Ng v. Lizotte
Massachusetts District Court | |
Judge: | Nathaniel M Gorton |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-11570 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Jun 18, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, September 11, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 09/11 2:03 PM
Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: BRIEFING ORDER entered. (Lima, Christine) |
|
20 | 20
order
Order on Motion for Order
Wed 09/11 1:56 PM
Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting19 Motion for Briefing Order (Lima, Christine) |
|
Tuesday, September 10, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
3
pgs
motion
Order
Tue 09/10 10:11 AM
Assented to MOTION for Order to Set Briefing Schedule by Kenneth Lizotte.(Janiszewski, Andre) |
|
18 | 18
respoth
Answer/Response to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2254
Tue 09/10 9:36 AM
RESPONSE/ANSWER to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Supplemental Answer Volume III by Kenneth Lizotte. (Janiszewski, Andre) |
|
17 | 17
respoth
Answer/Response to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2254
Tue 09/10 9:27 AM
RESPONSE/ANSWER to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Supplemental Answer Volume II by Kenneth Lizotte. (Janiszewski, Andre) |
|
16 | 16
respoth
Answer/Response to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2254
Tue 09/10 9:24 AM
RESPONSE/ANSWER to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Supplemental Answer Volume I by Kenneth Lizotte.(Janiszewski, Andre) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Transcript of Motion Hearing, May 23, 2006, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Transcript of Jury Trial Day 1, May 30, 2008, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Transcript of Jury Trial Day 2, June 2, 2008, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Transcript of Jury Trial Day 3, June 3, 2008, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Transcript of Jury Trial Day 4, June 4, 2008, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Transcript of Jury Trial Day 5, June 6, 2008, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Transcript of Jury Trial Day 6, June 9, 2008, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit Transcript of Jury Trial Day 7, June 11, 2008, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit Transcript of Jury Trial Day 8, June 12, 2008, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit Transcript of Jury Trial Day 8, June 12, 2008, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit Transcript of Motion for New Trial Hearing, March 19, 2018, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit Transcript of Motion for New Trial Hearing. July 16, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
respoth
Answer/Response to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2254
Tue 09/10 9:05 AM
RESPONSE/ANSWER to 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254), by Kenneth Lizotte. (Janiszewski, Andre) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Notice - Other
Tue 09/10 9:01 AM
NOTICE by Kenneth Lizotte of Statement Regarding Existence of Victim (Janiszewski, Andre) |
|
Wednesday, August 07, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Wed 08/07 9:19 AM
Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING 12 Motion for Extension of Time to September 10, 2024 to File An Answer Or Other Responsive Pleading. Kenneth Lizotte answer due September 10, 2024. (Cowan, Nicole) |
|
Tuesday, August 06, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Extension of Time
Tue 08/06 1:20 PM
Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to September 10, 2024 to File An Answer Or Other Responsive Pleading by Kenneth Lizotte.(Janiszewski, Andre) |
|
Thursday, June 27, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Thu 06/27 9:29 AM
Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING 10 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to August 9, 2024 to File an Answer or Other Responsive Pleading (Cowan, Nicole) |
|
Wednesday, June 26, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Wed 06/26 1:46 PM
Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to August 9, 2024 to File an Answer or Other Responsive Pleading by Kenneth Lizotte.(Janiszewski, Andre) Modified on 6/26/2024: corrected event type (Kelly, Danielle) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 06/26 1:27 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Andre Janiszewski on behalf of Kenneth Lizotte (Janiszewski, Andre) |
|
Monday, June 24, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement
Tue 06/25 10:14 AM
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Yat Fung Ng.(Cowan, Nicole) Modified on 6/25/2024 (Cowan, Nicole) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Cover Letter | ||
7 | 7
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel
Mon 06/24 8:42 AM
Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. ORDER DENYING PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL. (Cowan, Nicole) |
|
Tuesday, June 18, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Appoint Counsel
Tue 06/18 7:19 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Yat Fung Ng.(Hinton, Catherine) |
|
5 | 5
30+
pgs
misc
Memorandum re Petition
Tue 06/18 7:06 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Yat Fung Ng in Support re1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254),. (Hinton, Catherine) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Copy Mailed
Tue 06/18 12:17 PM
Copy of1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254),3 Service Order - 2254 Petition, and docket sheet mailed to Respondent Kenneth Lizotte and the Attorney General for the Commonwealth of Massachusetts on 6/18/2024. (Kelly, Danielle) |
|
3 | 3
order
Service Order-2254 Petition
Tue 06/18 12:14 PM
Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. SERVICE ORDER re 2254 Petition. Order entered pursuant to R.4 of the Rules governing Section 2254 cases for service on respondents. Answer/responsive pleading due w/in 21 days of receipt of this order. (Kelly, Danielle) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Tue 06/18 11:54 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Kinsella, Jaylannie) |
|
1 | 1
misc
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2254
Tue 06/18 11:38 AM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28:2254 Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number AMADC-10468651 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid., filed by Yat Fung Ng.(Hinton, Catherine) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Category Form, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit |