 (Torts to Land); Dollar Demand $30,000,000;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Nature of Suit code has been modified to 380 (Personal Property: Other); the Dollar Demand has been modified to $300,000;. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Fri 06/14 1:15 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Victor M. Feraru. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Victor M Feraru dba Law Office of Victor M. Feraru, Citibank N.A.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly;. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet Fri 06/14 1:15 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Victor M. Feraru to RE-FILE Document No. 1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the event wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet; incorrect citizenship for the defendant was selected;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading Fri 06/14 1:15 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Victor M. Feraru to RE-FILE Document No. 1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 6/20/2024. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 06/14 1:15 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Victor M. Feraru to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; The summons requested was not processed due to the deficient pleading. Please file your request for summons when you correct and refile your pleading;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading Fri 06/14 1:15 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Victor M. Feraru to re: Document No. 4 Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; Court's leave has not been granted. Initial Complaint must be filed correctly and approved before any Amended Pleadings can be filed (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading Fri 06/14 4:52 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Victor M. Feraru to RE-FILE Document No. 5 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; Caption title reads "Amended Complaint". Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 6/20/2024. (pc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
3 3 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 06/13 4:37 PM
FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Victor M Feraru dba Law Office of Victor M. Feraru..(Feraru, Victor)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 06/13 4:36 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Citibank, N.A., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Victor M Feraru dba Law Office of Victor M. Feraru..(Feraru, Victor)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 06/13 4:24 PM
COMPLAINT against Citibank N.A.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29485115)Document filed by Victor M Feraru dba Law Office of Victor M. Feraru..(Feraru, Victor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet