ELI LILLY AND COMPANY v. CAPITOL CONTOURS LLC
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Richard J Leon |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01781 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1114 Trademark Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jun 20, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Aug 04, 2024 5:38 AM EDT |
Defendant
CAPITOL CONTOURS LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, August 30, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Set/Reset Deadlines
Fri 08/30 7:08 PM
ORDER granting8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer due by 9/24/2024. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 08/30/2024. (lcrjl1) |
|
Thursday, August 29, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Thu 08/29 8:37 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, (Second) by ELI LILLY AND COMPANY.(Lomeo, James) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Thu 07/18 1:17 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by ELI LILLY AND COMPANY.(Lomeo, James) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Set/Reset Deadlines
Thu 07/18 5:52 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Parties'7 Joint Motion to Extend the Deadline for Defendant to Answer the Complaint, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED and defendant's deadline to respond to the Complaint is August 30, 2024. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 7/18/2024. (lcrjl1) Modified to correct chambers error on 7/18/2024 (smc) |
||
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned as to private individual or business
Mon 07/08 12:44 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CAPITOL CONTOURS LLC served on 6/27/2024, answer due 7/18/2024 (Lomeo, James) |
|
Thursday, June 20, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Thu 06/20 2:14 PM
SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to CAPITOL CONTOURS LLC.(znmw) |
|
Att: 1 Notice and Consent | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 06/20 4:57 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by James John Lomeo on behalf of ELI LILLY AND COMPANY (Lomeo, James) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Report Regarding Patent & Trademark
Thu 06/20 4:56 AM
REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent and/or trademark.. (Lomeo, James) |
|
2 | 2
notice
LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
Thu 06/20 4:51 AM
LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ELI LILLY AND COMPANY (Lomeo, James) |
|
1 | 1
30+
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 06/20 4:50 AM
COMPLAINT against CAPITOL CONTOURS LLC with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-10972252) filed by ELI LILLY AND COMPANY.(Lomeo, James) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Trademark Registrations, | ||
Att: 2 11 pgs Exhibit B - Websites and Social Media, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 4 Summons | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 06/20 2:12 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Richard J. Leon. (znmw) |