Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust v. Florida Lift Systems, LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-10784
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-10784
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | David S Jones |
Case #: | 1:24-ap-01386 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Jun 14, 2024 |
Terminated: | Sep 10, 2024 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Florida Lift Systems, LLC
115 S. 78th Street
Tampa, FL 33619 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/18/2024 1:09 PM EDT |
Tuesday, September 10, 2024 | ||
misc
Close Adversary Proceeding
Tue 09/10 4:00 PM
Adversary Case 1:24-ap-1386 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Calderon, Lynda) |
||
Tuesday, August 20, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice, Dismissal
Tue 08/20 11:18 AM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Kara E. Casteel on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust.(Casteel, Kara) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Wednesday, June 19, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 06/19 6:32 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Kara E. Casteel on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. (Casteel, Kara) |
|
Monday, June 17, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Mon 06/17 10:29 AM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 7/23/2024 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (DSJ), Answer due by 7/17/2024, (Ramos, Jonathan) |
|
Friday, June 14, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (fee)
Fri 06/14 12:19 PM
Adversary case 24-01386 Complaint against Florida Lift Systems, LLC (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Kara E. Casteel on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. (Casteel, Kara) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Fri 06/14 4:19 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 24-01386 dsj] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A16670009. Fee amount 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |