MORRISON v. MAYORKAS et al
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Trevor N Mcfadden |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01765 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus |
Case Filed: | Jun 18, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 03, 2024 6:31 AM EDT |
Defendant
TROY MILLER
|
|
Defendant
ALEJANDRO N. MAYORKAS
|
|
Plaintiff
BRUCE A. MORRISON
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, August 16, 2024 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Set/Reset Deadlines
Fri 08/16 11:30 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Defendants'7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer is GRANTED. Defendants shall file their Answer to Plaintiff's petition by or on September 16, 2024. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall meet and confer with Defendants regarding the status of his Global Entry application by or on September 2, 2024. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 8/16/2024. (lctnm2) |
||
Thursday, August 15, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Thu 08/15 7:30 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by ALEJANDRO N. MAYORKAS, TROY MILLER. (Bartholomew, Tabitha) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 08/15 12:59 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Tabitha Bartholomew on behalf of All Defendants (Bartholomew, Tabitha) |
|
Sunday, July 07, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney
Sun 07/07 8:19 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEJANDRO N. MAYORKAS served on 7/1/2024; TROY MILLER served on 7/1/2024, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 6/24/2024., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/21/2024. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/20/2024.)(Morrison, Curtis) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-D, service to US Attorney, Mayorkas, Miller, Garland | ||
Saturday, June 22, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
order
.Order
Sat 06/22 8:43 AM
STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 6/22/2024. (lctnm2) |
|
Friday, June 21, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG
Fri 06/21 11:02 AM
SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, TROY MILLER, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(zmtm) |
|
Att: 1 Notice and Consent | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 06/21 10:57 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zmtm) |
||
Tuesday, June 18, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Errata
Tue 06/18 7:59 PM
ERRATA by BRUCE A. MORRISON re Notice of Error- New Case,.(Morrison, Curtis) |
|
Att: 1 Errata Petition for Writ of Mandamus and Complaint | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 06/18 2:55 AM
COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief and Petition for Writ of Mandamus against ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, TROY MILLER ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-10968790) filed by BRUCE A. MORRISON.(Morrison, Curtis) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Civil Process Clerk, | ||
Att: 3 Summons Merrick Garland, | ||
Att: 4 Summons Alejandro Mayorkas, | ||
Att: 5 Summons Troy Miller | ||
notice
Notice of Error- New Case
Tue 06/18 2:55 PM
NOTICE OF NEW CASE ERROR regarding1 Complaint,. The following error(s) need correction: Noncompliance with LCvR 5.1(c). Please file a Notice of Errata stating the error and attach the corrected initiating pleading to include the name & full residence address of each defendant and file using the event Errata. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zmtm) |