American Automobile Association, Inc. v. Rodriguez
California Southern District Court | |
Judge: | James E Simmons, Jr |
Referred: | Karen S Crawford |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-01060 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1114 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act) |
Case Filed: | Jun 19, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 03, 2024 3:06 AM PDT |
Defendant
David M Rodriguez
|
|
Plaintiff
American Automobile Association, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, June 20, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Thu 06/20 10:27 AM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (axc1) (anh) |
|
Wednesday, June 19, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
utility
Report Regarding Patent & Trademark FORM
Thu 06/20 10:19 AM
REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) *0,829,265* cc:USPTO (axc1) (anh) |
|
1 | 1
16
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 06/20 10:07 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against David M Rodriguez ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACASDC-18947634.), filed by American Automobile Association, Inc.. The new case number is 3:24-cv-1060-JES-KSC. Judge James E. Simmons, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case. (Liu, Tony)(axc1). (anh) |
|
Att: 1 Info Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit H |