Frost et al v. Beyond Inc.
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | Jeffrey M Bryan |
Referred: | Leo I Brisbois |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-02326 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 19, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 03, 2024 4:59 AM CDT |
Defendant
Beyond Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Clarence Frost
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tammy Frost
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, August 13, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Letter to District Judge
Tue 08/13 2:48 PM
LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Clarence Frost, Tammy Frost . (Throndset, Chad) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Wed 07/17 2:25 PM
ORDER granting5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Beyond Inc. answer due 8/19/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 7/17/2024. (JLB) |
|
6 | 6
respm
Proposed Order to Judge re Motion
Wed 07/17 10:52 AM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Clarence Frost, Tammy Frost.(Gustafson, Jason) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Wed 07/17 10:51 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Clarence Frost, Tammy Frost. (Gustafson, Jason) |
|
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 07/08 10:19 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Clarence Frost, Tammy Frost. Beyond Inc. served on 6/27/2024, answer due 7/18/2024. (Michenfelder, Patrick) |
|
Thursday, June 20, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Thu 06/20 8:29 AM
Summons Issued as to Beyond Inc. (ABR) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Initial Case Assignment
Thu 06/20 8:28 AM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Jeffrey M. Bryan per Civil (5th - Civil Rights: Housing/Accommodations, ADA Other) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 24-cv-2326 (JMB/LIB). Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (ABR) |
|
Wednesday, June 19, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 06/19 3:44 PM
COMPLAINT against Beyond Inc. (filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMNDC-11139679) filed by Clarence Frost, Tammy Frost. Filer requests summons issued. (Throndset, Chad) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |