EnCore Permian Development LLC
Texas Western Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Shad Robinson |
Case #: | 1:24-bk-10677 |
Case Filed: | Jun 14, 2024 |
Creditor Meeting: | Jul 19, 2024 |
Debtor
EnCore Permian Development LLC
250 Nicollet Mall Ste 900
Minneapolis, MN 55401-7548 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Randolph N Osherow
342 W Woodlawn, Suite 100
San Antonio, TX 78212 |
Docket last updated: 06/15/2024 12:04 AM CDT |
Friday, June 14, 2024 | ||
crditcrd
ICC-Fee Paid
Fri 06/14 5:04 PM
ICC-Fee Terminated for Voluntary Petition Chapter 7([LINK 24-10677 ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00), Amount $ 338.00, Receipt A24517211 (U.S. Treasury) |
||
crditcrd
ICC-Fee Paid
Fri 06/14 5:05 PM
ICC-Fee Terminated for Voluntary Petition Chapter 7([LINK 24-10677 ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00), Amount $ 338.00, Receipt A24517211 (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition Chapter 7
Fri 06/14 4:59 PM
Voluntary Petition under Chapter 7 (Non-Individual) Without Schedules, Without Statements, (Filing Fee: $ 338) Filed By EnCore Permian Development LLC. -Declaration for Electronic Filing due by 06/21/2024 (Kelley, Charles) |
|
2 | 2
court
Chapter 7AB Auto Assignment
Fri 06/14 11:45 PM
|