PGA-MV Realty, LLC
New Jersey Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Stacey L Meisel |
Case #: | 2:24-bk-16051 |
Case Filed: | Jun 17, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $500,001 to $1 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
PGA-MV Realty, LLC
24 Decker Ln
Boonton, NJ 07005-9204 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
US Dept of Justice Office of the US Trustee One Newark Center Ste 2100
Newark, NJ 07102 |
Docket last updated: 55 minutes ago |
Friday, September 06, 2024 | ||
44 | 44
court
Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal
Fri 09/06 3:22 PM
Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal to District Court. Case Number: 24-cv-08989-MEF. . Judge Michael E. Farbiarz assigned. (nrf) |
|
43 | 43
court
Certificate of Service - Appeal
Fri 09/06 10:51 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Service of Notice of Appeal (dmc) |
|
42 | 42
court
Transmittal Memo - Generic
Fri 09/06 10:51 AM
Transmittal Memo to District Court Re: Appeal (dmc) |
|
41 | 41
appeal
Notice of Appeal (Fee)
Fri 09/06 8:38 AM
Notice of Appeal to District Court. . Fee Amount $ 298. Filed by Kenneth J. Rosellini on behalf of PGA-MV Realty, LLC. Appellant Designation due by 09/20/2024. Transmission of Designation Due by 10/7/2024. (Rosellini, Kenneth) |
|
crditcrd
Credit Card/Debit Card Receipt
Fri 09/06 8:40 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Notice of Appeal([LINK 24-16051 SLM] ) [appeal,ntcapl] ( 298.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A47209009, fee amount $ 298.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Thursday, September 05, 2024 | ||
40 | 40
court
Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal
Thu 09/05 2:29 PM
Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal to District Court. Case Number: 24-cv-08926-MEF. . Judge Michael E. Farbiarz assigned. (nrf) |
|
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
39 | 39
court
Certificate of Service - Appeal
Tue 09/03 2:41 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Service of Notice of Appeal (dmc) |
|
38 | 38
court
Transmittal Memo - Generic
Tue 09/03 2:41 PM
Transmittal Memo to District Court Re: Appeal (dmc) |
|
court
Notice of Docketing Error
Tue 09/03 1:20 PM
Correction Notice in Electronic Filing . Type of Error: If two orders are being appealed two appeals must be filed. Court will process document 36 as an appeal of document 27. Please file an appeal for document 35, filed by Kenneth J. Rosellini . Please correct and refile with the court. (dmc) |
||
Saturday, August 31, 2024 | ||
37 | 37
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order
Sun 09/01 12:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/31/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, August 30, 2024 | ||
36 | 36
appeal
Notice of Appeal (Fee)
Fri 08/30 3:38 PM
Notice of Appeal to Court. . Fee Amount $ 298. Filed by Kenneth J. Rosellini on behalf of PGA-MV Realty, LLC. Appellant Designation due by 09/13/2024. Transmission of Designation Due by 09/30/2024. (Rosellini, Kenneth) |
|
crditcrd
Credit Card/Debit Card Receipt
Fri 08/30 5:24 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Notice of Appeal([LINK 24-16051 SLM] ) [appeal,ntcapl] ( 298.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A47189576, fee amount $ 298.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Thursday, August 29, 2024 | ||
35 | 35
order
Reconsider
Thu 08/29 4:10 PM
ORDER DENYING MOTION TO ALTER OR AMEND JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO F.R.B.P. 9023 AND RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO F.R.B.P. 9024 WITH PREJUDICE. . Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 8/29/2024. (LVJ) |
|
court
Hearing Held
Thu 08/29 3:53 PM
Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Denied for reasons set forth on the record |
||
Monday, August 26, 2024 | ||
34 | 34
misc
Certificate of Service
Mon 08/26 1:57 PM
Certificate of Service filed by Kenneth J. Rosellini on behalf of PGA-MV Realty, LLC. (Rosellini, Kenneth) |
|
Friday, August 23, 2024 | ||
33 | 33
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order
Sat 08/24 12:12 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/23/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, August 22, 2024 | ||
32 | 32
court
Document
Thu 08/22 10:13 AM
ALL APPEARANCES WILL BE VIA COURT SOLUTIONS |
|
Wednesday, August 21, 2024 | ||
31 | 31
order
Shorten Time
Wed 08/21 10:56 AM
ORDER SHORTENING TIME PERIOD FOR NOTICE,SETTING HEARING AND LIMITING NOTICE |
|
Tuesday, August 20, 2024 | ||
30 | 30
motion
Shorten Time
Tue 08/20 4:42 PM
Application to Shorten Time |
|
court
Notice of Docketing Error
Tue 08/20 8:58 AM
Correction Notice in Electronic Filing . Type of Error: No Hearing Date Scheduled on the Docket and No Proposed Order Attached, filed by Kenneth Rosellini. Court Will Schedule for 9/10/2024 at 11:00 am to Coincide With Papers Served. Please Submit and Circulate a Proposed Order to Chamber's Email. (rah) |
||
court
Hearing Scheduled (Document)
Tue 08/20 9:00 AM
Hearing Scheduled. Hearing scheduled for 9/10/2024 at 11:00 AM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (rah) |
||
Monday, August 19, 2024 | ||
29 | 29
motion
Reconsider
Mon 08/19 11:49 PM
Motion to Reconsider Filed by Kenneth J. Rosellini on behalf of PGA-MV Realty, LLC. (Rosellini, Kenneth) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Att: 2 Certification of Debtor | ||
Tuesday, August 13, 2024 | ||
court
Hearing Held and Continued
Tue 08/13 11:11 AM
Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Continued |
||
Wednesday, August 07, 2024 | ||
28 | 28
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order
Thu 08/08 12:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/07/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
order
Cross Motion
Mon 08/05 3:16 PM
Order Granting Motion For Relief From Stay . Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 8/5/2024. (ntp) |
|
court
Hearing Held
Mon 08/05 11:36 AM
Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Granted; Order Memorializing The Decision For The Reason Set Forth On The Record to Be Submitted (omf) |
||
court
Hearing Held
Mon 08/05 11:36 AM
Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Denied For Reasons Set Forth On The Record (omf) |
||
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
26 | 26
court
Document
Wed 07/31 3:29 PM
Hearing Scheduled for 8/5/2024 at 10:00 AM will be held telephonically via courtsolutions |
|
Tuesday, July 30, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Document
Tue 07/30 7:57 AM
Document re: NOTICE RE CONTINUED TELEPHONIC §341 MEETING July 31, 2024 at 1:00 P.M. filed by Kenneth J. Rosellini on behalf of PGA-MV Realty, LLC. (Rosellini, Kenneth) |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Document
Tue 07/23 9:20 AM
Document re: NOTICE RE TELEPHONIC §341 MEETING filed by Kenneth J. Rosellini on behalf of PGA-MV Realty, LLC. (Rosellini, Kenneth) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
court
Hearing Held
Tue 07/16 12:49 PM
Minute of Hearing Scheduled, OUTCOME: Adjourned to a Date to be Determined (omf) |
||
court
Hearing Held
Tue 07/16 12:49 PM
Minute of Hearing Scheduled, OUTCOME: Adjourned to a Date to be Determined (omf) |
||
court
Hearing Rescheduled (Document)
Wed 07/17 11:16 AM
Hearing Rescheduled from 7/16/2024 Hearing scheduled for 08/05/2024 at 10:00 AM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (omf) |
||
court
Hearing Rescheduled (Document)
Wed 07/17 11:17 AM
Hearing Rescheduled from 7/16/2024 Hearing scheduled for 08/05/2024 at 10:00 AM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (omf) |
||
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
court
Document
Fri 07/12 1:30 PM
The court is available on July 18, 2024 at 10:00 a.m. or on August 5, 2024 at 10:00 a.m. The parties shall advice the court which date works for them. The court has no other dates available at this time. |
|
22 | 22
answer
Response
Fri 07/12 1:17 PM
Response to filed by Alix Claps on behalf of Woodstone Custom Builders, LLC. (Claps, Alix) |
|
Thursday, July 11, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order
Fri 07/12 12:15 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/11/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, July 10, 2024 | ||
crditcrd
Credit Card/Debit Card Receipt
Wed 07/10 2:41 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Amended Schedules (Fee Attorney)([LINK 24-16051 SLM] ) [misc,amdsch3a] ( 34.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A46978528, fee amount $ 34.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Tuesday, July 09, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
answer
Opposition
Tue 07/09 11:47 PM
Certification in Opposition to filed by Kenneth J. Rosellini on behalf of PGA-MV Realty, LLC. (Rosellini, Kenneth) |
|
19 | 19
motion
Cross Motion
Tue 07/09 11:45 PM
Cross Motion re: Sanctions for Violation of Automatic Stay Filed by Kenneth J. Rosellini on behalf of PGA-MV Realty, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 7/16/2024 at 11:00 AM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (Rosellini, Kenneth) |
|
Att: 1 Certification | ||
18 | 18
order
Respecting Amendment to Schedule(s) or Document(s)
Tue 07/09 2:36 PM
Order Respecting Amendment to Schedule(s) E/F, H . Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 7/9/2024. (dlr) |
|
17 | 17
misc
Missing Document(s) Filed
Tue 07/09 9:02 AM
Missing Document(s): Atty Disclosure Statement filed by Kenneth J. Rosellini on behalf of PGA-MV Realty, LLC. (Rosellini, Kenneth) |
|
16 | 16
misc
Missing Document(s) Filed
Tue 07/09 8:50 AM
Missing Document(s): Cash Flow Statement, Tax Return filed by Kenneth J. Rosellini on behalf of PGA-MV Realty, LLC. (Rosellini, Kenneth) |
|
15 | 15
misc
Missing Document(s) Filed
Tue 07/09 8:38 AM
Missing Document(s): Statement of Financial Affairs For Non-Individuals filed by Kenneth J. Rosellini on behalf of PGA-MV Realty, LLC. (Rosellini, Kenneth) |
|
14 | 14
misc
Missing Document(s) Filed
Tue 07/09 8:37 AM
Missing Document(s): 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors filed by Kenneth J. Rosellini on behalf of PGA-MV Realty, LLC. (Rosellini, Kenneth) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Missing Document(s) Filed
Tue 07/09 8:36 AM
Missing Document(s): Schedules, Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals A/B,C,D,E/F,G,H, filed by Kenneth J. Rosellini on behalf of PGA-MV Realty, LLC. (Rosellini, Kenneth) |
|
utility
Remark re: Missing Documents Filed
Tue 07/09 12:48 PM
Remark. STILL MISSING: No Documents Missing - All Required Documents Filed (dlr) |
||
court
Hearing Held
Tue 07/09 2:01 PM
Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Satisfied (omf) |
||
utility
Fee Due (Create Outstanding Fee)
Tue 07/09 2:38 PM
Fee Due Amended Schedules (Fee Attorney) $ 34. (dlr) |
||
Wednesday, July 03, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
court
BNC Certificate of Notice (generic)
Thu 07/04 12:19 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 07/03/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, July 01, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
court
Notice of Hearing - (No Upload)
Mon 07/01 2:25 PM
Status Conference. |
|
Tuesday, June 25, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 06/25 4:01 PM
Certificate of Service filed by Alix Claps on behalf of Woodstone Custom Builders, LLC. (Claps, Alix) |
|
9 | 9
court
Clerk's Office Quality Control Message - Certification of Service
Tue 06/25 3:40 PM
Clerk's Office Quality Control Message: Please note that Local Form Certification of Service must be filed in accordance with the appropriate service provisions. This local form can be found in the Forms section of the Courts website www.njb.uscourts.gov. (ntp) |
|
Thursday, June 20, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
Fri 06/21 12:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors. No. of Notices: 7. Notice Date 06/20/2024. (Admin.) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Relief from Stay (Fee)
Thu 06/20 1:13 PM
Motion for Relief from Stay. Fee Amount $ 199. Filed by Alix Claps on behalf of Woodstone Custom Builders, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 7/16/2024 at 11:00 AM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (Claps, Alix) |
|
Att: 1 Certification | ||
Att: 2 Brief | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order | ||
crditcrd
Credit Card/Debit Card Receipt
Thu 06/20 1:14 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Motion for Relief From Stay([LINK 24-16051 SLM] ) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 199.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A46901321, fee amount $ 199.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Wednesday, June 19, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order
Thu 06/20 12:13 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/19/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, June 18, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request
Tue 06/18 9:06 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Fran B. Steele on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Steele, Fran) |
|
4 | 4
court
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11
Tue 06/18 8:04 AM
Meeting of Creditors - Chapter 11. 341(a) meeting to be held on 7/24/2024 at 10:00 AM at Telephonic. Proofs of Claim due by 8/26/2024. Government Proof of Claim due by 12/16/2024. (mlc) |
|
Monday, June 17, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
order
Show Cause
Mon 06/17 2:42 PM
Order to Show Cause Why Case Should Not be Dismissed for re: Failure to File Missing Documents. Missing Documents: Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals, Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non Individual Debtors, Statement of Financial Affairs For Non-Individuals, Atty Disclosure Statement, 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors, List of Equity Security Holders, Statement of Corporate Ownership, Balance Sheet, Cash Flow Statement, Statement of Operations, Schedules A/B,D,E/F,G,H, Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 6/17/2024. Hearing scheduled for 7/9/2024 at 10:00 AM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (dlr) |
|
2 | 2
utility
Case Assigned
Mon 06/17 8:50 AM
Case Assignment. Judge Stacey L. Meisel added to the case as Prior Filing 24-13717 Was Assigned to Judge Stacey L. Meisel. (rah) |
|
1 | 1
6
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Mon 06/17 7:52 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Kenneth J. Rosellini on behalf of PGA-MV Realty, LLC. Chapter 11 Debtors Exclusive Right to File a Plan Expires on 10/15/2024. (Rosellini, Kenneth) |
|
utility
Set/Reset/Satisfy Deadline(s) - Plan or Disclosure Statement
Mon 06/17 8:58 AM
Plan or Disclosure Statement Deadline Set/Reset/Satisfied . Chapter 11 Small Business Plan due by 4/13/2025.Chapter 11 Small Business Debtors Exclusive Right to File a Plan Expires on 12/16/2024. (rah) |
||
crditcrd
Credit Card/Debit Card Receipt
Mon 06/17 10:34 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-16051 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A46887775, fee amount $ 1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
court
Clerk's Evidence of Previous Dismissal (one dismissal)
Thu 07/11 10:34 AM
Clerk's Evidence of Previous Dismissal. 11 U.S.C. section 362(c)(3). The Debtor had one case pending within the preceding one year period but was dismissed. See case 24-13717 (dmc) |