Fisker Inc.
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Thomas M Horan |
Case #: | 1:24-bk-11390 |
Case Filed: | Jun 19, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 200-999 |
Est. Assets | $500,000,001 to $1 billion |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Fisker Inc.
14 Centerpointe Dr
La Palma, CA 90623-1028 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
1. | Fisker files for Chapter 11 bankruptcy in Delaware (autoblog.com) |
Submitted Tue 06/25/2024 | |
Docket last updated: 57 minutes ago |
Thursday, July 04, 2024 | ||
126 | 126
order
Shorten Time
Thu 07/04 9:30 AM
Order Shortening Notice of Motion of Debtors for Entry of an Order (I) Authorizing and Approving the Sale of Certain of the Debtors' Assets Free and Clear of Liens, Claims, Encumbrances, and Interests, (II) Authorizing the Debtors to Enter into and Perform Under the Fleet Sales Agreement, and (III) Granting Related Relief Order Signed on 7/4/2024. (AMH) |
|
Wednesday, July 03, 2024 | ||
125 | 125
misc
Certification of Counsel(Aty)
Wed 07/03 9:16 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Order Shortening Notice of Motion of Debtors for Entry of an Order (I) Authorizing and Approving the Sale of Certain of the Debtors' Assets Free and Clear of Liens, Claims, Encumbrances, and Interests, (II) Authorizing the Debtors to Enter into and Perform Under the Fleet Sales Agreement, and (III) Granting Related Relief Filed by Fisker Inc.. (Hammer, Evanthea) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
124 | 124
3
pgs
notice
Meeting of Creditors/Commencement of Case - Notice
Wed 07/03 4:02 PM
Notice of Meeting of Creditors/Commencement of Case Filed by Fisker Inc.. 341(a) meeting to be held on 7/25/2024 at 01:00 PM (check with U.S. Trustee for location). Objection 523 due by 9/23/2024. (Dolphin, Brenna) |
|
123 | 123
1
pgs
audio
Wed 07/03 3:40 PM
Court Date & Time [07/03/2024 01:00:06 PM]. File Size [ 16008 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:18:35 ]. (admin) |
|
122 | 122
court
VAN-472 Notice to Counsel Re: 341 Meeting
Wed 07/03 3:11 PM
Notice to Counsel Regarding Scheduling of 341 Meeting (ASA) |
|
121 | 121
order
Appear pro hac vice
Wed 07/03 12:47 PM
Order Granting Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Laura E. Appleby, Esq. Order Signed on 7/3/2024. (AMH) |
|
120 | 120
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 07/03 12:21 PM
Certificate of Service re: 1) Notice of Agenda for Hearing Scheduled for July 3, 2024, at 1:00 p.m. (Eastern Time); and 2) Notice of Amended Agenda for Hearing Scheduled for July 3, 2024, at 1:00 p.m. (Eastern Time) Filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants, LLC dba Verita Global. (Kass, Albert) |
|
119 | 119
motion
Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion
Wed 07/03 12:12 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Laura E. Appleby of Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP . Receipt Number 4444005, Filed by U.S. Bank National Association, as Indenture Trustee for the Fisker Inc. 2.50% Convertible Senior Notes due 2026. (Fallon, Brett) |
|
118 | 118
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice
Wed 07/03 11:56 AM
Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Fisker Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 7/3/2024 at 01:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. (Hammer, Evanthea) |
|
117 | 117
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 07/03 11:43 AM
Certificate of Service re: 1) Motion of Debtors for Entry of an Order (I) Authorizing and Approving the Sale of Certain of the Debtors' Assets Free and Clear of Liens, Claims, Encumbrances, and Interests, (II) Authorizing the Debtors to Enter Into and Perform Under the Fleet Sales Agreement, and (III) Granting Related Relief; 2) Declaration of John C. DiDonato as Chief Restructuring Officer of the Debtors in Support of the Motion of Debtors for Entry of an Order (I) Authorizing and Approving the Sale of Certain of the Debtors' Assets Free and Clear of Liens, Claims, Encumbrances, and Interests, (II) Authorizing the Debtors to Enter Into and Perform Under the Fleet Sales Agreement, and (III) Granting Related Relief; and 3) Motion of Debtors to Shorten Notice of Motion of Debtors for Entry of an Order (I) Authorizing and Approving the Sale of Certain of the Debtors' Assets Free and Clear of Liens, Claims, Encumbrances, and Interests, (II) Authorizing the Debtors to Enter Into and Perform Under the Fleet Sales Agreement, and (III) Granting Related Relief Filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants, LLC dba Verita Global. (Kass, Albert) |
|
116 | 116
trustee
Telephonic 341 Meeting Information
Wed 07/03 11:39 AM
The upcoming 341(a) meeting is scheduled to be held by phone. Please call 888-455-8838 and use access code 684 3648# to join the meeting. Filed by U.S. Trustee. (Bates, Malcolm) |
|
115 | 115
misc
Request to Schedule Section 341 Meeting
Wed 07/03 11:36 AM
Request of US Trustee to Schedule Section 341 Meeting of Creditors July 25, 2024 at 1:00 p.m. (ET) Filed by U.S. Trustee. (Bates, Malcolm) |
|
114 | 114
crditcrd
none
Wed 07/03 11:30 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Motion to Sale of Property Free and Clear of Liens([LINK 24-11390 TMH] ) [motion,msell] ( 199.00). Receipt Number 10095067, amount $ 199.00. (COH) |
|
113 | 113
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice
Wed 07/03 10:27 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Fisker Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 7/3/2024 at 01:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. (Hammer, Evanthea) |
|
Tuesday, July 02, 2024 | ||
112 | 112
motion
Shorten - Motion
Tue 07/02 8:56 PM
Motion to Shorten // Motion of Debtors to Shorten Notice of Motion of Debtors for Entry of an Order (I) Authorizing and Approving the Sale of Certain of the Debtors' Assets Free and Clear of Liens, Claims, Encumbrances, and Interests, (II) Authorizing the Debtors to Enter into and Perform Under the Fleet Sales Agreement, and (III) Granting Related Relief Filed by Fisker Inc.. Objections due by 7/8/2024. (Hammer, Evanthea) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
111 | 111
misc
Declaration in Support
Tue 07/02 8:47 PM
Declaration in Support // Declaration of John C. Didonato as Chief Restructuring Officer of the Debtors in Support of the Motion of Debtors for Entry of an Order (I) Authorizing and Approving the Sale of Certain of the Debtors' Assets Free and Clear of Liens, Claims, Encumbrances, and Interests, (II) Authorizing the Debtors to Enter into and Perform Under the Fleet Sales Agreement, and (III) Granting Related Relief Filed by Fisker Inc.. (Dolphin, Brenna) |
|
110 | 110
motion
Sale of Property Free and Clear of Liens- Motion (FEE)
Tue 07/02 8:41 PM
Motion For Sale of Property Free and Clear of Liens(FEE) // Motion of Debtors for Entry of an Order (I) Authorizing and Approving the Sale of Certain of the Debtors' Assets Free and Clear of Liens, Claims, Encumbrances, and Interests, (II) Authorizing the Debtors to Enter into and Perform Under the Fleet Sales Agreement, and (III) Granting Related Relief Fee Amount $199 Filed by Fisker Inc.. Objections due by 7/8/2024. (Dolphin, Brenna) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
109 | 109
order
Employ (Application)
Tue 07/02 4:39 PM
Order Authorizing the Debtors to Employ and Retain Kurtzman Carson Consultants, LLC dba Verita Global as Claims and Noticing Agent Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date Order Signed on 7/2/2024. (AMH) |
|
108 | 108
motion
Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion
Tue 07/02 3:52 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice James Andrew Hinds, Jr. . Receipt Number 2724, Filed by Prelude Systems, Inc.. (Hinds, James) |
|
107 | 107
misc
Certification of Counsel(Aty)
Tue 07/02 2:27 PM
Certification of Counsel // Certification of Counsel Regarding Order Authorizing the Debtors to Employ and Retain Kurtzman Carson Consultants, LLC dba Verita Global as Claims and Noticing Agent Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date Filed by Fisker Inc.. (Hammer, Evanthea) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A: Revised Order | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B: Redline | ||
106 | 106
2
pgs
trustee
Notice of Appointment of Creditors' Committee
Tue 07/02 11:04 AM
Notice of Appointment of Creditors' Committee Filed by U.S. Trustee. (Richenderfer, Linda) |
|
Monday, July 01, 2024 | ||
105 | 105
motion
Motion for Order Re: Interim Compensation Procedures
Mon 07/01 5:52 PM
Motion for Order Establishing Procedures for Interim Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses of Professionals Filed by Fisker Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 7/16/2024 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 7/9/2024. (Hammer, Evanthea) |
|
Att: 1 Notice | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A | ||
104 | 104
motion
Extend Deadline to File Schedules - Motion
Mon 07/01 3:42 PM
Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information Filed by Fisker Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 7/16/2024 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 7/9/2024. (Hammer, Evanthea) |
|
Att: 1 Notice | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A: Proposed Order | ||
Friday, June 28, 2024 | ||
103 | 103
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 06/28 10:43 PM
Certificate of Service re: Documents Served on or Before June 26, 2024 Filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants, LLC dba Verita Global. (Kass, Albert) |
|
102 | 102
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 06/28 10:39 PM
Certificate of Service re: Notice of Hearing on the Use of Cash Collateral Filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants, LLC dba Verita Global. (Kass, Albert) |
|
101 | 101
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 06/28 9:30 PM
Certificate of Service re: Documents Served on or Before June 25, 2024 Filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants, LLC dba Verita Global. (Kass, Albert) |
|
100 | 100
notice
Hearing - Notice
Fri 06/28 2:38 PM
Notice of Hearing on the Motion of the Debtors for Entry of Interim Order (I) Authorizing the Debtors to Use Cash Collateral, (II) Granting Adequate Protection, (III) Modifying the Automatic Stay, (IV) Scheduling a Further Hearing on the Motion, (V) Granting Related Relief Filed by Fisker Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 7/9/2024 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 7/8/2024. (Hammer, Evanthea) |
|
99 | 99
misc
List of Creditors
Fri 06/28 10:42 AM
[SEALED] List of Creditors // Unredacted Creditor Matrix Filed by Fisker Inc.. (Hammer, Evanthea) |
|
98 | 98
30+
pgs
order
Order
Fri 06/28 10:23 AM
Second Interim Order (I) Authorizing the Debtors to Utilize Cash Collateral, (II) Granting Adequate Protection, (III) Modifying the Automatic Stay, (IV) Waiving Any Stay of the Effectiveness of the Relief Granted, and (V) Granting Related Relief Order Signed on 6/28/2024. (AMH) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Thursday, June 27, 2024 | ||
97 | 97
notice
Withdrawal of Appearance - Notice
Thu 06/27 4:39 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance. J. Cory Falgowski, Esquire and Derek F. Meek, Esquire has withdrawn from the case. Filed by HL Mando (Suzhou) Automotive System Co., Ltd.. (Falgowski, Justin) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
96 | 96
misc
Certification of Counsel(Aty)
Thu 06/27 4:22 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Interim Order (I) Authorizing the Debtors to Utilize Cash Collateral, (II) Granting Adequate Protection, (III) Modifying the Automatic Stay, (IV) Waiving Any Stay of the Effectiveness of the Relief Granted, and (V) Granting Related Relief Filed by Fisker Inc.. (Dolphin, Brenna) |
|
Att: 1 60 pgs Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 61 pgs Exhibit B | ||
95 | 95
misc
Certificate of Service
Thu 06/27 3:59 PM
Certificate of Service re: Documents Served on June 21, 2024 Filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants, LLC dba Verita Global. (Kass, Albert) |
|
94 | 94
order
Appear pro hac vice
Thu 06/27 10:40 AM
Order Granting Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Paul J. Laurin, Esq. Order Signed on 6/27/2024. (AMH) |