Original Case: 1:23-cv-00054

Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:24-pcf-40434
Typeprivate civil federal / private
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Case Filed:Jun 19, 2024
Terminated:Mar 17, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 18, 2025 5:45 AM CDT
Defendant - Appellee
Amazing Grace Primary Home Care, L.L.C.
Represented By
Daniel Elijah Vargas
Vargas Law Firm
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Javier Cavazos
Represented By
Daniel Elijah Vargas
Vargas Law Firm
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Maria Carmen Cavazos
Represented By
Daniel Elijah Vargas
Vargas Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Albert Mascorro Flores
Represented By
Roger Elliott Topham
contact info
Mauro Fernando Ruiz Jr.
Ruiz Law Firm, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Christina Vargas
Represented By
Roger Elliott Topham
contact info
Mauro Fernando Ruiz Jr.
Ruiz Law Firm, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Martha Ramos
Represented By
Roger Elliott Topham
contact info
Mauro Fernando Ruiz Jr.
Ruiz Law Firm, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Juan V. Cortez, III
Represented By
Roger Elliott Topham
contact info
Mauro Fernando Ruiz Jr.
Ruiz Law Firm, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Christina Cuevas
Represented By
Roger Elliott Topham
contact info
Mauro Fernando Ruiz Jr.
Ruiz Law Firm, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Leticia Arreola
Represented By
Roger Elliott Topham
contact info
Mauro Fernando Ruiz Jr.
Ruiz Law Firm, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Arianna Rodriguez
Represented By
Roger Elliott Topham
contact info
Mauro Fernando Ruiz Jr.
Ruiz Law Firm, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Nereyda Garza
Represented By
Roger Elliott Topham
contact info
Mauro Fernando Ruiz Jr.
Ruiz Law Firm, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Nancy Silva
Represented By
Roger Elliott Topham
contact info
Mauro Fernando Ruiz Jr.
Ruiz Law Firm, P.L.L.C.
contact info

GPO Mar 17 2025
UNPUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [24-40434 Reversed ] Judge: JEG , Judge: SAH , Judge: CTW Mandate issue date is 04/08/2025 [24-40434]

Docket last updated: 03/18/2025 5:45 AM CDT

Create an account to get the full docket for this case.