Secchi v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE et al
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Trevor N Mcfadden |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01769 |
Nature of Suit | 895 Other Statutes - Freedom of Information Act |
Cause | 05:552 Freedom of Information Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 18, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 03, 2024 6:31 AM EDT |
Defendant
UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
NATURAL RESOURCES CONSERVATION SERVICE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SILVIA SECCHI
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Wednesday, September 04, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Status Report
Wed 09/04 7:01 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by NATURAL RESOURCES CONSERVATION SERVICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE. (Duffey, Thomas) |
|
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
order
.Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Fri 08/02 4:02 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court are a Complaint and an Answer in this FOIA case. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report proposing a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule should address, among other things, the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, and a briefing schedule for dispositive motions, if required. The parties shall file the schedule on or before September 4, 2024. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 7/23/2024. (lctnm2) |
||
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 08/01 4:32 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by NATURAL RESOURCES CONSERVATION SERVICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE.(Duffey, Thomas) |
|
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned Executed in FOIA case as to U.S. Attorney
Mon 07/08 1:51 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/1/2024. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/31/2024. (Apfel, Carrie) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
Mon 07/08 1:39 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. Natural Resources Conservation Service served on 7/1/2024 (Apfel, Carrie) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
Mon 07/08 1:38 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE served on 7/1/2024 (Apfel, Carrie) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed in FOIA case as to U.S. Attorney
Mon 07/08 1:34 PM
ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/1/2024. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/31/2024. (Apfel, Carrie) Modified on 7/8/2024, pursuant to Counsel (mg) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General
Mon 07/08 1:30 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 7/01/2024. (Apfel, Carrie) |
|
Monday, June 24, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
order
.Order
Mon 06/24 8:46 AM
STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 6/24/2024. (lctnm3) |
|
Friday, June 21, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 06/21 2:39 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kara Goad on behalf of Silvia Secchi (Goad, Kara) |
|
Tuesday, June 18, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG
Tue 06/18 3:54 PM
SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to Natural Resources Conservation Service, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(zmtm) |
|
Att: 1 Notice and Consent | ||
1 | 1
17
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 06/18 12:19 PM
COMPLAINT against Natural Resources Conservation Service, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number BDCDC-10970099) filed by Silvia Secchi.(Apfel, Carrie) (Attachment 8 replaced on 6/18/2024) (zmtm) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A FOIA Request, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. B - FPAC-BC - Acknowledgement - Letter, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex. C - Silvia Declaration, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex. D - Secchi FOIA Denial, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex. E - FOIA REQUEST NO. 2023-NRCS-00082-F Appeal Letter, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Ex. F - FOIA re PCSC Second Funding sent, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Ex. G - 6 17-2024 NRCS response, | ||
Att: 8 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 9 Summons Summons-FOIA Att'y Gen, | ||
Att: 10 Summons Summons-FOIA NRCS, | ||
Att: 11 Summons Summons-FOIA US Att'y, | ||
Att: 12 Summons Summons-FOIA USDA | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 06/18 3:45 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zmtm) |