Escobedo v. United Parks & Resorts, Inc. et al
California Southern District Court | |
Judge: | M James Lorenz |
Referred: | Valerie E Torres |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-01059 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1441pl Removal- Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jun 19, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Superior Court of California, County of San Diego, 37-02024-00022645-CU-PO-CTL |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 03, 2024 3:06 AM PDT |
Defendant
Does 1 through 50
|
|
Defendant
Sea World Parks & Entertainment, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sea World San Diego
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sea World, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
United Parks & Resorts, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jonathan Kelly Escobedo
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Aug 27 2024
ORDER Imposing Sanctions on Plaintiff's Counsel for Failing to Comply With Court Orders. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres on August 27, 2024. (cxy) |
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, September 11, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Response to Order to Show Cause
Wed 09/11 3:37 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Johathan Escobedo. (Rhames, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, September 10, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Sanctions Payment Received
Tue 09/10 3:07 PM
SANCTIONS PAYMENT RECEIVED. A payment against a Court issued sanction has been made. A copy of the receipt is attached. (Vassaur, J.) |
|
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
9
pgs
order
Order Imposing Sanctions
Tue 08/27 6:23 PM
ORDER Imposing Sanctions on Plaintiff's Counsel for Failing to Comply With Court Orders. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres on August 27, 2024. (cxy) |
|
Friday, August 23, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
minutes
Show Cause Hearing ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Fri 08/23 4:49 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres. The Court held a continued Order to Show Cause Hearing on August 23, 2024. Order to follow. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres on August 21, 2024. (Plaintiff Attorney Michael R. Rhames). (Defendant Attorney Todd Ratay). (no document attached) (cxy) |
|
Wednesday, August 21, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
3
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 08/21 4:20 PM
SECOND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE for Failure to Comply with the Court's Orders. Order to Show Cause response due by August 22, 2024 at 5:00 p.m. Continued Order to Show Cause Hearing set for August 23, 2024 at 3:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres on August 21, 2024.(cxy) |
|
7 | 7
minutes
Show Cause Hearing ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 08/21 4:11 PM
Minute Entry for Proceedings Held Before Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres. The Court held an Order to Show Cause Hearing on August 21, 2024. Plaintiff, through his Guardian ad Litem Dorothy Kelly, failed to appear. At the request of Plaintiff's counsel, the Court CONTINUES the Order to Show Cause Hearing to August 23, 2024 at 3:30 p.m. before Judge Valerie E. Torres via videoconference. The Court will send videoconference information two days prior to the hearing. A second Order to Show Cause to follow. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres on August 21, 2024. (Plaintiff Attorney Michael R. Rhames). (Defendant Attorney Todd Ratay). (no document attached) (cxy) |
|
Thursday, August 15, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
3
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Thu 08/15 1:58 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE For Failure To Comply With The Courts Requirements and Deadlines. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 8/21/2024 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres. Order to Show Cause Response due by 8/19/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres on 8/15/2024.(dim) |
|
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
minutes
Early Neutral Evaluation Conference ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 08/14 5:59 PM
Minute Entry for Proceedings Held Before Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres. The Court held an Early Neutral Evaluation Conference ("ENE") on August 14, 2024, but could not proceed. Plaintiff failed to timely submit a confidential ENE statement. Plaintiff's counsel appeared late following inquiry, but without Plaintiff (through his Guardian ad Litem). Accordingly, the Court RESETS the ENE and Case Management Conference to October 9, 2024 at 9:30 a.m. before the undesigned via video conference. Plaintiff shall submit a confidential ENE statement, and Defendant may submit an updated ENE statement if appropriate, by no later than October 2, 2024 . The statements shall be lodged, not filed, and shall comply with the instructions set forth in the Courts Order setting the ENE. See Doc. No.3 . An Order to Show Cause will follow. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres on August 14, 2024. (Plaintiff Attorney Michael R. Rhames). (Defendant Attorney Guillermo Marrero). (no document attached) (cxy) |
|
Wednesday, August 07, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Joint Discovery Plan
Wed 08/07 2:29 PM
JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Sea World, LLC Defendant SeaWorld LLC's Discovery Plan(Marrero, Guillermo)Attorney Guillermo Marrero added to party Sea World, LLC(pty:dft) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
Thursday, June 27, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
9
pgs
order
Order for Early Neutral Evaluation
Thu 06/27 4:30 PM
NOTICE AND ORDER Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Conference And Case Management Conference Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference set for 8/14/2024 t 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres. Joint Discovery Plan due 8/7/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres on 6/27/2024.(dim) |
|
Wednesday, June 19, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
respoth
Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)
Thu 06/20 11:07 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Sea World Parks & Entertainment, Inc., Sea World San Diego, Sea World, LLC, United Parks & Resorts, Inc.. (ggv) (sjt) |
|
1 | 1
22
pgs
cmp
Notice of Removal
Thu 06/20 10:49 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number BCASDC-18947636.), filed by Sea World San Diego, United Parks & Resorts, Inc., Sea World, LLC, Sea World Parks & Entertainment, Inc. The new case number is 3:24-cv-1059-L-VET. Judge M. James Lorenz and Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres are assigned to the case.(ggv) (sjt) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Answer to Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial by Defendant Sea World LLC, | ||
Att: 3 Proof of Service |