Mark Needham v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03596 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jun 20, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Aug 04, 2024 6:31 AM EDT |
Defendant
Honeywell Safety Products USA Inc
|
|
Defendant
W.L. Gore & Associates Inc
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Stedfast USA Inc
|
|
Defendant
Southern Mills Inc
|
|
Defendant
PBI Performance Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
|
|
Defendant
Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
MSA Safety Inc
|
|
Defendant
Lion Group Inc
|
|
Defendant
Johnson Controls Inc
|
|
Defendant
Globe Manufacturing Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
E.I. Du Pont De Nemours & Co
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
|
|
Defendant
3M Company
|
|
Plaintiff
Mark Needham
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, August 28, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Status Report
Wed 08/28 1:05 AM
STATUS REPORT - General Denial and Statement of Affirmative Defenses by MSA Safety Inc. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 08/28 12:44 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by MSA Safety Inc. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Status Report
Tue 08/27 11:51 PM
STATUS REPORT - General Denial and Statement of Affirmative Defenses by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/27 11:30 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paige Pavone on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company, LLC, Globe Manufacturing Co LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Pavone, Paige) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 08/27 10:26 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent MSA Safety Inc. for Globe Manufacturing Company LLC.. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/27 6:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James L Stengel on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company, LLC, Globe Manufacturing Co LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/27 3:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paige Pavone on behalf of MSA Safety Inc, MSA Safety Incorporated, MSA Safety, Inc. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Pavone, Paige) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/27 1:07 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James L Stengel on behalf of MSA Safety Inc, MSA Safety Incorporated, MSA Safety, Inc. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
Thursday, August 15, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 08/15 9:25 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal against National Foam by Shanna Kuempel, Robert Tapia, Alfred Pirrone, Aurora Pirrone, Scott Kouns, Robert LaRose, Kerry Weitzel, Graesson Berbano, Mark Needham, Thomas Gayron, Richard Kolda, Paige Russell, Michael Eglite Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Pritzker, Elizabeth) Modified to edit docket text for clarification on 8/15/2024 (sshe, ) |
|
Monday, June 24, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Mon 06/24 9:20 AM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-Filed)(associated as of 06/20/2024), Mark Needham v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-03596-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Massachusetts (mbon) |
|
Thursday, June 20, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Thu 06/20 1:41 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (mbon) |
|
1 | 1
70
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 06/20 1:39 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-11833529.), filed by Mark Needham. Service due by 9/18/2024 (mbon) Modified on 6/20/2024 to correct file name (mbon) |