Kenneth Boyman v. Walt Disney Company The et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | George H Wu |
Referred: | Steve Kim |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-05147 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:501 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jun 18, 2024 |
Terminated: | Jul 26, 2024 |
Case in other court: | California Superior Court, County of Los Angeles, 23SMCV04018 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 03, 2024 3:35 AM PDT |
Defendant
Google Enterprises
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walt Disney Company The
500 South Buena Vista St.
Burbank, CA 91521 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kenneth Boyman
23838 Pacific Coast Highway #91
Malibu, CA 90265 |
Docket last updated: 09/19/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
38 | 38
misc
Report of Determination of Copyright Action (CLOSE) (AO 121)
Fri 07/26 3:57 PM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing) (aco) |
|
Att: 1 Order | ||
37 | 37
order
Dismiss Party Dismiss Case
Fri 07/26 3:54 PM
MINUTES IN CHAMBERS - RULING ON DEFENDANT THE WALT DISNEY COMPANY'S MOTION TO DISMISS11 ; and DEFENDANT GOOGLE LLC'S MOTION TO DISMISS THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT16 by Judge George H Wu. Attached hereto is the Court's Ruling on the above-entitled Motions to Dismiss. The Court GRANTS both Disney and Google's motions and DISMISSES this action WITH PREJUDICE. The hearing calendared for August 1, 2024 is hereby VACATED and the matter is taken off-calendar.; granting11 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Walt Disney Company; granting16 MOTION to Dismiss Case. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated) (aco) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
36 | 36
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Thu 07/25 5:44 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Christopher Hurley counsel for Defendant Google Enterprises. Adding Christopher Hurley as counsel of record for Google LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Google LLC. (Attorney Christopher Hurley added to party Google Enterprises(pty:dft))(Hurley, Christopher) |
|
35 | 35
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Thu 07/25 4:08 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL filed by plaintiff Kenneth Boyman, re REQUEST FOR Afternoon Court Date34 served on 07/25/2024. (aco) |
|
34 | 34
motion
Hearing
Thu 07/25 4:06 PM
REQUEST FOR Afternoon Court Date filed by plaintiff Kenneth Boyman. (aco) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
33 | 33
6
pgs
motion
Order
Thu 07/25 2:54 PM
Plaintiff's Request for Reparations for Defendant's Crimes filed by plaintiff Kenneth Boyman. (aco) |
|
32 | 32
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Thu 07/25 8:16 AM
TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H Wu: DEFENDANT THE WALT DISNEY COMPANYS MOTION TO DISMISS11 , filed on June 20, 2024, will remain on calendar for August 1, 2024. However, the time to appear is advanced from 10:00 a.m. to 8:30 a.m. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
31 | 31
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 07/22 3:40 PM
Defendant's Council fail to respond to Plaintiff filed by plaintiff Kenneth Boyman. (aco) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
29 | 29
respm
Reply (Motion related)
Thu 07/18 2:35 PM
REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case re Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof 16 filed by Defendant Google Enterprises. (Margo, Benjamin) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
30 | 30
misc
Mail Returned
Thu 07/18 2:45 PM
Mail Returned addressed to Kenneth Boyman re Order,21 (aco) |
|
28 | 28
respm
Reply (Motion related)
Wed 07/17 4:19 PM
REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Walt Disney Company The 11 filed by Defendant Walt Disney Company The. (Myers, Alexander) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
respm
Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Tue 07/16 3:36 PM
OPPOSITION of Defendants Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Boyman. (aco) |
|
Thursday, July 11, 2024 | ||
26 | 26
7
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Fri 07/12 10:27 AM
MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint16 filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Boyman. (aco) |
|
25 | 25
respm
Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Thu 07/11 11:44 AM
OPPOSITION to MOTION to Dismiss16 filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Boyman. (aco) |
|
Wednesday, July 10, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
order
Pro Se Electronic Filing - CV-5 O
Thu 07/11 9:05 AM
ORDER RE APPLICATION FOR PERMISSION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING by Judge George H Wu. The applicant must register to use the Courts CM/ECF System within five (5) days of being served with this order. Registration information is available at the Pro Se Litigant E-Filing web page located on the Courts website. Upon registering, the applicant will receive a CM/ECF login and password that will allow him/her to file non-sealed documents electronically in this case only. Any documents being submitted under seal must be manually filed with the Clerk.; granting23 APPLICATION for Pro Se Electronic Filing. (aco) |
|
23 | 23
motion
Pro Se Electronic Filing - CV-5
Wed 07/10 11:56 AM
APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case filed by plaintiff Kenneth Boyman. (aco) |
|
22 | 22
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines
Wed 07/10 11:52 AM
MINUTES IN CHAMBERS - TRANSFER OF CASE TO JUDGE WU by Judge George H Wu. This action has been reassigned to the HONORABLE GEORGE H. WU, United States District Judge and to the Honorable Steve Kim, U.S. Magistrate Judge (SK). Please substitute the initials GW in place of the initials DMG. The case number will now read: CV 24- 5147-GW-SKx. As documents are routed using the judge's initials, it is important to use the correct initials on all subsequent filings. Judge Wu's Courtroom Deputy Clerk, Javier Gonzalez, can be reached at javier_gonzalez@cacd.uscourts.gov. The Court sets a Scheduling Conference for August 1, 2024 at 8:30 a.m. Defendant Google LLC's Motion to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint16 , filed on June 25, 2024, will remain on calendar for August 1, 2024. However, the time to appear is advanced from 10:00 a.m. to 8:30 a.m. (See document for further details). (aco) |
|
21 | 21
10
pgs
order
Order
Wed 07/10 11:48 AM
STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. You are instructed to read and to follow (unless otherwise superseded herein) the Central District of California Local Rules (henceforth "Local Rules") 16-1 through 16-15 regarding pre-trial requirements. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco) |
|
Tuesday, July 09, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Mail Returned
Tue 07/09 3:39 PM
Mail Returned addressed to Kenneth Boyman, Return to Sender, Not Deliverable As Addressed, Unable to Forward, re ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT to this Court's General Order in the Matter of Assignment of Cases and Duties to the District Judges18 (bm) |
|
Wednesday, July 03, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
cs_rasgn
Reassign Case - Self -Recusal - (CV-52)
Wed 07/03 5:55 PM
ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to this Court's General Order in the Matter of Assignment of Cases and Duties to the District Judges.by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Case transferred from Judge Dolly M. Gee to the calendar of Judge George H Wu for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:24-cv-05147 GW(SKx). (rn) |
|
Tuesday, July 02, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
order
Transferring Case (Related Case)(CV-34)
Tue 07/02 3:07 PM
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT to this Court's General Order in the Matter of Assignment of Cases and Duties to the District Judges. Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:16-cv-06543 DMG(JEMx). Case transferred from Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong to Judge Dolly M. Gee for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:24-cv-05147 DMG(SKx). Signed by Judge Dolly M. Gee (rn) |
|
Tuesday, June 25, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Tue 06/25 8:34 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Google Enterprises, re Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123),14 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case re Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof 16 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties15 served on June 25, 2024. (Margo, Benjamin) |
|
16 | 16
motion
Dismiss Case
Tue 06/25 8:17 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case re Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof Google Enterprises. Motion set for hearing on 8/1/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. (Margo, Benjamin) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
15 | 15
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Tue 06/25 6:15 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Google Enterprises, identifying Google LLC, XXVI Holdings, Inc., Alphabet Inc. and YouTube, LLC. (Margo, Benjamin) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Tue 06/25 6:06 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Benjamin Margo counsel for Defendant Google Enterprises. Adding Benjamin D. Margo as counsel of record for Google LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Google LLC. (Attorney Benjamin Margo added to party Google Enterprises(pty:dft))(Margo, Benjamin) |
|
13 | 13
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Tue 06/25 10:40 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Walt Disney Company The, re Request for Judicial Notice12 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Walt Disney Company The 11 served on 06/25/2024. (Myers, Alexander) |
|
Thursday, June 20, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
misc
For Judicial Notice
Thu 06/20 4:24 PM
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Walt Disney Company The 11 filed by Defendant Walt Disney Company The. (Myers, Alexander) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Dismiss Party
Thu 06/20 4:20 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Walt Disney Company The filed by Defendant Walt Disney Company The. Motion set for hearing on 8/1/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. (Myers, Alexander) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening
Thu 06/20 11:35 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): The pro se litigant's email address was added to CM/ECF in error upon the opening of this Notice of Removal case. The pro se litigant's email will be removed from CM/ECF and will not be used for electronic service without the appropriate registration and consent. See Local Rule 53.. (sh) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Thu 06/20 11:34 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh) |
|
8 | 8
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Thu 06/20 11:34 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Thu 06/20 11:33 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (sh) |
|
Tuesday, June 18, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification) (AO-121)
Tue 06/18 4:13 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Walt Disney Company The. (Myers, Alexander) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Related Case(s)
Tue 06/18 4:07 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Walt Disney Company The. Related Case(s): 16-cv-6543; 17-cv-8827; 19-cv-10333 (Myers, Alexander) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Tue 06/18 3:59 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Walt Disney Company The, (Myers, Alexander) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 06/18 3:56 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Walt Disney Company The identifying The Walt Disney Company as Corporate Parent. (Myers, Alexander) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Tue 06/18 3:37 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Walt Disney Company The. (Myers, Alexander) |
|
1 | 1
4
pgs
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 06/18 3:32 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, Los Angeles County, case number 23SMCV04018 Receipt No: ACACDC-37680744 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant Walt Disney Company The. (Attorney Alexander A Myers added to party Walt Disney Company The(pty:dft))(Myers, Alexander) |
|
Att: 1 3rd Amended Complaint | ||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Thu 06/20 11:30 AM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF SUMMONS AND 3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Google Enterprises, Walt Disney Company The., filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Boyman.[FILED IN STATE COURT 5/7/2024 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 1 TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ] (sh) |