United Training Career, LLC
Texas Western Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Michael M Parker |
Case #: | 5:24-bk-51125 |
Case Filed: | Jun 18, 2024 |
Creditor Meeting: | Jul 23, 2024 |
Debtor
United Training Career, LLC
707 Landa St
New Braunfels, TX 78130-6113 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
John Patrick Lowe
2402 East Main Street
Uvalde, TX 78801 |
Docket last updated: 06/19/2024 12:04 AM CDT |
Tuesday, June 18, 2024 | ||
crditcrd
ICC-Fee Paid
Tue 06/18 1:58 PM
ICC-Fee Terminated for Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 (csupld)([LINK 24-51125 ) [caseupld,vol7cu] ( 338.00), Amount $ 338.00, Receipt A24524017 (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
caseupld
Voluntary Petition Chapter 7
Tue 06/18 1:53 PM
Voluntary Petition under Chapter 7 (Non-Individual) With Schedules, With Statements, (Filing Fee: $ 338) filed by United Training Career, LLC. -Declaration for Electronic Filing due by 06/25/2024 (DeBard, Allen) |
|
2 | 2
court
341 Meeting 7 (Business No Asset)
Tue 06/18 1:54 PM
Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Lowe, John Patrick added to the case. with 341(a) meeting to be held on 7/23/2024 at 01:00 PM at Zoom - Lowe: Meeting ID 6657174178, Passcode 3258264599, OR call 830-542-7284. (DeBard, Allen) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Declaration for Electronic Filing (Restricted Document)
Tue 06/18 3:01 PM
Declaration for Electronic Filing filed by Allen M. DeBard for Debtor United Training Career, LLC. (DeBard, Allen) |
|
4 | 4
misc
~Document
Tue 06/18 3:37 PM
Verification of Creditor Matrix filed by Allen M. DeBard for Debtor United Training Career, LLC. (DeBard, Allen) |