Wunstell v. Bretado-Capetillo et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Eldon E Fallon |
Referred: | Janis Van Meerveld |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-01582 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jun 19, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 03, 2024 5:32 AM CDT |
Defendant
Juan Bretado-Capetillo
|
|
Defendant
Flatline Xpress, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Sentry Select Insurance Company
|
|
Plaintiff
Susan Wunstell
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, August 26, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
service
Affidavit of Service
Mon 08/26 8:15 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Mary Hebert of Summons and Complaint served on Flatline Xpress, LLC on 08/26/2024. (St. Martin, Christopher) |
|
Friday, August 09, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
Fri 08/09 1:07 PM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re7 Statement of Corporate Disclosure,6 Answer to Complaint - Documents do not contain Section or Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Section L, Judge Eldon E. Fallonand Division 1, Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (gla) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Statement of Corporate Disclosure
Fri 08/09 11:54 AM
Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Sentry Select Insurance Company (Royce, Doris) |
|
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 08/09 11:38 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Sentry Select Insurance Company. Attorney Doris A. Royce added to party Sentry Select Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Royce, Doris) Modified on 8/9/2024 (gla) |
|
Thursday, June 27, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Affidavit of Service
Thu 06/27 10:39 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Mary Hebert of Summons and Complaint served on Juan Bretado-Capetillo on 06/25/2024. (St. Martin, Christopher) |
|
Tuesday, June 25, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 06/25 7:43 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed; Sentry Select Insurance Company served on 6/24/2024, answer due 7/15/2024. (St. Martin, Christopher) |
|
Thursday, June 20, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Thu 06/20 10:22 AM
Summons Issued as to Juan Bretado-Capetillo, Flatline Xpress, LLC, Sentry Select Insurance Company.(gla) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons | ||
2 | 2
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Thu 06/20 9:36 AM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (kls) |
|
Wednesday, June 19, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 06/19 10:12 AM
COMPLAINT against Juan Bretado-Capetillo, Flatline Xpress, LLC, Sentry Select Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ALAEDC-10575568) filed by Susan Wunstell.Attorney Christopher John St. Martin added to party Susan Wunstell(pty:pla).(St. Martin, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Juan Bretado-Capetillo, | ||
Att: 3 Summons Flatline Xpress, LLC, | ||
Att: 4 Summons Sentry Select Insurance Company |