Montanez v. Commissioner of Social Security
New York Western District Court | |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00577 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC) |
Case Filed: | Jun 18, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, September 11, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Stipulation
Wed 09/11 4:46 PM
STIPULATION by Commissioner of Social Security. (Molinaro, John) |
|
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 09/03 12:40 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca M. Kujawa on behalf of Sonia Yvette Montanez (Kujawa, Rebecca) |
|
Monday, August 19, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Transcript (Social Security)
Mon 08/19 12:22 PM
TRANSCRIPT (Social Security) (Part 3) . (Molinaro, John) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Transcript (Social Security)
Mon 08/19 12:21 PM
TRANSCRIPT (Social Security) (Part 2) . (Molinaro, John) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Transcript (Social Security)
Mon 08/19 12:19 PM
TRANSCRIPT (Social Security) (Part 1) . (Molinaro, John) |
|
Friday, June 21, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 06/21 10:45 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by John Thomas Molinaro on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Molinaro, John) |
|
Thursday, June 20, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 06/20 3:30 PM
TEXT ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Court finds that plaintiff meets the statutory requirements for in forma pauperis status and therefore her motion (Dkt. 2) is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to file plaintiff's papers without payment of fees. The service of the complaint has been performed in accordance with WDNY Local Rule 5.5. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 6/20/24. (NNR) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 06/20 11:32 AM
Case placed in Social Security Assignment Pool. (LB) |
||
notice
Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge
Thu 06/20 11:33 AM
Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms] . (LB) |
||
service
Social Security Appeal Notice re Service
Thu 06/20 11:34 AM
NOTICE regarding service of1 Complaint, in a Social Security case: Commissioner of Social Security answer due 8/19/2024. Pursuant to Rule 3 of the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions under 42 U.S.C. 405(g), the Clerk issues this Notice of Electronic Filing to the Regional Social Security Administration's Office of General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office for the Western District of New York. No summons will issue. (LB) |
||
utility
E-Filing Notification
Thu 06/20 11:36 AM
E-Filing Notification regarding1 - (6) Civil Cover Sheet: For future reference please flatten PDFs before uploading. PDFs should not contain fillable form fields. (LB) |
||
Tuesday, June 18, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 06/18 2:46 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Sonia Yvette Montanez.(Comerford, Ida) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 06/18 2:45 PM
COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Sonia Yvette Montanez.(Comerford, Ida) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A- Notice of Decision-Unfavorable, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B- Notice of Appeals Council Action, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Summons, | ||
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 7 WITHDRAWL OF CONSENT OF MAGISTRATE |