Steketee v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03517 |
Nature of Suit | 240 Real Property - Torts to Land |
Cause | 28:1442 Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Jun 13, 2024 |
Case in other court: | New Mexico, 1:24-cv-00519 |
Last checked: Sunday Jul 28, 2024 7:50 AM EDT |
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
Kingsway Industries, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson Controls International plc
|
|
Defendant
EI DuPont de Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932 |
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma Management LLC
Archroma Management LLC 4000 Monroe Rd.
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
3M Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jennifer Steketee
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, June 14, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice Other
Fri 06/14 9:57 AM
NOTICE TO NEW COUNSEL : MDL No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (LEAD case) is open as the master docket assigned to Judge Richard M. Gergel, District of South Carolina. This civil action is now associated as a member case. All counsel of record are directed to take the steps necessary to be registered as electronic filers in the District of South Carolina if not previously done so ( See CMO No. 3 pg. 17 Electronic Filing at 22. footnote 5 (ECF Multidistrict Litigation Attorney Registration Form - available at the link at the end of this NOTICE). Judge Gergel directs that CMO Nos. 1 - 30, (including any supplemental CMO Nos. i.e., 2.A, etc.) govern all cases in the MDL proceedings and can be viewed in the Lead case. Counsel will be notified by Liaison Counsel re new Case Management Orders and other new documents posted in the lead case. Please contact lead / liaison counsel before calling the Court (contact information available at the link at the end of this NOTICE). PLEASE also read CLERKS NOTICE (s) TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 and QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE (s) filed in the Lead case. NOTICE of Hearing : Next Monthly Status Conference will be In-Person (absent further Order from the Court) set for 7/19/2024 9:00 AM. The conference will be conducted in Charleston Courtroom #1, U. S. Court House, 83 Meeting St, Charleston before Honorable Richard M Gergel. See the District Court's website containing information on the MDL at[LINK:MDL-2873] (sshe, ) |
|
8 | 8
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Fri 06/14 9:55 AM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: New Mexico (associated as of 6/13/2024), 1:24-cv-00519, Steketee v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-03517-RMG (sshe, ) |
|
6 | 6
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Fri 06/14 9:53 AM
Case transferred in from District of New Mexico; Case Number 1:24-cv-00519. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Thursday, June 13, 2024 | ||
5 | 5 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-194) by JPML (certified copy) transferring this matter to the United States District Court for the District of South Carolina for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1407; assigned to the Honorable Richard M. Gergel (MDL 2873). (kg) [Transferred from New Mexico on 6/14/2024.] | |
Friday, May 24, 2024 | ||
4 | 4 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bc) [Transferred from New Mexico on 6/14/2024.] | |
United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa and United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar assigned. (eh) [Transferred from New Mexico on 6/14/2024.] | ||
Thursday, May 23, 2024 | ||
3 | 3 NOTICE by 3M Company (Notification of Multidistrict Litigation) (Busby, Curtis) [Transferred from New Mexico on 6/14/2024.] | |
2 | 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by 3M Company (Busby, Curtis) [Transferred from New Mexico on 6/14/2024.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by 3M Company from First Judicial District Court of Santa Fe County, New Mexico, case number D-101-CV-202400569. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by 3M Company.(Busby, Curtis) [Transferred from New Mexico on 6/14/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 405 receipt number ANMDC-9373088 re1 Notice of Removal, filed by 3M Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Busby, Curtis) [Transferred from New Mexico on 6/14/2024.] |