Lovald v. O'Malley
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | David S Doty |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-02323 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits |
Case Filed: | Jun 19, 2024 |
Terminated: | Aug 21, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, September 04, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Letter
Wed 09/04 3:54 PM
LETTER from from SSA Office of General Counsel acknowledging receipt of12 Order of Remand.(LTT) |
|
Thursday, August 22, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Letter from Clerk's Office to County District Court or SSA re: Remand Order
Thu 08/22 10:58 AM
LETTER from Clerk's Office to Social Security Administration enclosing12 Order of Remand. c/c: SSA. (MKB) |
|
13 | 13
order
Judgment (Clerk's Office Only)
Thu 08/22 10:56 AM
JUDGMENT(MKB) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Notice - appeal | ||
Wednesday, August 21, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
1
pgs
order
Order of Entry
Wed 08/21 1:08 PM
ORDER FOR REMAND. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. This case is remanded, pursuant to sentence 4 of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g), to the Commissioner of Social Security for further administrative action; and 2. On remand, the case will be remanded to an ALJ who will issue a new decision. LET JUDGMENT BE ENTERED ACCORDINGLY. Signed by Judge David S. Doty on 8/21/2024. (KAD) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Proposed Order to Judge re Stipulation
Wed 08/21 10:23 AM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re10 Stipulation. (Doroba, Sophie) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Stipulation
Wed 08/21 10:22 AM
STIPULATION for Remand by Martin J. O'Malley. Jointly Signed by Gillian Lovald. (Doroba, Sophie) |
|
Friday, August 16, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice to Attorney - SSA Case Reassigned to District Judge
Fri 08/16 5:17 PM
TEXT-ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. A notice to withdraw consent has been filed in this case case and is now assigned to Judge David S. Doty and Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster. NOTE: the new case number is 24-cv-2323 (DSD/DJF) . Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. (ABR) |
|
8 | 8
misc
SSA Administrative Record
Fri 08/16 2:47 PM
Social Security ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD filed electronically.(Doroba, Sophie) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) | ||
Thursday, June 20, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 06/20 4:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan Konoski on behalf of Gillian Lovald. (Konoski, Bryan) |
|
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order on Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs
Thu 06/20 11:50 AM
ORDER granting2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster on 6/20/2024. (LNP) |
|
5 | 5
notice
SSA Case Assignment Form Issued
Thu 06/20 10:21 AM
NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES: Social Security Case Assignment Form Issued. Per [LINK:Local Rule 7.2] , this form must be submitted to the clerk in paper on or before the answer due date. Please mail the completed form to: U.S. District Court for the District of Minnesota Clerks Office 300 South Fourth Street, Suite 202 Minneapolis, MN 55415 (ACH) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Initial Case Assignment - SSA Magistrate Judge
Thu 06/20 10:20 AM
(Text-Ony) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster per Social Security List. Please use case number 24-cv-2323 DJF. (ACH) |
|
Wednesday, June 19, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 06/19 11:38 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan Konoski on behalf of Gillian Lovald. (Konoski, Bryan) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs (IFP)
Wed 06/19 11:37 AM
Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Gillian Lovald. (Konoski, Bryan) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 06/19 11:34 AM
COMPLAINT against Martin J O'Malley filed by Gillian Lovald. No summons requested. (Konoski, Bryan) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |