California Central District Court
Judge:Mark C Scarsi
Referred: Rozella A Oliver
Case #: 2:24-cv-05131
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Jun 18, 2024
Terminated:Sep 25, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Dec 15, 2024 1:50 AM PST
Defendant
La Nueva Market LLC
Defendant
Vanowen Village, LLC
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Ignacio Vera
Represented By
Jason T Yoon
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Jason J Kim
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Kevin Hyunjong Hong
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Jason T. Yoon
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Jason J. Kim
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/27/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
27 27 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Tue 10/01 12:42 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by PLAINTIFF Ignacio Vera. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
26 26 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - form only -no proceeding held Wed 09/25 4:53 PM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) Order of Dismissal (JS6) by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. re: Notice of Settlement25 . (smo)
Related: [-]
25 25 notice Settlement Wed 09/25 4:31 PM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by plaintiff Ignacio Vera. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
24 24 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Tue 09/24 10:04 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ignacio Vera, upon Defendant Vanowen Village, LLC served on 9/23/2024, answer due 10/15/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon ALLEN MESCOBI, AS AGENT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
23 23 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Fri 09/20 10:06 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (LOP) by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 9/27/2024. (smo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
22 22 service Summons Issued Wed 07/24 12:35 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition20 as to Defendants La Nueva Market LLC, Vanowen Village, LLC. (rolm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
21 21 notice Summons Request Tue 07/23 5:14 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition20 filed by Plaintiff Ignacio Vera. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
20 20 othcmp Amended Complaint/Petition Tue 07/23 4:56 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , filed by Plaintiff Ignacio Vera(Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
19 19 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Tue 07/23 2:04 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ignacio Vera, upon Defendant Vanowen Village, LLC served on 7/18/2024, answer due 8/8/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon ALLEN MESCOBI, as agent for service of process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
18 18 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 07/10 10:46 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ignacio Vera, upon Defendant Vanowen Village, LLC served on 7/9/2024, answer due 7/30/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CARLOS A RIVERA, AS AGENT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
17 17 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Tue 07/09 3:14 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND DIRECTING FILING OF AMENDED COMPLAINT. The Court ordered Plaintiff to show cause why the ADA claim should not be dismissed for lack of standing. Plaintiff filed a responsive brief and declaration15 . The Court reiterates its concern that Plaintiff does not plead enough factual content in the Complaint to make plausible allegations of deterrence or an injury infact coupled with intent to return. Notwithstanding, the additional informationprovided in Plaintiff's submissions, if pleaded, might suffice to support Article III standing. Accordingly, the Court orders Plaintiff to file within 14 days an amended complaint consistent with the averments provided in the response to the order to show cause. See 28 U.S.C. § 1653. The order to show cause with respect to standing is discharged. (lc)
Related: [-]
16 16 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Tue 07/09 3:11 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Mark C. Scarsi:ORDER DECLINING SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION. The Court has reviewed and considered Plaintiff's response14 . Court, in its discretion, declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiff's Unruh Act claim and any other construction-related accessibility claim. The Court therefore dismisses any such claims without prejudice. (lc) Modified on 7/9/2024 (lc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
15 15 misc Response Wed 07/03 2:34 PM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Ignacio Verato Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,13 re: Standing(Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
14 14 misc Response Tue 07/02 4:53 PM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Ignacio Verato Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,13 re: Supplemental Jurisdiction(Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Declaration
Friday, June 21, 2024
13 13 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Fri 06/21 2:44 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The Court orders Plaintiff to show cause why the ADA claim should not be dismissed without prejudice for lack of standing and why the Court should not decline jurisdiction over the remaining claims. 28 U.S.C. § 1367(c)(3). Plaintiff shall respond in writing within 14 days. Failure to file a timely and satisfactory response will be construed as a concession that Plaintiff lacks standing to pursue the ADA claim and will result in dismissal without further notice. (lc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
12 12 adr Notice to Parties ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-20) Thu 06/20 9:18 AM
Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (smo)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - form only -no proceeding held Thu 06/20 9:17 AM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) Order to Show Cause (ADA) by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 7/5/2024. (smo)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - form only -no proceeding held Thu 06/20 9:15 AM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) Order re Prosecution of Certain Cases Under the Americans With Disabilities Act by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Thu 06/20 9:13 AM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE MARK C. SCARSI upon filing of the complaint by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 06/20 8:58 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants La Nueva Market LLC, Vanowen Village, LLC. (lh)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Thu 06/20 8:56 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Thu 06/20 8:56 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Thu 06/20 8:55 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Mark C. Scarsi and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (lh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
4 4 notice Summons Request Tue 06/18 12:58 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Ignacio Vera. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 06/18 12:57 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Tue 06/18 12:57 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Ignacio Vera. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 06/18 12:19 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-37677977 - Fee: $405. (Attorney Jason J. Kim added to party Ignacio Vera(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]