Joseph Dyjak v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03555 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jun 17, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 03, 2024 7:47 AM EDT |
Defendant
3M Company
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
DuPont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Dyjak
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, June 24, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Mon 06/24 7:41 AM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-Filed)(associated as of 06/17/2024), Joseph Dyjak v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-03555-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: New Mexico (mbon) |
|
Monday, June 17, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Mon 06/17 1:43 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (mbon) |
|
1 | 1
39
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Mon 06/17 1:42 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-11827793.), filed by Joseph Dyjak. Service due by 9/16/2024 (mbon) |