Consolidated
Lead case: 3:16-md-02741

California Northern District Court
Judge:Vince Chhabria
Case #: 3:24-cv-03560
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Jun 13, 2024
Case in other court:Missouri Eastern, 4:23-cv-01021
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 11, 2024 12:36 AM PST
Defendant
Monsanto Company
Represented By
Jennise Walker-Stubbs
Shook Hardy & Bacon L.L.P.
contact info
Plaintiff
Elvira Simas
Represented By
David Matthew Haynie
Forester Haynie PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 22 minutes ago
Friday, July 19, 2024
12 12 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Fri 07/19 9:55 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. [RE: Plaintiff Elvira Simas] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Fri 07/19 9:54 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. [RE: Plaintiff Elvira Simas] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise)
Related: [-]
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 07/19 9:51 AM
Defendant Monsanto Company ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand [RE: Plaintiff Elvira Simas] by Monsanto Company. (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
9 9 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Fri 06/14 11:07 AM
Case transferred in from District of Missouri Eastern; Case Number 4:23-cv-01021. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
utility MDL Member Case Fri 06/14 11:09 AM
MEMBER CASE OPENED MDL 2741: Missouri Eastern, 4:23-cv-01021, Simas v. Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as 3:24-cv-03560-VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order CTO 464 cc: JPMDL (ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
8 8 ORDER OF MDL TRANSFER to: Northern District of California. Signed by Tiffaney D. Pete on 6/12/2024. Case transferred via CM-ECF extraction. (JBH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
7 7 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-464) regarding MDL 2741 by Clerk of the Panel. Signed by Tiffaney D. Pete on 6/12/2024. (JBH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
6 6 Docket Text ORDER: Re:5 MOTION for Extension Plaintiff's Belated Motion for Extension of Time for Service of Process by Plaintiff Elvira Simas. (Haynie, David) filed by Elvira Simas ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 5/21/2024. (NEP)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
5 5 MOTION for Extension Plaintiff's Belated Motion for Extension of Time for Service of Process by Plaintiff Elvira Simas. (Haynie, David)
Related: [-]
4 4 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Plaintiff's Response to Show Cause Order by Plaintiff Elvira Simas filed by Plaintiff Elvira Simas. (Haynie, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
3 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4(m), that plaintiffs shall show cause in writing, within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order, why this action should not be dismissed without prejudice as to defendant(s) Monsanto Company for lack of timely service. (Show Cause Response due by 5/20/2024.) Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 05/06/2024. (KRZ)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 17, 2023
2 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Elvira Simas Process Server: U.S. Legal Services, Inc. (Haynie, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Monsanto Company with receipt number AMOEDC-10111725, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Elvira Simas.(Haynie, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Original Filing Form,
Att: 3 Summons
Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Sarah E. Pitlyk. 1 Summons(es) issued and emailed to David Matthew Haynie. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible.[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . (JBH)
Related: [-]