Kehoe v. US
Original Case: 1:23-cv-01120
Federal Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:24-cvus-01961 |
Type | civil us |
Nature of Suit | 354 |
Case Filed: | Jun 18, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 19, 2024 5:26 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
UNITED STATES
|
Represented By
Director, Commercial Litigation Branch, Civil Division, U.S. Department of Justice
United States Department of Justice contact info |
Plaintiff - Appellant
BRENDA KEHOE, represented by daughter Tracy Payne
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 06/19/2024 4:36 AM EDT |
Tuesday, June 18, 2024 | ||
1 | 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 06/13/2024. [1011781] Entry of Appearance is due on 07/02/2024. Appellant's brief is due on 08/19/2024. [ALK] [Entered: 06/18/2024 01:18 PM] | |
Att: 1 4 pgs Notice of Docketing | ||
Att: 2 18 pgs Civil Case Docketed | ||
2 | 2 2 pgs Entry of Appearance for Patrick S. Angulo as counsel for Appellee US. Service: 06/18/2024 by email, US mail. [1011921] 24-1961 [Patrick Angulo] [Entered: 06/18/2024 04:49 PM] |