City of Barberton v. 3M Company et al.
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03518 |
Nature of Suit | 245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jun 13, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Ohio Northern, 5:24-cv-00890 |
Last checked: Sunday Jul 28, 2024 7:51 AM EDT |
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Archroma Management LLC
Archroma Management LLC 4000 Monroe Rd.
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
13995 Pasteur Boulevard
Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33418 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chemicals Incorporated
Agent Schok K. Moza 12321 Hatcherville
Baytown, TX 77520 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Angus International Safety Group LTD
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John Doe
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
103 Fairview Park Drive
Elmsford, NY 10523 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
Nation Ford Chemical Company 2300 Banks Street
Fort Mill, SC 29715 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Raytheon Technologies Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Fire Products GP Holding LLC
|
|
Defendant
3M Company
3M Center
St. Paul, MN 55133 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Central Sprinkler LLC
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson Controls International PLC
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AGC Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
City of Barberton
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, June 14, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Fri 06/14 11:28 AM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Ohio Northern (associated as of 6/13/2024), 5:24-cv-00890, City of Barberton v. 3M Company et al., as DSC case 2:24-cv-03518-RMG (sshe, ) |
|
9 | 9
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Fri 06/14 10:19 AM
Case transferred in from District of Ohio Northern; Case Number 5:24-cv-00890. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Thursday, June 13, 2024 | ||
8 | 8 Transfer Order by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. In re: MDL No. 2873 Aqueous Film-Forming Foams Products Liability Litigation. Case transferred to the District of South Carolina and assigned to the Honorable Richard M. Gergel. (M,CE) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 6/14/2024.] | |
Wednesday, May 22, 2024 | ||
Order [non-document] granting Defendants Tyco Fire Products LP and Chemguard, Inc.'s unopposed7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer until 28 days from the date of entry of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's decision on whether to transfer. Judge David A. Ruiz on 5/22/2024. (H,Z) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 6/14/2024.] | ||
Tuesday, May 21, 2024 | ||
7 | 7 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until 28 days from the date of entry of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's decision on whether to transfer to the Multidistrict Litigation to answer Plaintiff City of Barberton's Complaint with Memorandum in Support filed by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP.(Rhinehart, Erin) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 6/14/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order | ||
Copy of Notice of Electronic filings re: Assignment of District Judge, Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge, and6 Magistrate Consent Form Issued mailed to defendants E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company, Chemours Company, Chemours Company FC, LLC, Dupont de Nemours, Inc., Corteva, Inc., Kidde PLC, Inc., Chubb Fire, Ltd., UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc., Raytheon Technologies Corporation, Carrier Global Corporation, National Foam, Inc., Angus International Safety Group, Ltd., Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, Arkema, Inc., BASF Corporation, Chemdesign Products, Inc., Dynax Corporation, Chemicals Incorporated, Nation Ford Chemical Company, AGC, Inc., and AGC Chemicals Americas, Inc. to their respective counsels' addresses on the docket. Related document(s)6 . (E,CK) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 6/14/2024.] | ||
Monday, May 20, 2024 | ||
6 | 6 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (E,CK) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 6/14/2024.] | |
5 | 5 Notice of Removal Papers Filed with the Summit County Common Pleas Court filed by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP.(Rhinehart, Erin) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 6/14/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Removal Papers Filed in State Court | ||
4 | 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Tyco Fire Products LP. (Rhinehart, Erin) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 6/14/2024.] | |
3 | 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Chemguard, Inc.. (Rhinehart, Erin) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 6/14/2024.] | |
2 | 2 Attorney Appearance by Morgan K. Napier filed by on behalf of Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP. (Napier, Morgan) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 6/14/2024.] | |
1 | 1 Notice of Removal from Summit County Common Pleas, case number CV-2024 04-1615 Filing fee paid $ 405, receipt number AOHNDC-12565574. Filed by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP.. (Rhinehart, Erin) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 6/14/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A - State Court Filings and Docket, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet and attachment | ||
Judge David A. Ruiz assigned to case. (E,CK) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 6/14/2024.] | ||
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jennifer Dowdell Armstrong. (E,CK) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 6/14/2024.] |