Vasquez v. Amalgamated Life Insurance Company
Massachusetts District Court | |
Judge: | Julia E Kobick |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-11589 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Jun 19, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 03, 2024 6:37 AM EDT |
Defendant
Amalgamated Life Insurance Company
|
|
Plaintiff
Louis Vasquez
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, June 24, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet
Mon 06/24 12:32 PM
Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet re1 Complaint, Amended by Louis Vasquez. (Halstrom, Ingrid) |
|
Friday, June 21, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Fri 06/21 7:41 AM
Summons Issued as to Amalgamated Life Insurance Company. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Kelly, Danielle) |
|
Thursday, June 20, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
Thu 06/20 4:56 PM
District Judge Julia E. Kobick: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. granting 2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Michael D. Grabhorn. granting 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Andrew Michael Grabhorn. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at [LINK:https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account] . (Kelly, Danielle) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Thu 06/20 2:47 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Julia E. Kobick assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Cowan, Nicole) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 06/20 12:19 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Andrew Michael Grabhorn Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-10471270 by Louis Vasquez.(Halstrom, Ingrid) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Certification in Support of Motion For Admission Pro Hac Vice, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing | ||
2 | 2
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 06/20 12:16 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Michael D. Grabhorn Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-10471253 by Louis Vasquez.(Halstrom, Ingrid) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Certification in Support of Motion For Admission Pro Hac Vice, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Wednesday, June 19, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 06/19 10:51 PM
COMPLAINT against Louis Vasquez Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10470399 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Louis Vasquez.(Halstrom, Ingrid) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Action Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Category Form Category Form |