Edmunds Lewis v. City of Fort Worth
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Reed C O'Connor |
Referred: | Hal R Ray, Jr |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-00553 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 14, 2024 |
Terminated: | Jul 10, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Jul 29, 2024 4:50 AM CDT |
Defendant
City of Fort Worth
|
|
Plaintiff
Megan C Edmunds Lewis
6307 Royalton Dr.
Dallas, TX 75230 |
Docket last updated: 09/15/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, August 26, 2024 | ||
26 | 26
appeal
USCA Order
Mon 08/26 4:08 PM
ORDER of USCA No. 24-10613 as to17 Notice of Appeal, filed by Megan C Edmunds Lewis. Under 5TH CIR. R. 42.3, the petition is dismissed as of August 26, 2024, for want of prosecution. The petitioner failed to timely pay the fee. (tle) |
|
Att: 1 USCA5 Cover Letter | ||
25 | 25
appeal
USCA Order
Mon 08/26 12:21 PM
ORDER of USCA No. 24-10657 as to20 Notice of Appeal, filed by Megan C Edmunds Lewis. Under 5TH CIR. R. 42.3, the appeal is dismissed as of August 26, 2024, for want of prosecution. The appellant failed to timely comply with this courts notice of July 23, 2024, by returning a signed notice of appeal. (tle) |
|
Att: 1 USCA5 Cover Letter | ||
Tuesday, July 30, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
utility
Mail Returned (Public Entry)
Wed 07/31 9:37 AM
Mail returned as undeliverable.5 Consent Form,6 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party received back from Megan C Edmunds Lewis as Not Deliverable as Addressed. Clerk re-mailed documents electronically. (saw) |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
appeal
USCA Case Number
Tue 07/23 3:44 PM
USCA Case Number 24-10657 in United States Court of Appeals 5th Circuit for20 Notice of Appeal, filed by Megan C Edmunds Lewis. (tle) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
appeal
Designation of Record on Appeal
Wed 07/17 2:31 PM
DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal by Megan C Edmunds Lewis re20 Notice of Appeal,,, (Edmunds Lewis, Megan) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
appeal
USCA Letter
Tue 07/16 9:50 AM
Received letter from United States Court of Appeals 5th Circuit No. 24-10613 In re: Megan Edmunds Lewis. We have docketed the petition for writ of mandamus, and ask you to use the case number above in future inquiries. (tle) |
|
20 | 20
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Mon 07/15 12:22 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Fifth Circuit by Megan C Edmunds Lewis. T.O. form to appellant electronically at[LINK:Transcript Order Form] or US Mail as appropriate. Copy of NOA to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. IMPORTANT ACTION REQUIRED: Provide an electronic copy of any exhibit you offered during a hearing or trial that was admitted into evidence to the clerk of the district court within 14 days of the date of this notice. Copies must be transmitted as PDF attachments through ECF by all ECF Users or delivered to the clerk on a CD by all non-ECF Users. See detailed instructions[LINK:here] . (Exception: This requirement does not apply to a pro se prisoner litigant.) Please note that if original exhibits are in your possession, you must maintain them through final disposition of the case. (Edmunds Lewis, Megan) |
|
Wednesday, July 10, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
order
Judgment
Wed 07/10 11:13 AM
FINAL JUDGMENT: This Judgment is issued pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 58(a). This action came on for consideration by the Court, and the issues having been duly considered and a decision duly rendered, It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that: 1. This case is DISMISSED with prejudice. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 7/10/2024) (saw) |
|
18 | 18
1
pgs
order
Order Accepting/Adopting Findings and Recommendations
Wed 07/10 11:09 AM
ORDER ACCEPTING FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The undersigned District Judge believes that the12 Findings and Conclusions of the Magistrate Judge are correct, and they are accepted as the Findings and Conclusions of the Court. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 7/10/2024) (saw) |
|
Tuesday, July 09, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Tue 07/09 3:28 PM
NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL to the Fifth Circuit by Megan C Edmunds Lewis. T.O. form to appellant electronically at[LINK:Transcript Order Form] or US Mail as appropriate. Copy of NOA to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. IMPORTANT ACTION REQUIRED: Provide an electronic copy of any exhibit you offered during a hearing or trial that was admitted into evidence to the clerk of the district court within 14 days of the date of this notice. Copies must be transmitted as PDF attachments through ECF by all ECF Users or delivered to the clerk on a CD by all non-ECF Users. See detailed instructions[LINK:here] . (Exception: This requirement does not apply to a pro se prisoner litigant.) Please note that if original exhibits are in your possession, you must maintain them through final disposition of the case. (Edmunds Lewis, Megan) |
|
Monday, July 01, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
respoth
Objection to Findings and Recommendations
Mon 07/01 6:12 PM
OBJECTION to12 Findings and Recommendations . (Edmunds Lewis, Megan) |
|
15 | 15
respoth
Objection to Findings and Recommendations
Mon 07/01 5:59 PM
OBJECTION to12 Findings and Recommendations . (Edmunds Lewis, Megan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) | ||
14 | 14
respm
Response/Objection
Mon 07/01 5:25 PM
RESPONSE filed by Megan C Edmunds Lewis re:12 Findings and Recommendations on Case re:1 Complaint (saw) |
|
Monday, June 24, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Recusal
Mon 06/24 12:08 PM
MOTION for Recusal filed by Megan C Edmunds Lewis (Edmunds Lewis, Megan) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Findings and Recommendations
Mon 06/24 11:59 AM
FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The undersigned RECOMMENDS that Judge O'Connor DISMISS all of Megan C. Edmunds Lewis' Complaint (ECF No.1 ) under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2) as delusional and frivolous, and for failure to state a claim. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 6/24/2024) (saw) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Supplemental Document
Mon 06/24 9:12 AM
Supplemental Document as to10 MOTION for Recusal by Megan C Edmunds Lewis. [ Document received at the U.S. Court of Appeals 5th Circuit. There is no appeal], [Document forwarded to USDC NDTX for processing]. (tle) |
|
Friday, June 21, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Recusal
Fri 06/21 2:02 PM
MOTION for Recusal filed by Megan C Edmunds Lewis (Edmunds Lewis, Megan) |
|
Thursday, June 20, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 06/20 10:30 AM
NOTICE of Transfer filed by Megan C Edmunds Lewis (Edmunds Lewis, Megan) |
|
Tuesday, June 18, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
service
Certificate of Service
Tue 06/18 11:02 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Megan C Edmunds Lewis (Edmunds Lewis, Megan) |
|
Monday, June 17, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 06/17 3:22 PM
ORDER: On June 14, 2024, plaintiff Megan C. Edmunds Lewis filed a civil complaint along with an Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form). ECF Nos.1 and2 . 1. Plaintiff is GRANTED leave to proceed in forma pauperis pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915. The clerk shall file Plaintiff's pleadings without prepayment of costs or security. 2. Service of process shall be withheld pending judicial screening pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 6/17/2024) (saw) |
|
Friday, June 14, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party
Fri 06/14 3:35 PM
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (saw) |
|
5 | 5
qcref
O' Connor (FORT WORTH CASES)
Fri 06/14 3:33 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set (see Special Order 3). Magistrate Judge Ray preliminarily assigned. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the[LINK:national] and[LINK:circuit] indexes.) File to: Appropriate Staff Attorney. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr. (saw) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Appoint Counsel
Fri 06/14 3:26 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Megan C. Edmunds Lewis (saw) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Fri 06/14 3:25 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Megan C. Edmunds Lewis. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (saw) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 06/14 3:24 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Megan C. Edmunds Lewis (saw) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 06/14 3:22 PM
COMPLAINT against City of Fort Worth filed by Megan C. Edmunds Lewis. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (saw) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Fri 06/14 3:36 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5, 6. Fri Jun 14 15:36:56 CDT 2024 (crt) |