BENTON et al v. PLATKIN et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Karen M Williams |
Referred: | Matthew J Skahill |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-07098 |
Nature of Suit | 950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Jun 18, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 03, 2024 6:48 AM EDT |
Defendant
CHIEF PHIL OLIVO
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
MATTHEW PLATKIN
in his official capacity as the Attorney General of New Jersey OFFICE OF THE NEW JERSEY ATTORNEY GENERAL 25 MARKET STREET
TRENTON, NJ 08611 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CHRISTIAN BENTON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
COALITION OF NEW JERSEY FIREARM OWNERS
PO BOX 768
SEWELL, NJ 08080 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
GUN OWNERS FOUNDATION
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
GUN OWNERS OF AMERICA, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/15/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
qc
QC - Fillable PDF
Tue 08/27 10:29 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Notice of Appearance18 filed by Liza B. Fleming on 8/26/2024 was uploaded prior to being flattened. Before uploading fillable forms to ECF you must flatten the file to prevent other users from manipulating or editing the information. The easiest way to flatten a PDF form is by selecting Print to PDF and saving the flattened form, other PDF software may differ. Please visit our[LINK:website] under Flattening PDF Forms for guidance. Your document has been corrected. This message is for informational purposes only. (dmr) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 08/27 10:36 AM
Set Deadlines as to19 First MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Phil Olivio ,20 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Motion set for 10/7/2024 before Judge Karen M. Williams. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr) |
||
Monday, August 26, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Mon 08/26 7:24 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by MATTHEW PLATKIN. Responses due by 9/23/2024.(FLEMING, LIZA) |
|
Att: 1 Brief in Support of Motion, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Liza B. Fleming, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A to Declaration, | ||
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 5 Certificate of Service | ||
19 | 19
motion
Dismiss
Mon 08/26 6:18 PM
First MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Phil Olivio by PHIL OLIVO. Responses due by 10/7/2024.(MILES, MICHAEL) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum In Support of Motion, | ||
Att: 2 Certification of Phil Olivio, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 5 Certificate of Service Certification of Service | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 08/26 1:43 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by LIZA FLEMING on behalf of MATTHEW PLATKIN (FLEMING, LIZA) |
|
Tuesday, August 20, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF
Tue 08/20 2:13 PM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Stephen Stamboulieh to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (HARFENIST, STEVEN) |
|
notice
Notice of Pro Hac Vice counsel added
Wed 08/21 9:50 AM
Pro Hac Vice counsel, STEPHEN D. STAMBOULIEH, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (js) |
||
Monday, August 19, 2024 | ||
misc
Pro Hac Vice Fee Received
Mon 08/19 4:17 PM
Pro Hac Vice fee: Stephen D. Stamboulieh $ 250, receipt number TRE139991. (mlh) |
||
Friday, August 09, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 08/09 3:52 PM
ORDER granting3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Stephen D. Stamboulieh, Esquire. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill on 8/9/2024. (tf, ) |
|
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order
Wed 07/31 4:37 PM
|
|
Tuesday, July 30, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Application/Petition
Tue 07/30 8:25 PM
APPLICATION/PETITION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Phil Olivo for by PHIL OLIVO. (LEYBA, ARLETTE) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order Reassigning Case
Thu 07/18 11:32 AM
TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Karen M. Williams for all further proceedings. Judge Christine P. O'Hearn no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 7/18/2024. (mmb ) |
|
utility
Update Answer Due Deadline
Thu 07/18 9:05 AM
CLERK'S TEXT ORDER - The Application for a Clerk's Order Extending Time to Answer - Document12 submitted by CHIEF PHIL OLIVO on 7/17/2024 has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 7/31/2024. (sms2) |
||
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order
Wed 07/17 4:26 PM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Chief Phil Olivo.. (MILES, MICHAEL) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 07/17 4:18 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ARLETTE LEYBA on behalf of PHIL OLIVO (LEYBA, ARLETTE) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 07/17 4:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL JOSEPH MILES on behalf of PHIL OLIVO (MILES, MICHAEL) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 07/16 3:48 PM
LETTER ORDER Granting Defendant's request to extend the time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' complaint to August 26, 2024. Signed by Judge Christine P. O'Hearn on 7/16/2024. (sms2) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Letter
Tue 07/16 12:43 PM
Letter from Defendant Platkin requesting (consented to) 30-day extension of time to answer, move, or respond re1 Complaint,. (VANNELLA, DANIEL) |
|
Tuesday, July 09, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 07/09 11:40 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by GUN OWNERS FOUNDATION, CHRISTIAN BENTON, GUN OWNERS OF AMERICA, INC., COALITION OF NEW JERSEY FIREARM OWNERS. MATTHEW PLATKIN served on 6/27/2024, answer due 7/26/2024. (HARFENIST, STEVEN) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 07/09 11:38 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by GUN OWNERS FOUNDATION, CHRISTIAN BENTON, GUN OWNERS OF AMERICA, INC., COALITION OF NEW JERSEY FIREARM OWNERS. PHIL OLIVO served on 6/26/2024, answer due 7/17/2024. (HARFENIST, STEVEN) |
|
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
utility
Update Answer Due Deadline
Mon 07/08 9:14 AM
CLERK'S TEXT ORDER - The Application for a Clerk's Order Extending Time to Answer - Document5 submitted by MATTHEW PLATKIN on 7/5/2024 has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 7/26/2024. (sms2) |
||
Friday, July 05, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order
Fri 07/05 12:17 PM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant Attorney General of New Jersey. Attorney DANIEL MICHAEL VANNELLA for MATTHEW PLATKIN added. (VANNELLA, DANIEL) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 07/05 12:09 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL MICHAEL VANNELLA on behalf of MATTHEW PLATKIN (VANNELLA, DANIEL) |
|
Thursday, June 27, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 06/27 11:07 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by CHRISTIAN BENTON, COALITION OF NEW JERSEY FIREARM OWNERS, GUN OWNERS FOUNDATION, GUN OWNERS OF AMERICA, INC..(HARFENIST, STEVEN) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A- Declaration of Stephen D. Stamboulieh, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B- Letter of Good Standing | ||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 06/27 4:04 PM
Set Deadlines as to3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 8/5/2024 before Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sms2) |
||
Friday, June 21, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Fri 06/21 8:42 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to PHIL OLIVO, MATTHEW PLATKIN. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (aji, ) |
|
Thursday, June 20, 2024 | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Thu 06/20 2:54 PM
Judge Christine P. O'Hearn and Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill added. (mmb, ) |
||
Tuesday, June 18, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 06/18 5:46 PM
COMPLAINT against PHIL OLIVO, MATTHEW PLATKIN ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15456511), filed by GUN OWNERS FOUNDATION, CHRISTIAN BENTON, GUN OWNERS OF AMERICA, INC., COALITION OF NEW JERSEY FIREARM OWNERS.(HARFENIST, STEVEN) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A- Declaration of John C. Pyle, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B- Declaration of Erich M. Pratt, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C- Declaration of Christian Benton, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 5 Summons Phil Olivo, | ||
Att: 6 Summons Matthew Platkin |