PLA6 113 LLC
New Jersey Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Vincent F Papalia |
Case #: | 2:24-bk-15997 |
Case Filed: | Jun 13, 2024 |
Terminated: | Jul 12, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
PLA6 113 LLC
80 W Century Rd
Paramus, NJ 07652-1437 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
US Dept of Justice Office of the US Trustee One Newark Center Ste 2100
Newark, NJ 07102 |
Docket last updated: 54 minutes ago |
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
order
Final Decree
Fri 07/12 2:14 PM
Final Decree; The following parties were served: US Trustee. (jf) |
|
utility
Close Bankruptcy Case
Fri 07/12 2:15 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. (jf) |
||
Tuesday, July 09, 2024 | ||
court
Hearing Withdrawn (Document)
Tue 07/09 11:37 AM
Hearing Withdrawn as Moot, Case dismissed on 6/27/2024 (jf) |
||
Saturday, June 29, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Dismissing Case
Sun 06/30 12:29 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Dismissing Case. No. of Notices: 11. Notice Date 06/29/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, June 27, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
order
Dismiss Case
Thu 06/27 4:17 PM
Stipulation and Agreed Order Between (I) The Individual and Law Firm that Filed the Above-Captioned Chapter 11 Cases; (II) Lender East Orange Portfolio Owner, LLC; and (III) RS E Orange LLC, Indirect Owner of Borrower Debtors, Providing for the Immediate Dismissal of These Chapter 11 Cases . Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 6/27/2024. (mcp) |
|
court
Hearing Held
Thu 06/27 2:50 PM
Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Granted (mcp) |
||
Monday, June 24, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Certificate of Service
Mon 06/24 10:11 AM
Certificate of Service filed by Brendan Scott on behalf of East Orange Portfolio Owner, LLC. (Scott, Brendan) |
|
Sunday, June 23, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order
Mon 06/24 12:19 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/23/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, June 21, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
order
Shorten Time
Fri 06/21 12:05 PM
Order Granting Application to Shorten Time . Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 6/21/2024. Hearing scheduled for 6/27/2024 at 11:30 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (rah) |
|
Thursday, June 20, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Shorten Time
Thu 06/20 4:35 PM
Application to Shorten Time Filed by Brendan Scott on behalf of East Orange Portfolio Owner, LLC. (Scott, Brendan) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Dismiss Case
Thu 06/20 4:33 PM
Motion to dismiss case for other reasons re:Pursuant to Stipulation and Agreed Order for Cause Pursuant to 1112(b) of Bankruptcy Code Based Upon Lack of Legal Authority Filed by Brendan Scott on behalf of East Orange Portfolio Owner, LLC. (Scott, Brendan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Stipulation and Agreed Order | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Order Shortening Time and Excusing Receiver Compliance | ||
Sunday, June 16, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order
Mon 06/17 12:15 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/16/2024. (Admin.) |
|
6 | 6
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
Mon 06/17 12:15 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors. No. of Notices: 11. Notice Date 06/16/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, June 14, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
order
Show Cause
Fri 06/14 4:40 PM
Order to Show Cause Why Case Should Not be Dismissed for re: Failure to File Missing Documents. Missing Documents: Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals, Statement of Financial Affairs For Non-Individuals, Atty Disclosure Statement, List of Equity Security Holders, Schedules A/B,D,E/F,G,H, Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 6/14/2024. Hearing scheduled for 7/10/2024 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (Browne, Christopher) |
|
4 | 4
order
Show Cause
Fri 06/14 1:29 PM
Order to Show Cause Why Case Should Not be Dismissed for re: Failure to File Missing Documents. Missing Documents: Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals, Statement of Financial Affairs For Non-Individuals, Atty Disclosure Statement, List of Equity Security Holders, Schedules A/B,D,E/F,G,H, Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 6/14/2024. Hearing scheduled for 6/11/2024 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (Browne, Christopher) |
|
3 | 3
court
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11
Fri 06/14 11:06 AM
Meeting of Creditors - Chapter 11. 341(a) meeting to be held on 7/17/2024 at 11:00 AM at Telephonic. Proofs of Claim due by 8/22/2024. Government Proof of Claim due by 12/10/2024. (rah) |
|
court
Hearing Withdrawn (Document)
Fri 06/14 4:32 PM
Hearing Withdrawn (Browne, Christopher) |
||
court
Notice of Docketing Error
Fri 06/14 4:35 PM
Correction Notice in Electronic Filing . Type of Error: ENTERED IN ERROR, (Browne, Christopher) |
||
Thursday, June 13, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
utility
Case Assigned
Thu 06/13 11:56 PM
Case Assignment. Judge Vincent F. Papalia added to the case as Petition Lists Associated Cases 24-15881 24-15883 24-15993 24-15994 and 24-15995 (rah) |
|
1 | 1
13
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Thu 06/13 10:42 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Douglas J. McGill on behalf of PLA6 113 LLC. Chapter 11 Debtors Exclusive Right to File a Plan Expires on 10/11/2024. (McGill, Douglas) |
|
crditcrd
Credit Card/Debit Card Receipt
Thu 06/13 10:43 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-15997 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A46879326, fee amount $ 1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) |